EP1760430 - Geographic data collecting system [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 29.07.2016 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.07.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 31.08.2016 [2016/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Kabushiki Kaisha TOPCON 75-1, Hasunuma-cho Itabashi-ku Tokyo-to / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2007/10] | For all designated states Kabushiki Kaisha TOPCON 75-1, Hasunuma-cho Itabashi-ku Tokyo-to / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Otani, Hitoshi c/o Kabushiki Kaisha TOPCON 75-1, Hasunuma-cho Itabashi-ku, Tokyo-to / JP | 02 /
Inaba, Hiroshi c/o Kabushiki Kaisha TOPCON 75-1, Hasunuma-cho Itabashi-ku, Tokyo-to / JP | 03 /
Ishida, Takeshi c/o Kabushiki Kaisha TOPCON 75-1, Hasunuma-cho Itabashi-ku, Tokyo-to / JP | 04 /
Tanahashi, Atsushi c/o Kabushiki Kaisha TOPCON 75-1, Hasunuma-cho Itabashi-ku, Tokyo-to / JP | 05 /
Kaneko, Junki c/o Kabushiki Kaisha TOPCON 75-1, Hasunuma-cho Itabashi-ku, Tokyo-to / JP | [2015/39] |
Former [2007/10] | 01 /
Otani, Hitoshi Kabushiki Kaisha TOPCON 75-1 Hasunuma-cho Itabashi-ku Tokyo-to / JP | ||
02 /
Inaba, Hiroshi Kabushiki Kaisha TOPCON 75-1 Hasunuma-cho Itabashi-ku Tokyo-to / JP | |||
03 /
Ishida, Takeshi Kabushiki Kaisha TOPCON 75-1 Hasunuma-cho Itabashi-ku Tokyo-to / JP | |||
04 /
Tanahashi, Atsushi Kabushiki Kaisha TOPCON 75-1 Hasunuma-cho Itabashi-ku Tokyo-to / JP | |||
05 /
Kaneko, Junki Kabushiki Kaisha TOPCON 75-1 Hasunuma-cho Itabashi-ku Tokyo-to / JP | Representative(s) | Louis Pöhlau Lohrentz Patentanwälte Postfach 30 55 90014 Nürnberg / DE | [2015/39] |
Former [2007/10] | LOUIS, PÖHLAU, LOHRENTZ Postfach 30 55 90014 Nürnberg / DE | Application number, filing date | 05022747.9 | 19.10.2005 | [2007/10] | Priority number, date | JP20050202047 | 11.07.2005 Original published format: JP 2005202047 | [2007/10] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1760430 | Date: | 07.03.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/10] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1760430 | Date: | 04.06.2008 | [2008/23] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1760430 | Date: | 23.09.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/39] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.05.2008 | Classification | IPC: | G01C21/00, G06F17/30, G01C15/00, G01C11/30 | [2007/10] | CPC: |
G01C11/30 (EP,US);
G01C15/00 (EP,US);
G01C21/005 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, LI, SE [2015/39] |
Former [2009/07] | CH, DE, LI, SE | ||
Former [2007/10] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | System zur Erfassung von geographischen Daten | [2007/10] | English: | Geographic data collecting system | [2007/10] | French: | Système de saisie de données géographiques | [2007/10] | Examination procedure | 08.08.2008 | Examination requested [2008/39] | 15.09.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 05.12.2008 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 13.01.2009 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SI, SK, TR | 10.03.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.01.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 20.07.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.05.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.08.2015 | Fee for grant paid | 12.08.2015 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 12.08.2015 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 15.09.2008 | Opposition(s) | 24.06.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit [2016/35] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 04.09.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.09.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.10.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 16.10.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 13.10.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 23.10.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 16.10.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 11.10.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4717251 (WELLS LEON W [US], et al) [A] 1* column 4, line 11 - column 10, line 3; figures 1-4c *; | [X]US5671451 (TAKAHASHI YOSHIHARU [JP], et al) [X] 1-4,11 * column 2, line 46 - column 3, line 5; figures 1-14 * * column 5, line 5 - column 6, line 13 * * column 7, line 13 - column 11, line 39 *; | [A]EP1219925 (TOPCON CORP [JP]) [A] 1-11 * paragraphs [0016] - [0060]; figures 1-7 * |