EP1657468 - Vibration damper [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 29.03.2013 Database last updated on 26.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.07.2014 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 20.08.2014 [2014/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ZF Friedrichshafen AG Graf-von-Soden-Platz 1 88046 Friedrichshafen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2006/20] | For all designated states ZF Friedrichshafen AG Graf-von-Soden-Platz 1 88046 Friedrichshafen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Miller, Alexander Tannenweg 3 a 96123 Litzendorf / DE | 02 /
Thomä, Achim, Dr. Schleifweg 55 97493 Bergrheinfeld / DE | 03 /
Stretz, Klaus Im Wehrlein 17 97437 Hassfurt / DE | 04 /
Gilsdorf, Heinz-Joachim Siedlerstrasse 8 97499 Donnersdorf / DE | [2006/20] | Representative(s) | (deleted) | [2012/21] | Application number, filing date | 05023919.3 | 03.11.2005 | [2006/20] | Priority number, date | DE20041054206 | 10.11.2004 Original published format: DE102004054206 | [2006/20] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1657468 | Date: | 17.05.2006 | Language: | DE | [2006/20] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1657468 | Date: | 23.05.2012 | Language: | DE | [2012/21] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.03.2006 | Classification | IPC: | F16F9/32, F16F9/54 | [2006/20] | CPC: |
F16F9/3221 (EP);
F16F9/54 (EP);
B60G2204/4502 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/20] | Title | German: | Schwingungsdämpfer | [2006/20] | English: | Vibration damper | [2006/20] | French: | Amortisseur de vibrations | [2006/20] | Examination procedure | 25.03.2006 | Examination requested [2006/21] | 14.07.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.11.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.12.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.04.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.12.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.03.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 30.03.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 14.07.2006 | Opposition(s) | 26.02.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit [2013/18] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.11.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.11.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.11.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.11.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 14.11.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 03.11.2005 | CY | 23.05.2012 | CZ | 23.05.2012 | DK | 23.05.2012 | EE | 23.05.2012 | FI | 23.05.2012 | IT | 23.05.2012 | LT | 23.05.2012 | LV | 23.05.2012 | NL | 23.05.2012 | PL | 23.05.2012 | RO | 23.05.2012 | SE | 23.05.2012 | SI | 23.05.2012 | SK | 23.05.2012 | TR | 23.05.2012 | BG | 23.08.2012 | GR | 24.08.2012 | ES | 03.09.2012 | IS | 23.09.2012 | PT | 24.09.2012 | GB | 03.11.2012 | IE | 03.11.2012 | LU | 03.11.2012 | AT | 30.11.2012 | BE | 30.11.2012 | CH | 30.11.2012 | LI | 30.11.2012 | MC | 30.11.2012 | [2014/34] |
Former [2014/27] | CY | 23.05.2012 | |
CZ | 23.05.2012 | ||
DK | 23.05.2012 | ||
EE | 23.05.2012 | ||
FI | 23.05.2012 | ||
IT | 23.05.2012 | ||
LT | 23.05.2012 | ||
LV | 23.05.2012 | ||
NL | 23.05.2012 | ||
