EP1657801 - Rotor for an electrical machine and manufacturing method for a rotor [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 05.09.2008 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.09.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 08.10.2008 [2008/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MINEBEA Co., Ltd. 4106-73 Oaza Miyota, Miyota-machi Kitasaku-gun, Nagano-ken 3849-2100 / JP | [2006/20] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hauger, Willi Erlenstrasse 48 78050 Villingen-Schwenningen / DE | [2006/20] | Representative(s) | Liesegang, Eva Boehmert & Boehmert Anwaltspartnerschaft mbB Pettenkoferstrasse 22 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2006/20] | Liesegang, Eva Forrester & Boehmert, Pettenkoferstrasse 20-22 80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 05024339.3 | 08.11.2005 | [2006/20] | Priority number, date | DE20041054277 | 10.11.2004 Original published format: DE102004054277 | [2006/20] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1657801 | Date: | 17.05.2006 | Language: | DE | [2006/20] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1657801 | Date: | 19.09.2007 | [2007/38] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.08.2007 | Classification | IPC: | H02K1/27, H02K15/03 | [2006/20] | CPC: |
H02K1/2773 (EP,US);
H02K15/03 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | [2008/22] |
Former [2006/20] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Rotoranordnung für eine elektrische Maschine und Verfahren zur Herstellung einer Rotoranordnung | [2006/20] | English: | Rotor for an electrical machine and manufacturing method for a rotor | [2006/20] | French: | Rotor pour une machine électrique et procédé de fabrication d'un rotor | [2006/20] | Examination procedure | 20.03.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2008/41] | 19.05.2008 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2008/41] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.2007 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JP2002262496 (HITACHI LTD, et al) [X] 1-10 * figures 1,6-8,13,14 * * claim 1 ** abstract *; | [X]JP2004248443 (NIPPON YUSOKI CO LTD) [X] 1,6-10 * paragraph [0017] * * figures 1,2 * * abstract * | by applicant | EP0691727 |