EP1674963 - Secure license management [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.06.2009 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.11.2010 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): GR | published on 29.12.2010 [2010/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SAP AG Dietmar-Hopp-Allee 16 69190 Walldorf / DE | [2006/26] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kilian-Kehr, Roger Nelkenweg 14c 64291 Darmstadt / DE | 02 /
Kuemmerle, Jan Graefliche Strasse 29 65817 Eppstein / DE | [2006/26] | Representative(s) | Müller-Boré & Partner Patentanwälte PartG mbB Friedenheimer Brücke 21 80639 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2006/26] | Müller-Boré & Partner Patentanwälte Grafinger Strasse 2 81671 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 05024856.6 | 14.11.2005 | [2006/26] | Priority number, date | US20040020386 | 22.12.2004 Original published format: US 20386 | [2006/26] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1674963 | Date: | 28.06.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/26] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1674963 | Date: | 13.08.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/33] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.03.2006 | Classification | IPC: | G06F21/00 | [2007/32] | CPC: |
G06F21/10 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2006/26] | G06F1/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/26] | Title | German: | Sicheres Management von Lizenzen | [2006/26] | English: | Secure license management | [2006/26] | French: | Gestion de licences sécurisée | [2006/26] | Examination procedure | 07.12.2006 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 07.12.2006 | Examination requested [2007/03] | 01.03.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.05.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.11.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.05.2008 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time | 19.06.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 19.06.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 14.05.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/30] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to fulfill actions required for granting the patent | 19.06.2008 | Request for further processing filed | 19.06.2008 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.11.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 13.08.2008 | BE | 13.08.2008 | CY | 13.08.2008 | CZ | 13.08.2008 | DK | 13.08.2008 | EE | 13.08.2008 | FI | 13.08.2008 | IT | 13.08.2008 | LT | 13.08.2008 | LV | 13.08.2008 | NL | 13.08.2008 | PL | 13.08.2008 | RO | 13.08.2008 | SI | 13.08.2008 | SK | 13.08.2008 | TR | 13.08.2008 | BG | 13.11.2008 | SE | 13.11.2008 | GR | 14.11.2008 | IE | 14.11.2008 | LU | 14.11.2008 | ES | 24.11.2008 | MC | 30.11.2008 | IS | 13.12.2008 | PT | 13.01.2009 | HU | 14.02.2009 | [2010/52] |
