EP1628462 - Electronic watermark system [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 06.01.2017 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.01.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 08.02.2017 [2017/06] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NEC Personal Computers, Ltd. 11-1, Osaki 1-chome Shinagawa-ku Tokyo 141-0032 / JP | [2011/47] |
Former [2006/08] | For all designated states NEC CORPORATION 7-1, Shiba 5-chome, Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Nakano, Hirotaka c/o NEC Corporation 5-7-1, Shiba Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | [2006/08] | Representative(s) | Samson & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Widenmayerstraße 6 80538 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/35] | von Samson-Himmelstjerna, Friedrich, et al SAMSON & PARTNER Widenmayerstrasse 5 80538 München / DE | ||
Former [2006/08] | von Samson-Himmelstjerna, Friedrich, et al SAMSON & PARTNER, Widenmayerstrasse 5 D-80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 05024841.8 | 12.02.1998 | [2006/08] | Priority number, date | JP19970027815 | 12.02.1997 Original published format: JP 2781597 | [2006/08] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1628462 | Date: | 22.02.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/08] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1628462 | Date: | 08.03.2006 | [2006/10] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.01.2006 | Classification | IPC: | H04N1/00, H04N5/913, G11B20/00 | [2006/08] | CPC: |
G11B20/0021 (EP,US);
G06T1/0021 (EP,US);
G11B20/00086 (EP,US);
G11B20/00094 (EP,US);
G11B20/00557 (EP,US);
G11B20/00855 (EP,US);
G11B20/00884 (EP,US);
H04N1/32154 (EP,US);
H04N1/32165 (EP,US);
H04N1/32277 (EP,US);
H04N19/467 (EP,US);
H04N19/61 (EP,US);
H04N21/23892 (EP,US);
H04N21/8358 (EP,US);
H04N9/8042 (EP,US);
G06T2201/0052 (EP,US);
G06T2201/0065 (EP,US);
H04N2201/3233 (EP,US);
H04N2201/3235 (EP,US);
H04N2201/327 (EP,US);
H04N2201/3274 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, NL [2006/08] | Title | German: | Elektronisches Wasserzeichensystem | [2006/08] | English: | Electronic watermark system | [2006/08] | French: | Système de filigrane électronique | [2006/08] | Examination procedure | 06.03.2006 | Examination requested [2006/18] | 19.05.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 29.11.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.09.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2017/06] | 28.09.2016 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2017/06] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP98102443.3 / EP0859503 | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP19980102443) is 28.07.2004 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.11.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.11.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.11.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.11.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 14.11.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 14.11.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 14.11.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 27.02.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 28.02.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 28.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 26.02.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 24.02.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 14 | 28.02.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 15 | 28.02.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 16 | 28.02.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 17 | 02.03.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 18 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 29.02.2016 | 19   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0450841 (GTE LABORATORIES INC [US]) [X] 1 * column 1, line 19 - line 42 * * column 2, line 20 - column 3, line 9 * * column 4, line 14 - line 19 * * column 4, line 37 - line 55; claim - *; | [A]US5291598 (GRUNDY GREGORY [AU]) [A] 1 * the whole document *; | [A]WO9641468 (MACROVISION CORP [US]) [A] 1 * the whole document *; | [PX]WO9714087 (ERICKSON JOHN S [US]) [PX] 1 * page 5, line 16 - line 23 * * page 12, line 22 - line 28 * * page 19, line 1 - line 27 * * page 33, line 1 - page 34, line 9 * * page 61, line 21 - line 27 ** claims 121,124 *; | [X] - J. ZHAO, "A WWW Service to Embed and Prove Digital Copyright Watermarks", PROCEEDINGS OF THE EUROPEAN CONFERENCE ON MULTIMEDIA APPLICATIONS, SERVICES AND TECHNIQUES, Louvain, BE, (19960528), vol. 2, pages 695 - 709, XP000199921 [X] 1 * page 701, paragraph 4 - page 702; figure 2 * | [X] - KOMATSU N ET AL, "AUTHENTICATION SYSTEM USING CONCEALED IMAGE IN TELEMATICS", MEMOIRS OF THE SCHOOL OF SCIENCE AND ENGINEERING. WASEDA UNIVERSITY, (19880101), no. 52, ISSN 0369-1950, pages 45 - 60, XP000603853 [X] 1 * paragraphs [0002] , [0003] * |