EP1631024 - Method for streaming data between a server and a client [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 22.11.2013 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2015 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 19.08.2015 [2015/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Microsoft Corporation One Microsoft Way Redmond, WA 98052 / US | [2013/03] |
Former [2006/09] | For all designated states Microsoft Corporation One Microsoft Way Redmond WA 98052 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Warren, Joseph R. 5106 NE 21st Street Renton Washington 98059 / US | 02 /
Zhong, Min 742 Kirkland Circle No.E205 Kirkland Washington 98033 / US | 03 /
Froelich, Karl 20035 12th Avenue NE Shoreline Washington 98155 / US | 04 /
Bonilla, Nicole A. 8127 149th Place NE Apt. 303A Redmond Washington 98052 / US | 05 /
Novitskey, Robert R. 22433 NE 101st Street Redmond Washington 98053 / US | 06 /
Dun, Alec 16018 NE 44th Ct. Redmond Washington 98052 / US | 07 /
Gray, Ronald Eric 10310 186th Ct. NE Redmond Washington 98052 / US | 08 /
Hartwell, Aaron 27309 NE 155th Place Duvall WA 98019 / US | 09 /
Goddard, Steven F. 357 Galer Street Seattle WA 98109 / US | 10 /
Power, Brendan 5215 39th Avenue NE Seattle WA 98105 / US | [2013/03] |
Former [2006/09] | 01 /
Warren, Joseph R. 5106 NE 21st Street Renton Washington 98059 / US | ||
02 /
Zhong, Min 742 Kirkland Circle No.E205 Kirkland Washington 98033 / US | |||
03 /
Froelich, Karl 20035 12th Avenue NE Shoreline Washington 98155 / US | |||
04 /
Bonilla, Nicole A. 8127 149th Place NE Apt. 303A Redmond Washington 98052 / US | |||
05 /
Novitskey, Robert R. 22433 NE 101st Street Redmond Washington 98053 / US | |||
06 /
Dun, Alec 16018 NE 44th Ct. Redmond Washington 98052 / US | |||
07 /
Gray, Ronald Eric 10310 186th Ct. NE Redmond Washington 98052 / US | |||
08 /
Hartwell, Aaron 27309 NE 155th Place Duvall WA 98019 / US | |||
09 /
Goddard, Steven F. 357 Galer Street Seattle WA 98109 / US | |||
10 /
Power, Brendan 5215 39th Avenue NE Seattle WA 98105 / US | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstraße 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2013/03] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | ||
Former [2006/09] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Maximilianstrasse 58 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 05023564.7 | 03.12.2003 | [2006/09] | Priority number, date | US20030437869P | 03.01.2003 Original published format: US 437869 P | US20030367161 | 14.02.2003 Original published format: US 367161 | [2006/09] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1631024 | Date: | 01.03.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/09] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1631024 | Date: | 31.05.2006 | [2006/22] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1631024 | Date: | 16.01.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/03] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.04.2006 | Classification | IPC: | H04L12/58 | [2006/09] | CPC: |
H04L51/234 (EP);
H04L51/21 (KR);
H04L69/08 (US);
H04L51/00 (US);
H04L51/066 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/09] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Datenströmung zwischen einem Server und einem Client | [2006/09] | English: | Method for streaming data between a server and a client | [2006/09] | French: | Procédé pour la transmission continue de données entre un serveur et un client | [2006/09] | Examination procedure | 27.10.2005 | Examination requested [2006/09] | 16.11.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.03.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.11.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.03.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.06.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 31.10.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 31.10.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP03027780.0 / EP1435711 | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20030027780) is 08.06.2005 | Opposition(s) | 17.10.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit [2013/52] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.10.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.12.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.12.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 11.12.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 15.12.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 12.12.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 07.12.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 03.12.2003 | AT | 16.01.2013 | BE | 16.01.2013 | CY | 16.01.2013 | CZ | 16.01.2013 | DK | 16.01.2013 | EE | 16.01.2013 | FI | 16.01.2013 | IT | 16.01.2013 | MC | 16.01.2013 | NL | 16.01.2013 | RO | 16.01.2013 | SE | 16.01.2013 | SI | 16.01.2013 | SK | 16.01.2013 | TR | 16.01.2013 | BG | 16.04.2013 | GR | 17.04.2013 | ES | 27.04.2013 | PT | 16.05.2013 | [2015/34] |
