EP1655400 - Fiber mat bound with a formaldehyde free binder, asphalt coated mat and methods [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 26.10.2007 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.10.2007 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 28.11.2007 [2007/48] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Johns Manville International, Inc. 717 17th Street Denver, CO 80202 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2006/19] | For all designated states Johns Manville International, Inc. 717 17th Street Denver Colorado 80202 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Garcia, Ruben Gregory 5392 South Holland Street Littleton Colorado 80123 / US | 02 /
Scheerlinck, Philippe Marie 9052 West Wisconsin Avenue Lakewood Colorado 80232 / US | 03 /
Jaffee, Alan Michael 822 Touraine Avenue Bowling Green Ohio 43402 / US | 04 /
Wang, Lance 17558 East Cloudberry Drive Parker Colorado 80134 / US | [2006/19] | Representative(s) | Mai, Oppermann & Partner i.L. Patentanwälte John-F.-Kennedy-Strasse 4 65189 Wiesbaden / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2006/19] | Luderschmidt, Schüler & Partner GbR Patentanwälte, John-F.-Kennedy-Strasse 4 65189 Wiesbaden / DE | Application number, filing date | 05023835.1 | 02.11.2005 | [2006/19] | Priority number, date | US20040983871 | 08.11.2004 Original published format: US 983871 | [2006/19] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1655400 | Date: | 10.05.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/19] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.02.2006 | Classification | IPC: | D04H13/00 | [2006/19] | CPC: |
D04H1/4218 (EP,US);
Y10T442/60 (EP,US);
Y10T442/631 (EP,US);
Y10T442/652 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/19] | Title | German: | Fasermate mit formaldehydfreien Bindemittel, Asphaltbeschichtete Mate und Verfahren zu deren Herstellung | [2006/19] | English: | Fiber mat bound with a formaldehyde free binder, asphalt coated mat and methods | [2006/19] | French: | Mat de fibres lié par une resine ne contenant pas de formaldehyde, mat enduit d'asphalte et leurs méthodes de fabrication | [2006/19] | Examination procedure | 02.11.2006 | Examination requested [2006/50] | 30.11.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 12.06.2007 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2007/48] | 13.07.2007 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2007/48] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US5116890 (FLOYD WILLIAM C [US], et al) [X] 1,13 * column 3, line 3 - line 5 * * column 14, line 31 - line 43 *; | [X]EP0712953 (GOODRICH CO B F [US]) [X] 1,13 * page 2, line 41 - line 50 * * page 7, line 55 - page 8, line 5 *; | [X]US2004163724 (TRABBOLD MARK [US], et al) [X] 1,3-6* paragraphs [0009] , [0031] , [0072]; claims 24,54 *; | [PX]EP1582344 (BASF AG [DE]) [PX] 1,2,4-12,14,15 * paragraphs [0016] , [0019] , [0023] , [0037] * |