EP1652538 - Autologous platelet gel on a stent graft [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 29.10.2010 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.10.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 01.12.2010 [2010/48] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Medtronic Vascular, Inc. 3576 Unocal Place Santa Rosa, CA 95403 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2008/41] | For all designated states Medtronic Vascular, Inc. 3576 Unocal Place Santa Rosa CA 95403 / US | ||
Former [2006/18] | For all designated states Medtronic Vascular, Inc. 3576 Unocal Place Santa Rosa, CA 95403 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Fernandes, Brian 474 Woodhill Drive Roseville, Minnesota 55113 / US | 02 /
Chu, Jack 5918 Sunhawk Drive Santa Rosa California 95409 / US | [2006/18] | Representative(s) | Zimmermann, Gerd Heinrich, et al Zimmermann & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Postfach 330 920 80069 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2006/18] | Zimmermann, Gerd Heinrich, et al Zimmermann & Partner, P.O. Box 33 09 20 80069 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 05023682.7 | 28.10.2005 | [2006/18] | Priority number, date | US20040977545 | 28.10.2004 Original published format: US 977545 | [2006/18] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1652538 | Date: | 03.05.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/18] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1652538 | Date: | 31.01.2007 | [2007/05] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.01.2007 | Classification | IPC: | A61L27/36, A61L27/54, // A61L29/16 | [2007/05] | CPC: |
A61L27/3616 (EP,US);
A61L27/3641 (EP,US);
A61L27/3645 (EP,US);
A61L27/54 (EP,US);
A61L2300/414 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2006/18] | A61L27/36, A61L27/54 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IE, IT [2007/40] |
Former [2006/18] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Autologes Blutplättchengel auf einem Stent-Graft | [2006/18] | English: | Autologous platelet gel on a stent graft | [2006/18] | French: | Gel de plaquette autologue sur un stent-graft | [2006/18] | Examination procedure | 31.07.2007 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 31.07.2007 | Examination requested [2007/37] | 14.02.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.06.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.05.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2010/48] | 02.07.2010 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2010/48] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.10.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 07.10.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.2009 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO0040278 (ANGIOTECH PHARM INC [CA], et al) [X] 1-17 * page 3, line 20 - page 4, line 29 * * page 7, line 23 - page 9, line 23 * * page 11, line 21 - page 12, line 23 * * page 14, line 25 - page 15, line 31 * * page 17, line 8 - page 19, line 8 * * examples 1-15 * * claims 1-36 *; | [A]WO0143787 (SACCHI MARIA CRISTINA [IT], et al) [A] 1-17* the whole document *; | [X]WO02087610 (XENERATE AB [SE], et al) [X] 1-17 * the whole document *; | [X]WO03043539 (SCIMED LIFE SYSTEMS INC [US]) [X] 1-17 * page 3, paragraph 9 - page 5, paragraph 13 * * page 7, paragraph 25 * * page 8, paragraph 28 - page 9, paragraph 29 * * page 10, paragraph 32 - page 11, paragraph 34 * * claims 1-61 * * figures 4,5 *; | [X]WO03065881 (ORBUS MEDICAL TECHNOLOGIES INC [US]) [X] 1-17 * page 12, paragraph 48 - page 14, paragraph 56 * * page 15, paragraph 59 * * claims 1-71 * |