EP1659528 - Merchandise sales data processing apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 02.10.2009 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.10.2009 | Refusal of application | published on 04.11.2009 [2009/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Toshiba TEC Kabushiki Kaisha 2-17-2, Higashigotanda Shinagawa-ku Tokyo 141-8664 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2006/21] | For all designated states Toshiba Tec Kabushiki Kaisha 2-17-2, Higashigotanda Shinagawa-ku Tokyo 141-8664 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Nishikawa, Hiroshi c/o Intel. Property Division Toshiba Tec K. K. 2-17-2, Higashigotanda Shinagawa-ku Tokyo 141-8664 / JP | [2006/21] | Representative(s) | Kramer Barske Schmidtchen Patentanwälte PartG mbB European Patent Attorneys Landsberger Strasse 300 80687 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/39] | Kramer - Barske - Schmidtchen European Patent Attorneys Landsberger Strasse 300 80687 München / DE | ||
Former [2006/21] | Kramer - Barske - Schmidtchen Radeckestrasse 43 81245 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 05023284.2 | 25.10.2005 | [2006/21] | Priority number, date | JP20040315198 | 29.10.2004 Original published format: JP 2004315198 | [2006/21] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1659528 | Date: | 24.05.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/21] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.04.2006 | Classification | IPC: | G06Q20/00, G07F17/42 | [2006/21] | CPC: |
G07G1/12 (EP,US);
G06F3/0224 (EP,US);
G06F3/0238 (EP,US);
G06Q20/20 (EP,US);
G07G5/00 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2007/05] |
Former [2006/21] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zur Verarbeitung von Warenumsatzdaten | [2006/21] | English: | Merchandise sales data processing apparatus | [2006/21] | French: | Appareil de traitement de données de ventes d'articles | [2006/21] | Examination procedure | 25.10.2005 | Examination requested [2006/21] | 27.07.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.11.2006 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 05.12.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.03.2007 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 14.05.2009 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2009/45] | 14.05.2009 | Date of oral proceedings | 17.06.2009 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2009/45] | 17.06.2009 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.10.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.10.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 03.01.2007 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 03.01.2007 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 03.01.2007 | BG   M01   Not yet paid | 03.01.2007 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 03.01.2007 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 03.01.2007 | CZ   M01   Not yet paid | 03.01.2007 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 03.01.2007 | EE   M01   Not yet paid | 03.01.2007 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 03.01.2007 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 03.01.2007 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 03.01.2007 | HU   M01   Not yet paid | 03.01.2007 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 03.01.2007 | IS   M01   Not yet paid | 03.01.2007 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | 03.01.2007 | LT   M01   Not yet paid | 03.01.2007 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 03.01.2007 | LV   M01   Not yet paid | 03.01.2007 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 03.01.2007 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 03.01.2007 | PL   M01   Not yet paid | 03.01.2007 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 03.01.2007 | RO   M01   Not yet paid | 03.01.2007 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | 03.01.2007 | SI   M01   Not yet paid | 03.01.2007 | SK   M01   Not yet paid | 03.01.2007 | TR   M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US4688174 (SAKAMOTO NOBUYOSHI [JP]) [X] 1-5 * column A * * column 1, line 5 - column 2, line 17 * * column 5, line 47 - line 68 *; | [X]EP0720134 (SHARP KK [JP]) [X] 1-5 * column A * * column 1, line 5 - column 7, line 52 * * figures 1-6 *; | [A]US2002185029 (SPANO STEVEN [US]) [A] * paragraphs [0004] - [0006] * * figures 3-6 *; | [A]EP1394753 (SEIKO EPSON CORP [JP]) [A] * column A * * paragraphs [0001] - [0021] ** paragraphs [0024] - [0029] * |