EP1657914 - Auto-Focus system [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.10.2008 Database last updated on 02.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.08.2010 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 22.09.2010 [2010/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Fujinon Corporation 1-324 Uetake-cho, Kita-ku Saitama-shi Saitama / JP | [2006/20] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Sasaki, Tadashi c/o Fujinon Corporation 1-324 Uetake-cho Kita-ku Saitama-shi Saitama / JP | 02 /
Ouchi, Shunichiro c/o Fujinon Corporation 1-324 Uetake-cho Kita-ku Saitama-shi Saitama / JP | [2006/20] | Representative(s) | Klunker . Schmitt-Nilson . Hirsch Patentanwälte Destouchesstrasse 68 80796 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/39] | Klunker . Schmitt-Nilson . Hirsch Destouchesstrasse 68 80796 München / DE | ||
Former [2006/20] | Klunker . Schmitt-Nilson . Hirsch Winzererstrasse 106 80797 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 05024635.4 | 11.11.2005 | [2006/20] | Priority number, date | JP20040329287 | 12.11.2004 Original published format: JP 2004329287 | JP20040373458 | 24.12.2004 Original published format: JP 2004373458 | [2006/20] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1657914 | Date: | 17.05.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/20] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1657914 | Date: | 05.12.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/49] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.02.2006 | Classification | IPC: | H04N5/232 | [2006/20] | CPC: |
H04N23/673 (EP,US);
H04N23/675 (EP,US);
H04N23/635 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/20] | Title | German: | Autofokussystem | [2006/20] | English: | Auto-Focus system | [2006/20] | French: | Système de focalisation automatique | [2006/20] | Examination procedure | 11.11.2005 | Examination requested [2006/20] | 06.07.2006 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 30.08.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.12.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.05.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.09.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 13.09.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 08.09.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit [2008/46] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.10.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 05.12.2007 | BE | 05.12.2007 | CH | 05.12.2007 | CY | 05.12.2007 | CZ | 05.12.2007 | DK | 05.12.2007 | EE | 05.12.2007 | FI | 05.12.2007 | LI | 05.12.2007 | LT | 05.12.2007 | LV | 05.12.2007 | NL | 05.12.2007 | PL | 05.12.2007 | RO | 05.12.2007 | SI | 05.12.2007 | SK | 05.12.2007 | TR | 05.12.2007 | BG | 05.03.2008 | SE | 05.03.2008 | GR | 06.03.2008 | ES | 16.03.2008 | IS | 05.04.2008 | PT | 05.05.2008 | HU | 06.06.2008 | [2010/38] |
Former [2010/36] | AT | 05.12.2007 | |
BE | 05.12.2007 | ||
CH | 05.12.2007 | ||
CY | 05.12.2007 | ||
CZ | 05.12.2007 | ||
DK | 05.12.2007 | ||
EE | 05.12.2007 | ||
FI | 05.12.2007 | ||
LI | 05.12.2007 | ||
LT | 05.12.2007 | ||
LV | 05.12.2007 | ||
NL | 05.12.2007 | ||
PL | 05.12.2007 | ||
RO | 05.12.2007 | ||
SI | 05.12.2007 | ||
SK | 05.12.2007 | ||
BG | 05.03.2008 | ||
SE | 05.03.2008 | ||
GR | 06.03.2008 | ||
ES | 16.03.2008 | ||
IS | 05.04.2008 | ||
PT | 05.05.2008 | ||
HU | 06.06.2008 | ||
Former [2009/45] | AT | 05.12.2007 | |
BE | 05.12.2007 | ||
CH | 05.12.2007 | ||
CY | 05.12.2007 | ||
CZ | 05.12.2007 | ||
DK | 05.12.2007 | ||
EE | 05.12.2007 | ||
FI | 05.12.2007 | ||
LI | 05.12.2007 | ||
LT | 05.12.2007 | ||
LV | 05.12.2007 | ||
NL | 05.12.2007 | ||
PL | 05.12.2007 | ||
RO | 05.12.2007 | ||
SI | 05.12.2007 | ||
SK | 05.12.2007 | ||
BG | 05.03.2008 | ||
SE | 05.03.2008 | ||
GR | 06.03.2008 | ||
ES | 16.03.2008 | ||
