EP1782872 - Fluid filtration arrangement [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 12.11.2008 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.11.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 03.12.2008 [2008/49] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Perkins Engines Company Limited Eastfield Peterborough PE1 5NA / GB | [2007/19] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Wright, Philip G. 46 Backgate Cowbit Spalding Lincs PE12 6AP / GB | [2007/19] | Representative(s) | Wagner, Karl H. Wagner & Geyer Partnerschaft mbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Gewürzmühlstrasse 5 80538 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/33] | Wagner, Karl H. Wagner & Geyer Partnerschaft Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Gewürzmühlstrasse 5 80538 München / DE | ||
Former [2007/19] | Wagner, Karl H. WAGNER & GEYER Patentanwälte Gewürzmühlstrasse 5 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 05024146.2 | 04.11.2005 | [2007/19] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1782872 | Date: | 09.05.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/19] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.12.2005 | Classification | IPC: | B01D29/11 | [2007/19] | CPC: |
B01D29/115 (EP);
B01D29/118 (EP);
B01D29/904 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/19] | Title | German: | Fluidfilteranordnung | [2007/19] | English: | Fluid filtration arrangement | [2007/19] | French: | Systeme de filtre à fluides | [2007/19] | Examination procedure | 04.10.2007 | Examination requested [2007/46] | 02.11.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M07) | 13.06.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2008/49] | 17.07.2008 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2008/49] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 06.11.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]CH341477 (GORIOT EMMANUEL [FR]) [X] 1-6,9-11,13-20* page 2, line 29 - line 80; figures 1,2 *; | [X]US3674154 (SICARD MARCEL CLARENCE) [X] 1-8,11,13-15 * abstract *; | [X]DE3721020 (DEBRECENI MEZOEGAZDASAGI [HU]) [X] 1-6,11,13-19 * abstract * * column 1, line 42 - column 2, line 24 *; | [X]US6319417 (RODIBAUGH SCOTT A [US]) [X] 1-6,9-15 * abstract * * column 1, line 56 - line 67 * * column 4, line 52 - column 5, line 7 * * column 5, line 27 - column 6, line 11 * |