EP1653636 - Control method for high frequency radio equipment and high-frequency radio system [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 24.09.2010 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.09.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 27.10.2010 [2010/43] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nihon Dempa Kogyo Co., Ltd. 21-2, Nishihara 1-chome, Shibuya-Ku Tokyo 151-0066 / JP | [2006/18] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Onishi, Naoki Nihon Dempa Kogyo Co.,Ltd 1-3-1, Kashiwadai minami Chitose Hokkaido 066-0009 / JP | [2006/18] | Representative(s) | Liesegang, Eva Boehmert & Boehmert Anwaltspartnerschaft mbB Pettenkoferstrasse 22 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2006/18] | Liesegang, Eva Forrester & Boehmert, Pettenkoferstrasse 20-22 80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 05023287.5 | 25.10.2005 | [2006/18] | Priority number, date | JP20040312968 | 27.10.2004 Original published format: JP 2004312968 | [2006/18] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1653636 | Date: | 03.05.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/18] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1653636 | Date: | 24.01.2007 | [2007/04] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.12.2006 | Classification | IPC: | H04B7/08 | [2006/18] | CPC: |
H04J13/00 (EP,US);
H04B7/0805 (EP,US);
H04B7/086 (EP,US);
G07C2209/61 (EP,US);
G07C9/00309 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [2007/39] |
Former [2006/18] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Steuerung einer Hochfrequenzvorrichtung und Hochfrequenzsystem | [2006/18] | English: | Control method for high frequency radio equipment and high-frequency radio system | [2006/18] | French: | Procédé de contrôle pour un dispositif radio haute fréquence et système radio haute fréquence | [2006/18] | Examination procedure | 25.10.2005 | Examination requested [2006/18] | 19.07.2007 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 12.03.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.07.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.05.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2010/43] | 07.06.2010 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2010/43] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.10.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.2009 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]WO9519145 (SYMBIOSIS CORP [US], et al) [Y] 5,6,10,11 * abstract * * page 3, line 3 - page 5, line 7 ** page 7, line 23 - page 9, line 7 *; | [X]EP0903456 (DELCO ELECTRONICS CORP [US]) [X] 1-4,7-9,12 * abstract * * paragraphs [0001] - [0008] - [0014] - [0017]; figure 2 *; | [Y]EP1087629 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD [JP]) [Y] 5,6,10,11 * abstract * * paragraphs [0015] , [0016] , [0024] , [0025] *; | [Y]EP1317087 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD [JP]) [Y] 5,6,10,11 * abstract * * paragraphs [0001] , [0010] , [0011] , [0023] , [0030] , [0036] - [0038] *; | [X]EP1320199 (EM MICROELECTRONIC MARIN SA [CH]) [X] 1-4,7-9,12 * abstract * * paragraphs [0001] - [0019] - [0023] - [0030]; figures 3-5 *; | [X]DE10206774 (KOSTAL LEOPOLD GMBH & CO KG [DE]) [X] 1-4,7-9,12 * the whole document *; | [Y]WO2004023378 (HONEYWELL INT INC [US]) [Y] 5,6,10,11 * abstract * * page 3, lines 8-18 * * page 4, line 15 - page 6, line 2 * * page 13, lines 1-9 *; | [X]US2004198238 (KATO AKIRA [JP], et al) [X] 1-4,7-9,12 * paragraphs [0004] - [0012] - [0026] - [0039]; figures 1-4 *; | [Y]WO2004090783 (INTERMEC IP CORP [US], et al) [Y] 5,6,10,11 * abstract * * page 1, lines 10-13 * * page 4, line 8 - page 6, line 22 * |