IS | 05.04.2008 | ||
PT | 05.05.2008 | ||
Former [2009/24] | AT | 05.12.2007 | |
BE | 05.12.2007 | ||
CH | 05.12.2007 | ||
CZ | 05.12.2007 | ||
DK | 05.12.2007 | ||
EE | 05.12.2007 | ||
FI | 05.12.2007 | ||
LI | 05.12.2007 | ||
LT | 05.12.2007 | ||
LV | 05.12.2007 | ||
NL | 05.12.2007 | ||
PL | 05.12.2007 | ||
RO | 05.12.2007 | ||
SI | 05.12.2007 | ||
SK | 05.12.2007 | ||
BG | 05.03.2008 | ||
SE | 05.03.2008 | ||
GR | 06.03.2008 | ||
ES | 16.03.2008 | ||
IS | 05.04.2008 | ||
PT | 05.05.2008 | ||
Former [2009/22] | AT | 05.12.2007 | |
BE | 05.12.2007 | ||
CH | 05.12.2007 | ||
CZ | 05.12.2007 | ||
DK | 05.12.2007 | ||
EE | 05.12.2007 | ||
FI | 05.12.2007 | ||
LI | 05.12.2007 | ||
LT | 05.12.2007 | ||
LV | 05.12.2007 | ||
NL | 05.12.2007 | ||
PL | 05.12.2007 | ||
RO | 05.12.2007 | ||
SI | 05.12.2007 | ||
SK | 05.12.2007 | ||
SE | 05.03.2008 | ||
GR | 06.03.2008 | ||
ES | 16.03.2008 | ||
IS | 05.04.2008 | ||
PT | 05.05.2008 | ||
Former [2009/13] | AT | 05.12.2007 | |
BE | 05.12.2007 | ||
CH | 05.12.2007 | ||
CZ | 05.12.2007 | ||
DK | 05.12.2007 | ||
FI | 05.12.2007 | ||
LI | 05.12.2007 | ||
LT | 05.12.2007 | ||
LV | 05.12.2007 | ||
NL | 05.12.2007 | ||
PL | 05.12.2007 | ||
RO | 05.12.2007 | ||
SI | 05.12.2007 | ||
SK | 05.12.2007 | ||
SE | 05.03.2008 | ||
GR | 06.03.2008 | ||
ES | 16.03.2008 | ||
IS | 05.04.2008 | ||
PT | 05.05.2008 | ||
Former [2008/46] | AT | 05.12.2007 | |
BE | 05.12.2007 | ||
CH | 05.12.2007 | ||
CZ | 05.12.2007 | ||
DK | 05.12.2007 | ||
FI | 05.12.2007 | ||
LI | 05.12.2007 | ||
LT | 05.12.2007 | ||
LV | 05.12.2007 | ||
NL | 05.12.2007 | ||
PL | 05.12.2007 | ||
RO | 05.12.2007 | ||
SI | 05.12.2007 | ||
SK | 05.12.2007 | ||
SE | 05.03.2008 | ||
ES | 16.03.2008 | ||
IS | 05.04.2008 | ||
PT | 05.05.2008 | ||
Former [2008/42] | AT | 05.12.2007 | |
BE | 05.12.2007 | ||
CH | 05.12.2007 | ||
CZ | 05.12.2007 | ||
FI | 05.12.2007 | ||
LI | 05.12.2007 | ||
LT | 05.12.2007 | ||
LV | 05.12.2007 | ||
NL | 05.12.2007 | ||
PL | 05.12.2007 | ||
RO | 05.12.2007 | ||
SI | 05.12.2007 | ||
SK | 05.12.2007 | ||
SE | 05.03.2008 | ||
ES | 16.03.2008 | ||
IS | 05.04.2008 | ||
PT | 05.05.2008 | ||
Former [2008/39] | AT | 05.12.2007 | |
BE | 05.12.2007 | ||
CH | 05.12.2007 | ||
CZ | 05.12.2007 | ||
FI | 05.12.2007 | ||
LI | 05.12.2007 | ||
LT | 05.12.2007 | ||
LV | 05.12.2007 | ||
NL | 05.12.2007 | ||
PL | 05.12.2007 | ||
RO | 05.12.2007 | ||
SI | 05.12.2007 | ||
SK | 05.12.2007 | ||
SE | 05.03.2008 | ||
ES | 16.03.2008 | ||
IS | 05.04.2008 | ||
Former [2008/36] | AT | 05.12.2007 | |
CH | 05.12.2007 | ||
CZ | 05.12.2007 | ||
FI | 05.12.2007 | ||
LI | 05.12.2007 | ||
LT | 05.12.2007 | ||
LV | 05.12.2007 | ||
NL | 05.12.2007 | ||
PL | 05.12.2007 | ||
SI | 05.12.2007 | ||
SE | 05.03.2008 | ||
ES | 16.03.2008 | ||
IS | 05.04.2008 | ||
Former [2008/29] | AT | 05.12.2007 | |
CH | 05.12.2007 | ||
FI | 05.12.2007 | ||
LI | 05.12.2007 | ||
LT | 05.12.2007 | ||
LV | 05.12.2007 | ||
NL | 05.12.2007 | ||
PL | 05.12.2007 | ||
SI | 05.12.2007 | ||
SE | 05.03.2008 | ||
ES | 16.03.2008 | ||
Former [2008/27] | CH | 05.12.2007 | |
FI | 05.12.2007 | ||
LI | 05.12.2007 | ||
LT | 05.12.2007 | ||
LV | 05.12.2007 | ||
NL | 05.12.2007 | ||
PL | 05.12.2007 | ||
SI | 05.12.2007 | ||
SE | 05.03.2008 | ||
ES | 16.03.2008 | ||
Former [2008/26] | CH | 05.12.2007 | |
FI | 05.12.2007 | ||
LI | 05.12.2007 | ||
LT | 05.12.2007 | ||
NL | 05.12.2007 | ||
PL | 05.12.2007 | ||
SI | 05.12.2007 | ||
SE | 05.03.2008 | ||
ES | 16.03.2008 | ||
Former [2008/24] | CH | 05.12.2007 | |
FI | 05.12.2007 | ||
LI | 05.12.2007 | ||
LT | 05.12.2007 | ||
NL | 05.12.2007 | ||
PL | 05.12.2007 | ||
SE | 05.03.2008 | ||
ES | 16.03.2008 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP1017232 (LUCENT TECHNOLOGIES INC [US]) [X] 1-12 * column 4, line 12 - column 6, line 6; figures 1-3 *; | [A]US6088060 (SUDA HIROFUMI [JP], et al) [A] 1-12* abstract * |