EP1662055 - In-wall sanitary fixture with flush-mounted cover plate [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 25.03.2011 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.03.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 27.04.2011 [2011/17] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states HANSA METALLWERKE AG Sigmaringer Strasse 107 70567 Stuttgart / DE | [2006/22] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Harsch, Martin Alter Weg 2 74395 Mundelsheim / DE | [2006/22] | Representative(s) | Ostertag, Ulrich, et al Ostertag & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Epplestrasse 14 70597 Stuttgart / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2006/22] | Ostertag, Ulrich, et al Ostertag & Partner Patentanwälte Epplestr. 14 70597 Stuttgart / DE | Application number, filing date | 05024618.0 | 11.11.2005 | [2006/22] | Priority number, date | DE20041055881 | 19.11.2004 Original published format: DE102004055881 | [2006/22] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1662055 | Date: | 31.05.2006 | Language: | DE | [2006/22] | Type: | A9 Corrected patent application | No.: | EP1662055 | Date: | 20.02.2008 | [2008/08] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1662055 | Date: | 31.03.2010 | [2010/13] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.02.2010 | Classification | IPC: | E03C1/042, A47G3/00, F16B37/14 | [2010/13] | CPC: |
F16B37/14 (EP);
E03C1/042 (EP);
F16B35/06 (EP);
E03C2201/50 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2006/22] | E03C1/042 | Designated contracting states | (deleted) [2010/49] |
Former [2006/22] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Sanitäre Unterputzarmatur mit einer Unterputzabdeckplatte | [2006/22] | English: | In-wall sanitary fixture with flush-mounted cover plate | [2006/22] | French: | Armature sanitaire murale avec plaque de recouvrement à affleurement | [2006/22] | Examination procedure | 21.04.2006 | Request for decision received: Drawings | 12.07.2007 | Result of request for decision (Drawings): Request rejected | 01.10.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2011/17] | 18.11.2010 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2011/17] | Appeal following examination | 12.09.2007 | Appeal received | 09.11.2007 | Statement of grounds filed | 07.01.2008 | Interlocutory revision of appeal | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.11.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.11.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.11.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.2010 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2816473 (LABBEE KATHERINE G) [A] 9 * column 3, line 22 - line 38; figures 7,8 *; | [A]US3885492 (GUTSHALL CHARLES E) [A] 7 * column 2, line 47 - column 3, line 4; figure - *; | [A]DE2424176 (GERHARD ANTON) [A] 10* page 4, paragraph 3 - page 6, paragraph 3; figure - *; | [A]GB2046392 (TITUS TOOL CO LTD) [A] 8 * abstract *; | [A]US4572039 (DESJARDINS WARREN [US]) [A] 6 * column 2, line 43 - line 53; figure 5 *; | [XI]DE8707661U (IDEAL-STANDARD GMBH) [X] 1-3 * page 5, paragraph 2 - page 6, paragraph 2; figure 2 * [I] 5-7; | [XI]EP0485842 (GROHE ARMATUREN FRIEDRICH [DE]) [X] 1-2,4 * column 2, line 18 - column 3, line 4; figures 1-3 * [I] 8-10; | [A]DE10111939 (ZINN ROLF-DIETER [DE]) [A] 5 * the whole document * |