EP1655616 - Refrigerator-cooled NMR spectrometer [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.11.2008 Database last updated on 03.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.11.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 17.12.2008 [2008/51] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Bruker BioSpin AG Industriestrasse 26 8117 Fällanden / CH | [2006/19] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Triebe, René Roswiesenstrasse 22 8051 Zürich / CH | 02 /
Marek, Daniel Marchsteinweg 2 5103 Möriken AG / CH | 03 /
Schett, Oskar Im Güene 33 8610 Uster / CH | 04 /
Baumann, Daniel Guy Unterdorf 1a Rumlikon 8332 Russikon ZH / CH | [2006/19] | Representative(s) | Kohler Schmid Möbus Patentanwälte Partnerschaftsgesellschaft mbB Gropiusplatz 10 70563 Stuttgart / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2006/19] | Kohler Schmid Möbus Patentanwälte Ruppmannstrasse 27 70565 Stuttgart / DE | Application number, filing date | 05023833.6 | 02.11.2005 | [2006/19] | Priority number, date | DE20041053973 | 09.11.2004 Original published format: DE102004053973 | [2006/19] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1655616 | Date: | 10.05.2006 | Language: | DE | [2006/19] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1655616 | Date: | 09.01.2008 | Language: | DE | [2008/02] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.01.2006 | Classification | IPC: | G01R33/3815 | [2006/19] | CPC: |
F25D19/006 (EP,US);
G01R33/3804 (EP,US);
F25B9/10 (EP,US);
G01R33/34023 (EP,US);
G01R33/34092 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, GB, LI [2007/03] |
Former [2006/19] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | NMR-Spektrometer mit Refrigeratorkühlung | [2006/19] | English: | Refrigerator-cooled NMR spectrometer | [2006/19] | French: | Spectromètre à RMN avec refroidissement par réfrigérateur | [2006/19] | Examination procedure | 26.01.2006 | Examination requested [2006/19] | 06.09.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.11.2006 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 19.12.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 19.12.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 01.03.2007 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Opposition(s) | 10.10.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit [2008/51] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.11.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 15.12.2006 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 15.12.2006 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 15.12.2006 | BG   M01   Not yet paid | 15.12.2006 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 15.12.2006 | CZ   M01   Not yet paid | 15.12.2006 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 15.12.2006 | EE   M01   Not yet paid | 15.12.2006 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 15.12.2006 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 15.12.2006 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 15.12.2006 | HU   M01   Not yet paid | 15.12.2006 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 15.12.2006 | IS   M01   Not yet paid | 15.12.2006 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | 15.12.2006 | LT   M01   Not yet paid | 15.12.2006 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 15.12.2006 | LV   M01   Not yet paid | 15.12.2006 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 15.12.2006 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 15.12.2006 | PL   M01   Not yet paid | 15.12.2006 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 15.12.2006 | RO   M01   Not yet paid | 15.12.2006 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | 15.12.2006 | SI   M01   Not yet paid | 15.12.2006 | SK   M01   Not yet paid | 15.12.2006 | TR   M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JP2004219361 ; | [A]US4796433 (BARTLETT ALLEN J [US]) [A] 1-4,6-15 * column 4, line 9 - column 8, line 20; figures 1-3 *; | [A]EP0878718 (SPECTROSPIN AG [CH]) [A] 1,3,5-7,9-13 * page 4, line 30 - page 9, line 9; figures 1-6 *; | [A]WO03023433 (OXFORD INSTR SUPERCONDUCTIVITY [GB], et al) [A] 1,2,8-12,14* siehe das ganze Dokument * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (20031205), vol. 2003, no. 12, & JP2004219361 A 20040805 (JEOL LTD) [A] 1,3,5-7,9-13 * abstract * |