PL | 23.05.2012 | ||
RO | 23.05.2012 | ||
SE | 23.05.2012 | ||
SI | 23.05.2012 | ||
SK | 23.05.2012 | ||
TR | 23.05.2012 | ||
BG | 23.08.2012 | ||
GR | 24.08.2012 | ||
ES | 03.09.2012 | ||
IS | 23.09.2012 | ||
PT | 24.09.2012 | ||
GB | 03.11.2012 | ||
IE | 03.11.2012 | ||
LU | 03.11.2012 | ||
AT | 30.11.2012 | ||
BE | 30.11.2012 | ||
CH | 30.11.2012 | ||
LI | 30.11.2012 | ||
MC | 30.11.2012 | ||
Former [2014/21] | CY | 23.05.2012 | |
CZ | 23.05.2012 | ||
DK | 23.05.2012 | ||
EE | 23.05.2012 | ||
FI | 23.05.2012 | ||
IT | 23.05.2012 | ||
LT | 23.05.2012 | ||
LV | 23.05.2012 | ||
NL | 23.05.2012 | ||
PL | 23.05.2012 | ||
RO | 23.05.2012 | ||
SE | 23.05.2012 | ||
SI | 23.05.2012 | ||
SK | 23.05.2012 | ||
TR | 23.05.2012 | ||
BG | 23.08.2012 | ||
GR | 24.08.2012 | ||
ES | 03.09.2012 | ||
IS | 23.09.2012 | ||
PT | 24.09.2012 | ||
GB | 03.11.2012 | ||
IE | 03.11.2012 | ||
AT | 30.11.2012 | ||
BE | 30.11.2012 | ||
CH | 30.11.2012 | ||
LI | 30.11.2012 | ||
MC | 30.11.2012 | ||
Former [2014/09] | CY | 23.05.2012 | |
CZ | 23.05.2012 | ||
DK | 23.05.2012 | ||
EE | 23.05.2012 | ||
FI | 23.05.2012 | ||
IT | 23.05.2012 | ||
LT | 23.05.2012 | ||
LV | 23.05.2012 | ||
NL | 23.05.2012 | ||
PL | 23.05.2012 | ||
RO | 23.05.2012 | ||
SE | 23.05.2012 | ||
SI | 23.05.2012 | ||
SK | 23.05.2012 | ||
BG | 23.08.2012 | ||
GR | 24.08.2012 | ||
ES | 03.09.2012 | ||
IS | 23.09.2012 | ||
PT | 24.09.2012 | ||
GB | 03.11.2012 | ||
IE | 03.11.2012 | ||
AT | 30.11.2012 | ||
BE | 30.11.2012 | ||
CH | 30.11.2012 | ||
LI | 30.11.2012 | ||
Former [2013/51] | CY | 23.05.2012 | |
CZ | 23.05.2012 | ||
DK | 23.05.2012 | ||
EE | 23.05.2012 | ||
FI | 23.05.2012 | ||
IT | 23.05.2012 | ||
LT | 23.05.2012 | ||
LV | 23.05.2012 | ||
NL | 23.05.2012 | ||
PL | 23.05.2012 | ||
RO | 23.05.2012 | ||
SE | 23.05.2012 | ||
SI | 23.05.2012 | ||
SK | 23.05.2012 | ||
BG | 23.08.2012 | ||
GR | 24.08.2012 | ||
ES | 03.09.2012 | ||
IS | 23.09.2012 | ||
PT | 24.09.2012 | ||
GB | 03.11.2012 | ||
IE | 03.11.2012 | ||
BE | 30.11.2012 | ||
CH | 30.11.2012 | ||
LI | 30.11.2012 | ||
Former [2013/47] | CY | 23.05.2012 | |
CZ | 23.05.2012 | ||
DK | 23.05.2012 | ||
EE | 23.05.2012 | ||
FI | 23.05.2012 | ||
IT | 23.05.2012 | ||
LT | 23.05.2012 | ||
LV | 23.05.2012 | ||
NL | 23.05.2012 | ||
PL | 23.05.2012 | ||
RO | 23.05.2012 | ||
SE | 23.05.2012 | ||
SI | 23.05.2012 | ||
SK | 23.05.2012 | ||
BG | 23.08.2012 | ||
GR | 24.08.2012 | ||
ES | 03.09.2012 | ||
IS | 23.09.2012 | ||
PT | 24.09.2012 | ||
IE | 03.11.2012 | ||
BE | 30.11.2012 | ||
CH | 30.11.2012 | ||
LI | 30.11.2012 | ||
Former [2013/38] | CY | 23.05.2012 | |
CZ | 23.05.2012 | ||
DK | 23.05.2012 | ||
EE | 23.05.2012 | ||
FI | 23.05.2012 | ||
IT | 23.05.2012 | ||
LT | 23.05.2012 | ||
LV | 23.05.2012 | ||
NL | 23.05.2012 | ||
PL | 23.05.2012 | ||
RO | 23.05.2012 | ||
SE | 23.05.2012 | ||
SI | 23.05.2012 | ||
SK | 23.05.2012 | ||
BG | 23.08.2012 | ||
GR | 24.08.2012 | ||
ES | 03.09.2012 | ||
IS | 23.09.2012 | ||
PT | 24.09.2012 | ||
BE | 30.11.2012 | ||
CH | 30.11.2012 | ||
LI | 30.11.2012 | ||
Former [2013/34] | CY | 23.05.2012 | |
CZ | 23.05.2012 | ||
DK | 23.05.2012 | ||
EE | 23.05.2012 | ||
FI | 23.05.2012 | ||
IT | 23.05.2012 | ||
LT | 23.05.2012 | ||
LV | 23.05.2012 | ||
NL | 23.05.2012 | ||
PL | 23.05.2012 | ||
RO | 23.05.2012 | ||
SE | 23.05.2012 | ||
