EP1775851 - Crosstalk compensation circuit, unit and method [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 25.11.2011 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.10.2013 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 06.11.2013 [2013/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Broadband United GmbH Pretzfelder Str. 21 91320 Ebermannstadt / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/37] | For all designated states Broadband United GmbH Maximilianstrasse 14 93047 Regensburg / DE | ||
Former [2007/16] | For all designated states Vierling Communications GmbH Pretzfelder Strasse 21 91320 Ebermannstadt / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Huber, Johannes, Prof. Dr. Waldstrasse 1c 91694 Langensendelbach / DE | 02 /
Berold, Ulrich Brucker Str. 10 90427 Nürnberg / DE | 03 /
Gerstacker, Wolfgang, Dr. Moritzbergstrasse 106a 90482 Nürnberg / DE | 04 /
Tzschoppe, Roman Dompfaffstrasse 127a 91056 Erlangen / DE | 05 /
Fischer, Robert, Dr. Dompropstrasse 53 91056 Erlangen / DE | 06 /
Busboom, Axel, Dr. Störnhofer Berg 3 91364 Unterleinleiter / DE | 07 /
Broll, Axel Debert 42 91320 Ebermannstadt / DE | 08 /
Herrmann, Georg Debert 61a 91329 Ebermannstadt / DE | [2011/03] |
Former [2010/33] | 01 /
Huber, Johannes, Prof. Dr. Waldstrasse 1c 91694 Langensendelbach / DE | ||
02 /
Berold, Ulrich Brucker Strasse 10 91056 Erlangen / DE | |||
03 /
Gerstacker, Wolfgang, Dr. Moritzbergstrasse 106a 90482 Nürnberg / DE | |||
04 /
Tzschoppe, Roman Dompfaffstrasse 127a 91056 Erlangen / DE | |||
05 /
Fischer, Robert, Dr. Dompropstrasse 53 91056 Erlangen / DE | |||
06 /
Busboom, Axel, Dr. Störnhofer Berg 3 91364 Unterleinleiter / DE | |||
07 /
Broll, Axel Debert 42 91320 Ebermannstadt / DE | |||
08 /
Herrmann, Georg Debert 61a 91329 Ebermannstadt / DE | |||
Former [2007/16] | 01 /
Huber, Johannes, Prof. Dr. Waldstrasse 1c 91694 Langensendelbach / DE | ||
02 /
Berold, Ulrich Brucker Strasse 10 90427 Nürnberg / DE | |||
03 /
Gerstacker, Wolfgang, Dr. Moritzbergstrasse 106a 90482 Nürnberg / DE | |||
04 /
Tzschoppe, Roman Dompfaffstrasse 127a 91056 Erlangen / DE | |||
05 /
Fischer, Robert, Dr. Dompropstrasse 53 91056 Erlangen / DE | |||
06 /
Busboom, Axel, Dr. Störnhofer Berg 3 91364 Unterleinleiter / DE | |||
07 /
Broll, Axel Debert 42 91320 Ebermannstadt / DE | |||
08 /
Herrmann, Georg Debert 61a 91329 Ebermannstadt / DE | Representative(s) | Dreykorn-Lindner, Werner Patentanwalt Steinlachstrasse 2 90571 Schwaig / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2007/18] | Dreykorn-Lindner, Werner Patentanwalt Steinlachstrasse 2 90571 Schwaig / DE | ||
