EP1701566 - Data encryption and access control based on bluetooth device proximity [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.01.2012 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.08.2012 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 12.09.2012 [2012/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Broadcom Corporation 5300 California Avenue Irvine, CA 92617 / US | [2007/21] |
Former [2006/37] | For all designated states Broadcom Corporation 16215 Alton Parkway Irvine, CA 92618-7013 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Eisenbach, Andre 11506 Hadar Dr. San Diego, CA 92126 / US | [2006/37] | Representative(s) | Jehle, Volker Armin, et al Bosch Jehle Patentanwaltsgesellschaft mbH Flüggenstrasse 13 80639 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/52] | Jehle, Volker Armin, et al Bosch Jehle Patentanwaltsgesellschaft mbH Flüggenstrasse 13 80639 München / DE | ||
Former [2006/37] | Jehle, Volker Armin Bosch Graf von Stosch Jehle Patentanwaltsgesellschaft mbH Flüggenstrasse 13 80639 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 05022891.5 | 20.10.2005 | [2006/37] | Priority number, date | US20050074271 | 07.03.2005 Original published format: US 74271 | [2006/37] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1701566 | Date: | 13.09.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/37] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1701566 | Date: | 09.03.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/10] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.06.2006 | Classification | IPC: | H04W12/02 | [2010/25] | CPC: |
G06F21/6218 (EP,US);
H04L63/0428 (EP,US);
H04L63/0492 (EP,US);
H04L63/126 (EP,US);
H04L9/08 (EP,US);
H04W12/02 (EP,US);
H04W12/08 (EP,US);
G06F2221/2129 (EP,US);
H04L2209/80 (EP,US);
H04W12/63 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2006/37] | H04Q7/38, H04L12/56 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2007/20] |
Former [2006/37] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Datenverschlüsselung und Zugriffsteuerung basierend auf Bluetoothgeräteabstand | [2006/37] | English: | Data encryption and access control based on bluetooth device proximity | [2006/37] | French: | Cryptage de données et contrôle d'accès basé sur la proximité d'un appareil bluetooth | [2006/37] | Examination procedure | 13.03.2007 | Examination requested [2007/17] | 12.04.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.06.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.11.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.03.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.10.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.01.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 25.01.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 12.12.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2012/07] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.10.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.10.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.11.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 02.11.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | FR | 02.11.2011 | [2012/37] | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US6088450 (DAVIS DEREK L [US], et al) [X] 1-10 * column 2, line 24 - line 58 *; | [A]US6092201 (TURNBULL JAMES ARTHUR [CA], et al) [A] 1,5,8* column 9, line 38 - line 43 *; | [X]US2003199267 (IWASA NAOKI [JP], et al) [X] 1-10 * column 11 - column 16 * * column 44 - column 51 *; | [X]US2004029563 (BERG THORNSTEN [US]) [X] 1-10 * paragraph [0006] - paragraph [0010] *; | [X]US2004123106 (D ANGELO MICHAEL R [US], et al) [X] 1-10 * paragraph [0018]; figures 2,3 * * paragraph [0067] * | by applicant | US2003199267 | US2004123106 |