EP1657057 - Pressure-sensitive adhesive sheet for removing solvent-containing substance [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 17.02.2012 Database last updated on 15.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.02.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 21.03.2012 [2012/12] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NITTO DENKO CORPORATION 1-2, Shimohozumi 1-chome Ibaraki-shi Osaka / JP | [2006/20] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Yoneda, Masanobu Nitto Denko Corporation 1-2, Shimohozumi 1-chome Ibaraki-shi, Osaka / JP | [2006/20] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2006/20] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Maximilianstrasse 58 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 05024561.2 | 10.11.2005 | [2006/20] | Priority number, date | JP20040329289 | 12.11.2004 Original published format: JP 2004329289 | JP20050259058 | 07.09.2005 Original published format: JP 2005259058 | [2006/20] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1657057 | Date: | 17.05.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/20] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1657057 | Date: | 23.03.2011 | [2011/12] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.02.2011 | Classification | IPC: | B41F35/00, B44C1/17, G01N3/08, G01L1/00, C09J7/02 | [2006/20] | CPC: |
B41F35/003 (EP,US);
B41F35/00 (EP,KR,US);
B08B7/00 (KR);
B41J29/373 (KR);
C09J7/38 (EP,US);
B41P2235/50 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | (deleted) [2011/48] |
Former [2006/20] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Druckempfindliches Klebeblatt zur Entfernung lösungsmittelhaltiger Substanzen | [2006/20] | English: | Pressure-sensitive adhesive sheet for removing solvent-containing substance | [2006/20] | French: | Feuille adhésive sensible à la pression pour éliminer des substances contenantes des solvants | [2006/20] | Examination procedure | 24.09.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2012/12] | 04.11.2011 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2012/12] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.11.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.11.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.11.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.11.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.2011 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5902936 (SERRA-TOSIO JEAN-MARIE [FR], et al) [A] 1* column 1, lines 11-32; figure 1 *; | [XI]EP1172209 (NITTO DENKO CORP [JP]) [X] 1,4,5 * paragraphs [0033] - [0037] - [0047] , [0100] - [0103]; example 1 * [I] 2; | [X]US2004126575 (YOSHIDA YOSHINORI [JP], et al) [X] 1 * paragraphs [0078] - [0080] - [0105] , [0106] , [0163] , [0165]; examples I-1,III-1,III-2 * | by applicant | JP3281323B |