Former [2007/16] | Beetz & Partner Steinsdorfstrasse 10 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 05022348.6 | 13.10.2005 | [2007/16] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1775851 | Date: | 18.04.2007 | Language: | DE | [2007/16] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1775851 | Date: | 19.01.2011 | Language: | DE | [2011/03] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.02.2006 | Classification | IPC: | H04B3/32, H04B3/23 | [2007/16] | CPC: |
H04B3/32 (EP);
H04B3/23 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/16] | Title | German: | Kompensationsschaltung, Kompensationseinheit, Verfahren zur Kompensation des Nebensprechens. | [2007/16] | English: | Crosstalk compensation circuit, unit and method | [2007/16] | French: | Circuit, unité et méthode de compensation de la diaphonie | [2007/16] | Examination procedure | 08.10.2007 | Examination requested [2007/47] | 08.11.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 09.05.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.08.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.12.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 07.12.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 20.10.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/52] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.10.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.09.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 08.10.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 07.10.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 19.01.2011 | CZ | 19.01.2011 | DK | 19.01.2011 | EE | 19.01.2011 | FI | 19.01.2011 | HU | 19.01.2011 | IE | 19.01.2011 | IT | 19.01.2011 | LT | 19.01.2011 | LV | 19.01.2011 | NL | 19.01.2011 | PL | 19.01.2011 | RO | 19.01.2011 | SE | 19.01.2011 | SI | 19.01.2011 | SK | 19.01.2011 | TR | 19.01.2011 | BG | 19.04.2011 | GR | 20.04.2011 | ES | 30.04.2011 | IS | 19.05.2011 | PT | 19.05.2011 | AT | 13.10.2011 | LU | 13.10.2011 | [2013/45] |
Former [2013/44] | CY | 19.01.2011 | |
CZ | 19.01.2011 | ||
DK | 19.01.2011 | ||
EE | 19.01.2011 | ||
FI | 19.01.2011 | ||
IE | 19.01.2011 | ||
IT | 19.01.2011 | ||
LT | 19.01.2011 | ||
LV | 19.01.2011 | ||
NL | 19.01.2011 | ||
PL | 19.01.2011 | ||
RO | 19.01.2011 | ||
SE | 19.01.2011 | ||
SI | 19.01.2011 | ||
SK | 19.01.2011 | ||
TR | 19.01.2011 | ||
BG | 19.04.2011 | ||
GR | 20.04.2011 | ||
ES | 30.04.2011 | ||
IS | 19.05.2011 | ||
PT | 19.05.2011 | ||
AT | 13.10.2011 | ||
LU | 13.10.2011 | ||
Former [2013/25] | CY | 19.01.2011 | |
CZ | 19.01.2011 | ||
DK | 19.01.2011 | ||
EE | 19.01.2011 | ||
FI | 19.01.2011 | ||
IE | 19.01.2011 | ||
IT | 19.01.2011 | ||
LT | 19.01.2011 | ||
LV | 19.01.2011 | ||
NL | 19.01.2011 | ||
PL | 19.01.2011 | ||
RO | 19.01.2011 | ||
SE | 19.01.2011 | ||
SI | 19.01.2011 | ||
SK | 19.01.2011 | ||
BG | 19.04.2011 | ||
GR | 20.04.2011 | ||
ES | 30.04.2011 | ||
IS | 19.05.2011 | ||
PT | 19.05.2011 | ||
AT | 13.10.2011 | ||
LU | 13.10.2011 | ||
Former [2013/07] | CY | 19.01.2011 | |