SI | 23.05.2012 | ||
SK | 23.05.2012 | ||
BG | 23.08.2012 | ||
GR | 24.08.2012 | ||
ES | 03.09.2012 | ||
IS | 23.09.2012 | ||
PT | 24.09.2012 | ||
CH | 30.11.2012 | ||
LI | 30.11.2012 | ||
Former [2013/33] | CY | 23.05.2012 | |
CZ | 23.05.2012 | ||
DK | 23.05.2012 | ||
EE | 23.05.2012 | ||
FI | 23.05.2012 | ||
IT | 23.05.2012 | ||
LT | 23.05.2012 | ||
LV | 23.05.2012 | ||
NL | 23.05.2012 | ||
PL | 23.05.2012 | ||
RO | 23.05.2012 | ||
SE | 23.05.2012 | ||
SI | 23.05.2012 | ||
SK | 23.05.2012 | ||
GR | 24.08.2012 | ||
ES | 03.09.2012 | ||
IS | 23.09.2012 | ||
PT | 24.09.2012 | ||
CH | 30.11.2012 | ||
LI | 30.11.2012 | ||
Former [2013/22] | CY | 23.05.2012 | |
CZ | 23.05.2012 | ||
DK | 23.05.2012 | ||
EE | 23.05.2012 | ||
FI | 23.05.2012 | ||
IT | 23.05.2012 | ||
LT | 23.05.2012 | ||
LV | 23.05.2012 | ||
NL | 23.05.2012 | ||
PL | 23.05.2012 | ||
RO | 23.05.2012 | ||
SE | 23.05.2012 | ||
SI | 23.05.2012 | ||
SK | 23.05.2012 | ||
GR | 24.08.2012 | ||
ES | 03.09.2012 | ||
IS | 23.09.2012 | ||
PT | 24.09.2012 | ||
Former [2013/11] | CY | 23.05.2012 | |
CZ | 23.05.2012 | ||
DK | 23.05.2012 | ||
EE | 23.05.2012 | ||
FI | 23.05.2012 | ||
IT | 23.05.2012 | ||
LT | 23.05.2012 | ||
LV | 23.05.2012 | ||
NL | 23.05.2012 | ||
PL | 23.05.2012 | ||
RO | 23.05.2012 | ||
SE | 23.05.2012 | ||
SI | 23.05.2012 | ||
SK | 23.05.2012 | ||
GR | 24.08.2012 | ||
IS | 23.09.2012 | ||
PT | 24.09.2012 | ||
Former [2013/10] | CY | 23.05.2012 | |
CZ | 23.05.2012 | ||
DK | 23.05.2012 | ||
EE | 23.05.2012 | ||
FI | 23.05.2012 | ||
LT | 23.05.2012 | ||
LV | 23.05.2012 | ||
NL | 23.05.2012 | ||
RO | 23.05.2012 | ||
SE | 23.05.2012 | ||
SI | 23.05.2012 | ||
SK | 23.05.2012 | ||
GR | 24.08.2012 | ||
IS | 23.09.2012 | ||
PT | 24.09.2012 | ||
Former [2013/09] | CY | 23.05.2012 | |
DK | 23.05.2012 | ||
EE | 23.05.2012 | ||
FI | 23.05.2012 | ||
LT | 23.05.2012 | ||
LV | 23.05.2012 | ||
NL | 23.05.2012 | ||
SE | 23.05.2012 | ||
SI | 23.05.2012 | ||
GR | 24.08.2012 | ||
IS | 23.09.2012 | ||
PT | 24.09.2012 | ||
Former [2013/08] | CY | 23.05.2012 | |
DK | 23.05.2012 | ||
FI | 23.05.2012 | ||
LT | 23.05.2012 | ||
LV | 23.05.2012 | ||
NL | 23.05.2012 | ||
SE | 23.05.2012 | ||
SI | 23.05.2012 | ||
GR | 24.08.2012 | ||
IS | 23.09.2012 | ||
PT | 24.09.2012 | ||
Former [2013/01] | CY | 23.05.2012 | |
FI | 23.05.2012 | ||
LT | 23.05.2012 | ||
LV | 23.05.2012 | ||
SE | 23.05.2012 | ||
SI | 23.05.2012 | ||
GR | 24.08.2012 | ||
IS | 23.09.2012 | ||
PT | 24.09.2012 | ||
Former [2012/51] | CY | 23.05.2012 | |
FI | 23.05.2012 | ||
LT | 23.05.2012 | ||
LV | 23.05.2012 | ||
SE | 23.05.2012 | ||
SI | 23.05.2012 | ||
GR | 24.08.2012 | ||
IS | 23.09.2012 | ||
Former [2012/50] | CY | 23.05.2012 | |
FI | 23.05.2012 | ||
LT | 23.05.2012 | ||
LV | 23.05.2012 | ||
SE | 23.05.2012 | ||
GR | 24.08.2012 | ||
IS | 23.09.2012 | ||
Former [2012/49] | CY | 23.05.2012 | |
FI | 23.05.2012 | ||
LT | 23.05.2012 | ||
SE | 23.05.2012 | ||
IS | 23.09.2012 | ||
Former [2012/48] | FI | 23.05.2012 | |
LT | 23.05.2012 | ||
SE | 23.05.2012 | ||
Former [2012/47] | LT | 23.05.2012 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4804169 (HASSAN MORRIS [US]) [A] 1* figure 1 *; | [X]DE19908607 (DAIMLER CHRYSLER AG [DE]) [X] 1-4,7,9,10,12 * figure 1 *; | [A]DE10308193 (ZF SACHS AG [DE]) [A] 1 * figures 1,2 * | by applicant | US4655438 | DE10126680 |