EP1779754 - Shower board with drain channel system [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 24.09.2010 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.09.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 27.10.2010 [2010/43] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Preissing, Dieter Baltmannsweiler Strasse 28 73262 Reichenbach / DE | [2007/18] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2007/18] | Representative(s) | Reinhardt, Thomas Johannes Reinhardt - IP - Patentanwaltskanzlei Wilhelmshöher Allee 305 34131 Kassel / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/52] | Reinhardt, Thomas Johannes Patentanwaltskanzlei Reinhardt WilhelmshöherAllee 23 34117 Kassel / DE | ||
Former [2007/18] | Reinhardt, Thomas Johannes Patentanwaltskanzlei REINHARDT Wilhelmshöher Allee 23 34117 Kassel / DE | Application number, filing date | 05023746.0 | 29.10.2005 | [2007/18] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1779754 | Date: | 02.05.2007 | Language: | DE | [2007/18] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.03.2006 | Classification | IPC: | A47K3/40 | [2007/18] | CPC: |
A47K3/405 (EP);
A47K3/40 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/18] | Title | German: | Duschboard mit Rinnensystem | [2007/18] | English: | Shower board with drain channel system | [2007/18] | French: | Planche de douche avec système de canal d'écoulement | [2007/18] | Examination procedure | 24.11.2005 | Examination requested [2007/18] | 17.10.2007 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 01.05.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2010/43] | 10.06.2010 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2010/43] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.10.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.10.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.2009 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0953310 (KRAJEWSKI BERND [DE]); | [A]US6240578 (PLANELLA MANUEL LAGARES [ES]) [A] 1-6,10 * column 2, line 30 - column 3, line 40; figure - *; | [XA]EP1181883 (KALDEWEI FRANZ GMBH & CO [DE]) [X] 1,5,6,18 * the whole document * [A] 10,11,13; | [XA]DE20307360U (MAIER SIEGFRIED [DE]) [X] 1,5,6,8,18 * the whole document * [A] 18 |