EP1630156 - Sertraline hydrochloride polymorphs [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 27.11.2009 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.11.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 30.12.2009 [2009/53] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd 5 Basel Street PO Box 3190 49131 Petah Tiqva / IL | [N/P] |
Former [2006/09] | For all designated states Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd 5 Basel Street PO Box 1390 49131 Petah Tiqva / IL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Schwartz, Eduard 68 Carmel Street Rechovot 76305 / IL | 02 /
Nidam, Tamar Rechov Weizman 53/40 Yehud / IL | 03 /
Mendelovici, Marioara Rechov Hadar 6/12 Rechovot / IL | 04 /
Aronhime, Judith 5a Harav Maor Yosef Street Rehovot, 76305 / IL | 05 /
Singer, Claude 8 David Elazar Street Kfar Saba / IL | [2006/24] |
Former [2006/09] | 01 /
Schwartz, Eduard Remez 70 Rechovot / IL | ||
02 /
Nidam, Tamar Rechov Weizman 53/40 Yehud / IL | |||
03 /
Mendelovici, Marioara Rechov Hadar 6/12 Rechovot / IL | |||
04 /
Aronhime, Judith 9 Havalutzky Street Rehovot, 44242 / IL | |||
05 /
Singer, Claude 8 David Elazar Street Kfar Saba / IL | Representative(s) | Bradley, Josephine Mary, et al D Young & Co LLP 120 Holborn London EC1N 2DY / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2006/09] | Bradley, Josephine Mary, et al D Young & Co 120 Holborn London EC1N 2DY / GB | Application number, filing date | 05024394.8 | 24.11.1999 | [2006/09] | Priority number, date | US19980110113P | 27.11.1998 Original published format: US 110113 P | US19990125172P | 19.03.1999 Original published format: US 125172 P | US19990133117P | 07.05.1999 Original published format: US 133117 P | US19990147888P | 09.08.1999 Original published format: US 147888 P | [2006/09] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1630156 | Date: | 01.03.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/09] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.01.2006 | Classification | IPC: | C07C211/42, C07C209/84, A61K31/135, A61P25/00 | [2006/09] | CPC: |
C07C209/84 (EP);
A61P25/00 (EP);
C07C211/42 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2006/09] | Title | German: | Polymorphe des Sertralin-Hydrochlorids | [2006/09] | English: | Sertraline hydrochloride polymorphs | [2006/09] | French: | Polymorphes de chlorhydrate de Sertraline | [2006/09] | Examination procedure | 01.09.2006 | Examination requested [2006/42] | 17.10.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 18.05.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.06.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2009/53] | 30.07.2009 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2009/53] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP99959091.2 / EP1133459 | Request for further processing for: | 18.05.2007 | Request for further processing filed | 21.05.2007 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 21.06.2007 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 05.12.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 05.12.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 05.12.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 05.12.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 05.12.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 13.11.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 16.11.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.2008 | 10   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]US4536518 (WELCH JR WILLARD M [US], et al) [AD] 1-14 * the whole document *; | [AD]US5248699 (SYSKO ROBERT J [US], et al) [AD] 4,10 * see particularly column 10, lines 35-58 *; column 10 *; | [A]US5734083 (WILSON ANDREW JOSEPH [CA], et al) [A] 1,2 * column 2 - column 3; claim 1 *; | [E]WO0132601 (CIBA SC HOLDING AG [CH], et al) [E] 1,2,4,5,8* claim - * |