CZ | 19.01.2011 | ||
DK | 19.01.2011 | ||
EE | 19.01.2011 | ||
FI | 19.01.2011 | ||
IE | 19.01.2011 | ||
IT | 19.01.2011 | ||
LT | 19.01.2011 | ||
LV | 19.01.2011 | ||
NL | 19.01.2011 | ||
PL | 19.01.2011 | ||
RO | 19.01.2011 | ||
SE | 19.01.2011 | ||
SI | 19.01.2011 | ||
SK | 19.01.2011 | ||
BG | 19.04.2011 | ||
GR | 20.04.2011 | ||
ES | 30.04.2011 | ||
IS | 19.05.2011 | ||
PT | 19.05.2011 | ||
AT | 13.10.2011 | ||
Former [2012/03] | CY | 19.01.2011 | |
CZ | 19.01.2011 | ||
DK | 19.01.2011 | ||
EE | 19.01.2011 | ||
FI | 19.01.2011 | ||
IE | 19.01.2011 | ||
IT | 19.01.2011 | ||
LT | 19.01.2011 | ||
LV | 19.01.2011 | ||
NL | 19.01.2011 | ||
PL | 19.01.2011 | ||
RO | 19.01.2011 | ||
SE | 19.01.2011 | ||
SI | 19.01.2011 | ||
SK | 19.01.2011 | ||
BG | 19.04.2011 | ||
GR | 20.04.2011 | ||
ES | 30.04.2011 | ||
IS | 19.05.2011 | ||
PT | 19.05.2011 | ||
Former [2011/50] | CY | 19.01.2011 | |
CZ | 19.01.2011 | ||
DK | 19.01.2011 | ||
EE | 19.01.2011 | ||
FI | 19.01.2011 | ||
IE | 19.01.2011 | ||
LT | 19.01.2011 | ||
LV | 19.01.2011 | ||
NL | 19.01.2011 | ||
PL | 19.01.2011 | ||
RO | 19.01.2011 | ||
SE | 19.01.2011 | ||
SI | 19.01.2011 | ||
SK | 19.01.2011 | ||
BG | 19.04.2011 | ||
GR | 20.04.2011 | ||
ES | 30.04.2011 | ||
IS | 19.05.2011 | ||
PT | 19.05.2011 | ||
Former [2011/47] | CY | 19.01.2011 | |
DK | 19.01.2011 | ||
EE | 19.01.2011 | ||
FI | 19.01.2011 | ||
IE | 19.01.2011 | ||
LT | 19.01.2011 | ||
LV | 19.01.2011 | ||
NL | 19.01.2011 | ||
PL | 19.01.2011 | ||
SE | 19.01.2011 | ||
SI | 19.01.2011 | ||
BG | 19.04.2011 | ||
GR | 20.04.2011 | ||
ES | 30.04.2011 | ||
IS | 19.05.2011 | ||
PT | 19.05.2011 | ||
Former [2011/39] | CY | 19.01.2011 | |
FI | 19.01.2011 | ||
LT | 19.01.2011 | ||
LV | 19.01.2011 | ||
NL | 19.01.2011 | ||
PL | 19.01.2011 | ||
SE | 19.01.2011 | ||
SI | 19.01.2011 | ||
BG | 19.04.2011 | ||
GR | 20.04.2011 | ||
ES | 30.04.2011 | ||
IS | 19.05.2011 | ||
PT | 19.05.2011 | ||
Former [2011/37] | CY | 19.01.2011 | |
FI | 19.01.2011 | ||
LT | 19.01.2011 | ||
LV | 19.01.2011 | ||
PL | 19.01.2011 | ||
SE | 19.01.2011 | ||
SI | 19.01.2011 | ||
BG | 19.04.2011 | ||
GR | 20.04.2011 | ||
ES | 30.04.2011 | ||
IS | 19.05.2011 | ||
PT | 19.05.2011 | ||
Former [2011/36] | LT | 19.01.2011 | |
LV | 19.01.2011 | ||
PL | 19.01.2011 | ||
SE | 19.01.2011 | ||
GR | 20.04.2011 | ||
ES | 30.04.2011 | ||
IS | 19.05.2011 | ||
PT | 19.05.2011 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0902550 (AT & T CORP [US]) [A] 1-26* the whole document *; | [A]US2002051395 (HATAMIAN MEHDI [US]) [A] 1-26 * the whole document *; | [X]US2003142688 (CHOU GERCHIH [US], et al) [X] 1-26 * abstract * * page 2, paragraph 14 - paragraph 20 * * page 4, paragraph 46 - page 5, paragraph 50 *; | [X]US6775529 (ROO PIERTE [US]) [X] 1,26 * abstract * * column 5, line 27 - column 6, line 65 * |