Former [2010/38] | AT | 13.08.2008 | |
BE | 13.08.2008 | ||
CY | 13.08.2008 | ||
CZ | 13.08.2008 | ||
DK | 13.08.2008 | ||
EE | 13.08.2008 | ||
FI | 13.08.2008 | ||
IT | 13.08.2008 | ||
LT | 13.08.2008 | ||
LV | 13.08.2008 | ||
NL | 13.08.2008 | ||
PL | 13.08.2008 | ||
RO | 13.08.2008 | ||
SI | 13.08.2008 | ||
SK | 13.08.2008 | ||
TR | 13.08.2008 | ||
BG | 13.11.2008 | ||
SE | 13.11.2008 | ||
IE | 14.11.2008 | ||
LU | 14.11.2008 | ||
ES | 24.11.2008 | ||
MC | 30.11.2008 | ||
IS | 13.12.2008 | ||
PT | 13.01.2009 | ||
HU | 14.02.2009 | ||
Former [2010/36] | AT | 13.08.2008 | |
BE | 13.08.2008 | ||
CY | 13.08.2008 | ||
CZ | 13.08.2008 | ||
DK | 13.08.2008 | ||
EE | 13.08.2008 | ||
FI | 13.08.2008 | ||
IT | 13.08.2008 | ||
LT | 13.08.2008 | ||
LV | 13.08.2008 | ||
NL | 13.08.2008 | ||
PL | 13.08.2008 | ||
RO | 13.08.2008 | ||
SI | 13.08.2008 | ||
SK | 13.08.2008 | ||
BG | 13.11.2008 | ||
SE | 13.11.2008 | ||
IE | 14.11.2008 | ||
LU | 14.11.2008 | ||
ES | 24.11.2008 | ||
MC | 30.11.2008 | ||
IS | 13.12.2008 | ||
PT | 13.01.2009 | ||
HU | 14.02.2009 | ||
Former [2010/33] | AT | 13.08.2008 | |
BE | 13.08.2008 | ||
CZ | 13.08.2008 | ||
DK | 13.08.2008 | ||
EE | 13.08.2008 | ||
FI | 13.08.2008 | ||
IT | 13.08.2008 | ||
LT | 13.08.2008 | ||
LV | 13.08.2008 | ||
NL | 13.08.2008 | ||
PL | 13.08.2008 | ||
RO | 13.08.2008 | ||
SI | 13.08.2008 | ||
SK | 13.08.2008 | ||
BG | 13.11.2008 | ||
SE | 13.11.2008 | ||
IE | 14.11.2008 | ||
LU | 14.11.2008 | ||
ES | 24.11.2008 | ||
MC | 30.11.2008 | ||
IS | 13.12.2008 | ||
PT | 13.01.2009 | ||
Former [2010/24] | AT | 13.08.2008 | |
BE | 13.08.2008 | ||
CZ | 13.08.2008 | ||
DK | 13.08.2008 | ||
EE | 13.08.2008 | ||
FI | 13.08.2008 | ||
IT | 13.08.2008 | ||
LT | 13.08.2008 | ||
LV | 13.08.2008 | ||
NL | 13.08.2008 | ||
PL | 13.08.2008 | ||
RO | 13.08.2008 | ||
SI | 13.08.2008 | ||
SK | 13.08.2008 | ||
BG | 13.11.2008 | ||
SE | 13.11.2008 | ||
IE | 14.11.2008 | ||
ES | 24.11.2008 | ||
MC | 30.11.2008 | ||
IS | 13.12.2008 | ||
PT | 13.01.2009 | ||
Former [2010/11] | AT | 13.08.2008 | |
BE | 13.08.2008 | ||
CZ | 13.08.2008 | ||
DK | 13.08.2008 | ||
EE | 13.08.2008 | ||
FI | 13.08.2008 | ||
IT | 13.08.2008 | ||
LT | 13.08.2008 | ||
LV | 13.08.2008 | ||
NL | 13.08.2008 | ||
RO | 13.08.2008 | ||
SI | 13.08.2008 | ||
SK | 13.08.2008 | ||
BG | 13.11.2008 | ||
SE | 13.11.2008 | ||
IE | 14.11.2008 | ||
ES | 24.11.2008 | ||
MC | 30.11.2008 | ||
IS | 13.12.2008 | ||
PT | 13.01.2009 | ||
Former [2009/47] | AT | 13.08.2008 | |
BE | 13.08.2008 | ||
CZ | 13.08.2008 | ||
DK | 13.08.2008 | ||
EE | 13.08.2008 | ||
FI | 13.08.2008 | ||
IT | 13.08.2008 | ||
LT | 13.08.2008 | ||
LV | 13.08.2008 | ||
NL | 13.08.2008 | ||
RO | 13.08.2008 | ||
SI | 13.08.2008 | ||
SK | 13.08.2008 | ||
BG | 13.11.2008 | ||
IE | 14.11.2008 | ||
ES | 24.11.2008 | ||
