EP1695691 - Foaming composition for hair cleaning and hair treatment [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 06.08.2010 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.06.2013 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MC | published on 10.07.2013 [2013/28] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Galderma S.A. Zugerstrasse 8 6330 Cham / CH | [2006/35] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Preuilh, Isabelle Elégancia,Bat. C12,rue des Moulières 06110 Le Cannet / FR | 02 /
Guise, Anne-Emmanuelle Les Jardins de la Prefect. Appartement 408, 39 rue Stanislass Girardin 76000 Rouen / FR | 03 /
Willcox, Nathalie 24, chemin des Serres 06650 Le Rouret / FR | [2006/35] | Representative(s) | Casalonga, Axel, et al Casalonga & Partners Bayerstrasse 73 80335 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2006/35] | Casalonga, Axel, et al Bureau Casalonga & Josse Bayerstrasse 71/73 80335 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 05022601.8 | 17.06.1999 | [2006/35] | Priority number, date | FR19980007802 | 19.06.1998 Original published format: FR 9807802 | [2006/35] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1695691 | Date: | 30.08.2006 | Language: | FR | [2006/35] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1695691 | Date: | 04.07.2007 | [2007/27] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1695691 | Date: | 30.09.2009 | Language: | FR | [2009/40] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.06.2007 | Classification | IPC: | A61K8/34, A61K8/37, A61K8/41, A61K8/42, A61K8/44, A61K8/46, A61K8/63, A61K8/73, A61K8/81, A61K8/92, A61Q5/02 | [2007/27] | CPC: |
A61Q5/02 (EP,BR,US);
A61K8/63 (EP,BR,KR,US);
A61K31/56 (EP,BR,US);
A61K8/345 (EP,BR,US);
A61K8/37 (EP,BR,US);
A61K8/41 (EP,BR,US);
A61K8/42 (EP,BR,US);
A61K8/442 (EP,BR,US);
A61K8/463 (EP,BR,US);
A61K8/64 (EP,BR,US);
A61K8/73 (EP,BR,US);
A61K8/731 (EP,BR,US);
A61K8/81 (EP,BR,US);
A61K8/8158 (EP,BR,US);
A61K8/922 (EP,BR,US);
|
Former IPC [2006/35] | A61K8/18 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2006/35] | Title | German: | Schäumende Zusammensetzung zur Haarreinigung und Haarbehandlung | [2006/35] | English: | Foaming composition for hair cleaning and hair treatment | [2006/35] | French: | Composition moussante pour le lavage et le traitement des cheveux | [2006/35] | Examination procedure | 01.08.2007 | Examination requested [2007/37] | 14.08.2007 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 19.11.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 20.03.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.04.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 14.10.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.04.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.08.2009 | Fee for grant paid | 10.08.2009 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP99925117.6 / EP1087747 | Opposition(s) | 01.07.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit [2010/36] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.10.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.10.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 17.10.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 17.10.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 17.10.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 27.