Former [2015/32] | AT | 16.01.2013 | |
BE | 16.01.2013 | ||
CY | 16.01.2013 | ||
CZ | 16.01.2013 | ||
DK | 16.01.2013 | ||
EE | 16.01.2013 | ||
FI | 16.01.2013 | ||
IT | 16.01.2013 | ||
MC | 16.01.2013 | ||
NL | 16.01.2013 | ||
RO | 16.01.2013 | ||
SE | 16.01.2013 | ||
SI | 16.01.2013 | ||
SK | 16.01.2013 | ||
TR | 16.01.2013 | ||
BG | 16.04.2013 | ||
GR | 17.04.2013 | ||
ES | 27.04.2013 | ||
PT | 16.05.2013 | ||
Former [2015/30] | AT | 16.01.2013 | |
BE | 16.01.2013 | ||
CY | 16.01.2013 | ||
CZ | 16.01.2013 | ||
DK | 16.01.2013 | ||
EE | 16.01.2013 | ||
FI | 16.01.2013 | ||
IT | 16.01.2013 | ||
MC | 16.01.2013 | ||
NL | 16.01.2013 | ||
RO | 16.01.2013 | ||
SE | 16.01.2013 | ||
SI | 16.01.2013 | ||
SK | 16.01.2013 | ||
BG | 16.04.2013 | ||
GR | 17.04.2013 | ||
ES | 27.04.2013 | ||
PT | 16.05.2013 | ||
Former [2014/33] | AT | 16.01.2013 | |
BE | 16.01.2013 | ||
CZ | 16.01.2013 | ||
DK | 16.01.2013 | ||
EE | 16.01.2013 | ||
FI | 16.01.2013 | ||
IT | 16.01.2013 | ||
MC | 16.01.2013 | ||
NL | 16.01.2013 | ||
RO | 16.01.2013 | ||
SE | 16.01.2013 | ||
SI | 16.01.2013 | ||
SK | 16.01.2013 | ||
BG | 16.04.2013 | ||
GR | 17.04.2013 | ||
ES | 27.04.2013 | ||
PT | 16.05.2013 | ||
Former [2014/03] | AT | 16.01.2013 | |
BE | 16.01.2013 | ||
CZ | 16.01.2013 | ||
DK | 16.01.2013 | ||
EE | 16.01.2013 | ||
FI | 16.01.2013 | ||
IT | 16.01.2013 | ||
NL | 16.01.2013 | ||
RO | 16.01.2013 | ||
SE | 16.01.2013 | ||
SI | 16.01.2013 | ||
SK | 16.01.2013 | ||
BG | 16.04.2013 | ||
GR | 17.04.2013 | ||
ES | 27.04.2013 | ||
PT | 16.05.2013 | ||
Former [2013/49] | AT | 16.01.2013 | |
BE | 16.01.2013 | ||
CZ | 16.01.2013 | ||
DK | 16.01.2013 | ||
EE | 16.01.2013 | ||
FI | 16.01.2013 | ||
NL | 16.01.2013 | ||
RO | 16.01.2013 | ||
SE | 16.01.2013 | ||
SI | 16.01.2013 | ||
SK | 16.01.2013 | ||
BG | 16.04.2013 | ||
GR | 17.04.2013 | ||
ES | 27.04.2013 | ||
PT | 16.05.2013 | ||
Former [2013/48] | AT | 16.01.2013 | |
BE | 16.01.2013 | ||
DK | 16.01.2013 | ||
EE | 16.01.2013 | ||
FI | 16.01.2013 | ||
NL | 16.01.2013 | ||
SE | 16.01.2013 | ||
SI | 16.01.2013 | ||
BG | 16.04.2013 | ||
GR | 17.04.2013 | ||
ES | 27.04.2013 | ||
PT | 16.05.2013 | ||
Former [2013/40] | AT | 16.01.2013 | |
BE | 16.01.2013 | ||
FI | 16.01.2013 | ||
NL | 16.01.2013 | ||
SE | 16.01.2013 | ||
SI | 16.01.2013 | ||
BG | 16.04.2013 | ||
GR | 17.04.2013 | ||
ES | 27.04.2013 | ||
PT | 16.05.2013 | ||
Former [2013/37] | AT | 16.01.2013 | |
BE | 16.01.2013 | ||
FI | 16.01.2013 | ||
NL | 16.01.2013 | ||
SE | 16.01.2013 | ||
SI | 16.01.2013 | ||
BG | 16.04.2013 | ||
GR | 17.04.2013 | ||
ES | 27.04.2013 | ||
Former [2013/36] | AT | 16.01.2013 | |
BE | 16.01.2013 | ||
SE | 16.01.2013 | ||
BG | 16.04.2013 | ||
ES | 27.04.2013 | ||
Former [2013/35] | BE | 16.01.2013 | |
SE | 16.01.2013 | ||
BG | 16.04.2013 | ||
Former [2013/34] | SE | 16.01.2013 | |
BG | 16.04.2013 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO9325962 (IBM [US], et al) [A] 1-4 * page 4, line 1 - line 12 * * page 4, line 31 - page 5, line L * * figure 4 * * figure 5 *; | [X]EP0924921 (TOYOTA MOTOR CO LTD [JP]) [X] 1-4 * abstract * * paragraph [0031] - paragraph [0040] * * figure 3 * * figure 4 *; | [A]US6134582 (KENNEDY KEVIN ALAN [US]) [A] 1-4 * abstract * * column 17, line 34 - column 18, line 3 * * figure 5c *; | [A] - BIRREL A D ET AL, "IMPLEMENTING REMOTE PROCEDURE CALLS", ACM TRANSACTIONS ON COMPUTER SYSTEMS, (198402), vol. 2, no. 1, ISSN 0734-2071, pages 39 - 59, XP002161384 [A] 1-4 * abstract * * section 1 * * section 3 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1145/2080.357392 | [A] - SRINIVASAN S, "RFC 1831: RPC: Remote Procedure Call Protocol Specification Version 2", INTERNET ENGINEERING TASK FORCE, (199508), XP015007618 [A] 1-4 * abstract * * section 3 * * section 8 * | [A] - CRISPIN M, "INTERNET MESSAGE ACCESS PROTOCOL - VERSION 4rev1", INTERNET ENGINEERING TASK FORCE, (199612), XP015007844 [A] 1-4 * section 6.4.5 * * section 6.3.8 * * section 7.2.2 * * section 7.4.2 * |