EP1655495 - Regenerative pump [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 07.09.2007 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.09.2007 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 10.10.2007 [2007/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states J. Eberspächer GmbH & Co. KG Eberspächerstrasse 24 73730 Esslingen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2006/19] | For all designated states J. Eberspächer GmbH Co. KG Eberspächerstrasse 24 73730 Esslingen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Fischer, Arne Kastanienweg 28 73732 Esslingen / DE | 02 /
Eberspach, Günter Seestrasse 9 73649 Wolfschlugen / DE | [2006/19] | Representative(s) | Ruttensperger, Bernhard, et al Weickmann & Weickmann Patentanwälte Postfach 86 08 20 81635 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2006/19] | Ruttensperger, Bernhard, et al Weickmann & Weickmann Patentanwälte Postfach 86 08 20 81635 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 05023547.2 | 27.10.2005 | [2006/19] | Priority number, date | DE20041053603 | 05.11.2004 Original published format: DE102004053603 | [2006/19] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1655495 | Date: | 10.05.2006 | Language: | DE | [2006/19] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.12.2005 | Classification | IPC: | F04D29/00 | [2006/19] | CPC: |
F04D25/0613 (EP);
F04D23/008 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, CZ, DE, PL, SE [2007/03] |
Former [2006/19] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Seitenkanalgebläse | [2006/19] | English: | Regenerative pump | [2006/19] | French: | Pompe régénérative | [2006/19] | Examination procedure | 10.11.2006 | Examination requested [2006/52] | 02.12.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.05.2007 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2007/41] | 22.05.2007 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2007/41] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US3601507 (HARRIS DWIGHT E) [X] 1-3,7 * the whole document *; | [X]US3844674 (MORIYAMA K) [X] 1 * the whole document *; | [A]DE19849836 (WEBASTO THERMOSYSTEME GMBH [DE]) [A] 1 * the whole document *; | [A]US6149404 (DOBLER KLAUS [DE], et al) [A] 1* the whole document *; | [A]DE10032984 (BECKER KG GEBR [DE]) [A] 1 * the whole document *; | [A]EP1467102 (EBERSPAECHER J GMBH & CO [DE]) [A] 1 * the whole document * |