EP1650815 - Flexural actuator with holding mechanism [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 01.08.2008 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.08.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 03.09.2008 [2008/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Citizen Electronics Co., Ltd. 1-23-1 Kamikurechi Fujiyoshida-shi Yamanashi / JP | For all designated states Authentic, Ltd. 17-1, Futago 5-chome, Takatsu-ku Kawasaki-shi Kanagawa / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2006/17] | For all designated states Citizen Electronics Co., Ltd. 1-23-1 Kamikurechi Fujiyoshida-shi Yamanashi / JP | ||
For all designated states Authentic, Ltd. 17-1, Futago 5-chome, Takatsu-ku Kawasaki-shi Kanagawa / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kobayashi, Kazuhiro Citizen Electronics Co., Ltd. 1-23-1 Kamikurechi Fujiyoshida-shi Yamanashi / JP | 02 /
Watanabe, Keita Citizen Electronics Co., Ltd. 1-23-1 Kamikurechi Fujiyoshida-shi Yamanashi / JP | 03 /
Watanabe, Shigehisa Citizen Electronics Co., Ltd. 1-23-1 Kamikurechi Fujiyoshida-shi Yamanashi / JP | 04 /
Ohkawa, Yoshiro c/o Authentic, Ltd. 17-1 Futago 5-chome Takatsu-ku Kawasaki-shi Kanagawa / JP | [2006/17] | Representative(s) | Dendorfer, Claus, et al Dendorfer & Herrmann Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Neuhauser Straße 47 80331 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2007/07] | Dendorfer, Claus, et al Dendorfer & Herrmann Patentanwälte Partnerschaft Bayerstrasse 3 80335 München / DE | ||
Former [2006/17] | Dendorfer, Claus Wächtershäuser & Hartz Weinstrasse 8 80333 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 05022700.8 | 18.10.2005 | [2006/17] | Priority number, date | JP20040305840 | 20.10.2004 Original published format: JP 2004305840 | [2006/17] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1650815 | Date: | 26.04.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/17] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1650815 | Date: | 05.09.2007 | [2007/36] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.08.2007 | Classification | IPC: | H01L41/053, H01L41/09 | [2006/17] | CPC: |
H10N30/88 (EP,US);
H04R1/00 (KR);
H10N30/2042 (EP,US);
H04R1/02 (KR)
| Designated contracting states | [2008/20] |
Former [2006/17] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Biegeaktuator mit Haltevorrichtung | [2006/17] | English: | Flexural actuator with holding mechanism | [2006/17] | French: | Actionneur à flexion avec mécanisme de support | [2006/17] | Examination procedure | 06.03.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2008/36] | 11.04.2008 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2008/36] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.10.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0544405 (THE TECHNOLOGY PARTNERSHIP LTD [GB]); | [A]EP0654671 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC WORKS LTD [JP]); | [X]US2003168943 (MATSUYAMA MASARU [JP], et al); | [X]WO2004077497 (1 LTD [GB], et al); | [XP]EP1528608 (NEC TOKIN CORP [JP], et al) |