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 14.06.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 28.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 16.06.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 11 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 30.09.2009 | CY | 30.09.2009 | DK | 30.09.2009 | FI | 30.09.2009 | IE | 30.09.2009 | IT | 30.09.2009 | MC | 30.09.2009 | NL | 30.09.2009 | SE | 30.09.2009 | GR | 31.12.2009 | ES | 10.01.2010 | PT | 01.02.2010 | GB | 17.06.2010 | LU | 17.06.2010 | BE | 30.06.2010 | CH | 30.06.2010 | FR | 30.06.2010 | LI | 30.06.2010 | [2013/28] |
Former [2012/43] | AT | 30.09.2009 | |
CY | 30.09.2009 | ||
DK | 30.09.2009 | ||
FI | 30.09.2009 | ||
IE | 30.09.2009 | ||
IT | 30.09.2009 | ||
NL | 30.09.2009 | ||
SE | 30.09.2009 | ||
GR | 31.12.2009 | ||
ES | 10.01.2010 | ||
PT | 01.02.2010 | ||
GB | 17.06.2010 | ||
LU | 17.06.2010 | ||
BE | 30.06.2010 | ||
CH | 30.06.2010 | ||
FR | 30.06.2010 | ||
LI | 30.06.2010 | ||
Former [2011/32] | AT | 30.09.2009 | |
CY | 30.09.2009 | ||
DK | 30.09.2009 | ||
FI | 30.09.2009 | ||
IE | 30.09.2009 | ||
IT | 30.09.2009 | ||
NL | 30.09.2009 | ||
SE | 30.09.2009 | ||
GR | 31.12.2009 | ||
ES | 10.01.2010 | ||
PT | 01.02.2010 | ||
GB | 17.06.2010 | ||
BE | 30.06.2010 | ||
CH | 30.06.2010 | ||
FR | 30.06.2010 | ||
LI | 30.06.2010 | ||
Former [2011/20] | AT | 30.09.2009 | |
CY | 30.09.2009 | ||
DK | 30.09.2009 | ||
FI | 30.09.2009 | ||
IE | 30.09.2009 | ||
IT | 30.09.2009 | ||
NL | 30.09.2009 | ||
SE | 30.09.2009 | ||
GR | 31.12.2009 | ||
ES | 10.01.2010 | ||
PT | 01.02.2010 | ||
CH | 30.06.2010 | ||
LI | 30.06.2010 | ||
Former [2011/15] | AT | 30.09.2009 | |
CY | 30.09.2009 | ||
DK | 30.09.2009 | ||
FI | 30.09.2009 | ||
IE | 30.09.2009 | ||
IT | 30.09.2009 | ||
NL | 30.09.2009 | ||
SE | 30.09.2009 | ||
GR | 31.12.2009 | ||
ES | 10.01.2010 | ||
PT | 01.02.2010 | ||
Former [2010/52] | AT | 30.09.2009 | |
CY | 30.09.2009 | ||
DK | 30.09.2009 | ||
FI | 30.09.2009 | ||
IE | 30.09.2009 | ||
NL | 30.09.2009 | ||
SE | 30.09.2009 | ||
GR | 31.12.2009 | ||
ES | 10.01.2010 | ||
PT | 01.02.2010 | ||
Former [2010/36] | AT | 30.09.2009 | |
CY | 30.09.2009 | ||
DK | 30.09.2009 | ||
FI | 30.09.2009 | ||
IE | 30.09.2009 | ||
NL | 30.09.2009 | ||
SE | 30.09.2009 | ||
ES | 10.01.2010 | ||
PT | 01.02.2010 | ||
Former [2010/33] | AT | 30.09.2009 | |
CY | 30.09.2009 | ||
FI | 30.09.2009 | ||
NL | 30.09.2009 | ||
SE | 30.09.2009 | ||
ES | 10.01.2010 | ||
PT | 01.02.2010 | ||
Former [2010/30] | AT | 30.09.2009 | |
CY | 30.09.2009 | ||
FI | 30.09.2009 | ||
SE | 30.09.2009 | ||
ES | 10.01.2010 | ||
PT | 01.02.2010 | ||
Former [2010/25] | CY | 30.09.2009 | |
FI | 30.09.2009 | ||
SE | 30.09.2009 | ||
ES | 10.01.2010 | ||
PT | 01.02.2010 | ||
Former [2010/23] | FI | 30.09.2009 | |
SE | 30.09.2009 | ||
ES | 10.01.2010 | ||
PT | 01.02.2010 | ||
Former [2010/19] | FI | 30.09.2009 | |
SE | 30.09.2009 | ||
ES | 10.01.2010 | ||
Former [2010/11] | FI | 30.09.2009 | |
SE | 30.09.2009 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US5352437 (NAKAGAWA AKIRA [JP], et al) [Y] 1-14 * example 11 *; | [Y] - SCHRADER K, "Grundlagen und Rezepturen der Kosmetika", GRUNDLAGEN UND REZEPTUREN DER KOSMETIKA, XX, XX, (1989), pages 680 - 709, XP002286009 [Y] 1-14 * page 681, column R, paragraph 2.2.2.1 * | Examination | WO9627376 | US5661118 |