MC | 30.11.2008 | ||
IS | 13.12.2008 | ||
PT | 13.01.2009 | ||
Former [2009/45] | AT | 13.08.2008 | |
BE | 13.08.2008 | ||
CZ | 13.08.2008 | ||
DK | 13.08.2008 | ||
EE | 13.08.2008 | ||
FI | 13.08.2008 | ||
IT | 13.08.2008 | ||
LT | 13.08.2008 | ||
LV | 13.08.2008 | ||
NL | 13.08.2008 | ||
RO | 13.08.2008 | ||
SI | 13.08.2008 | ||
SK | 13.08.2008 | ||
BG | 13.11.2008 | ||
ES | 24.11.2008 | ||
MC | 30.11.2008 | ||
IS | 13.12.2008 | ||
PT | 13.01.2009 | ||
Former [2009/29] | AT | 13.08.2008 | |
BE | 13.08.2008 | ||
CZ | 13.08.2008 | ||
DK | 13.08.2008 | ||
FI | 13.08.2008 | ||
LT | 13.08.2008 | ||
LV | 13.08.2008 | ||
NL | 13.08.2008 | ||
RO | 13.08.2008 | ||
SI | 13.08.2008 | ||
SK | 13.08.2008 | ||
BG | 13.11.2008 | ||
ES | 24.11.2008 | ||
MC | 30.11.2008 | ||
IS | 13.12.2008 | ||
PT | 13.01.2009 | ||
Former [2009/27] | AT | 13.08.2008 | |
BE | 13.08.2008 | ||
CZ | 13.08.2008 | ||
DK | 13.08.2008 | ||
FI | 13.08.2008 | ||
LT | 13.08.2008 | ||
LV | 13.08.2008 | ||
NL | 13.08.2008 | ||
RO | 13.08.2008 | ||
SI | 13.08.2008 | ||
SK | 13.08.2008 | ||
BG | 13.11.2008 | ||
ES | 24.11.2008 | ||
IS | 13.12.2008 | ||
PT | 13.01.2009 | ||
Former [2009/24] | AT | 13.08.2008 | |
BE | 13.08.2008 | ||
CZ | 13.08.2008 | ||
DK | 13.08.2008 | ||
FI | 13.08.2008 | ||
LT | 13.08.2008 | ||
LV | 13.08.2008 | ||
NL | 13.08.2008 | ||
SI | 13.08.2008 | ||
SK | 13.08.2008 | ||
BG | 13.11.2008 | ||
ES | 24.11.2008 | ||
IS | 13.12.2008 | ||
Former [2009/19] | AT | 13.08.2008 | |
BE | 13.08.2008 | ||
DK | 13.08.2008 | ||
FI | 13.08.2008 | ||
LT | 13.08.2008 | ||
LV | 13.08.2008 | ||
NL | 13.08.2008 | ||
SI | 13.08.2008 | ||
ES | 24.11.2008 | ||
IS | 13.12.2008 | ||
Former [2009/15] | AT | 13.08.2008 | |
FI | 13.08.2008 | ||
LT | 13.08.2008 | ||
LV | 13.08.2008 | ||
NL | 13.08.2008 | ||
SI | 13.08.2008 | ||
ES | 24.11.2008 | ||
IS | 13.12.2008 | ||
Former [2009/12] | FI | 13.08.2008 | |
LT | 13.08.2008 | ||
LV | 13.08.2008 | ||
NL | 13.08.2008 | ||
ES | 24.11.2008 | ||
IS | 13.12.2008 | ||
Former [2009/09] | LT | 13.08.2008 | |
NL | 13.08.2008 | ||
ES | 24.11.2008 | ||
IS | 13.12.2008 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US5933498 (SCHNECK PAUL B [US], et al) [X] 1-20 * columns 29-30 *; | [X]US2003037237 (ABGRALL JEAN-PAUL [US], et al) [X] 1-20 * paragraphs [0649] - [0651] *; | [X]US2004039924 (BALDWIN ROBERT W [US], et al) [X] 1-20 * paragraphs [0032] , [0067] , [0214] , [0757] *; | [X]US2004078572 (PEARSON SIANI LYNNE [GB], et al) [X] 1-20 * paragraphs [0015] - [0018] *; | [X]US2004093505 (HATAKEYAMA TAKAHISA [JP], et al) [X] 1-20 * abstract * * paragraphs [0018] , [0035] - [0037] - [0648] - [0651] *; | [X]US2004230797 (OFEK YORAM [US], et al) [X] 1-20 * paragraphs [0019] - [0032] *; | [A] - "Trusted Computing Platform Alliance (TCPA) Main Specification Version 1.1b", TCPA MAIN SPECIFICATION, (20020222), page COMPLETE332, XP002294897 [A] 1-20 * pages 145-150 * |