EP1787550 - Sliding rail for beds [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 30.05.2008 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.05.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 02.07.2008 [2008/27] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Industrias Hidraulicas Pardo, S.A. Autovia de Logrono Km. 5800 50011 Zaragoza / ES | [2007/21] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Pardo Herrera, José Autovia de Logrono, km. 5,800 50011 Zaragoza / ES | [2007/21] | Representative(s) | PROPI, S.L. Clarke, Modet & Co. Suero de Quiñones, 34-36 28002 Madrid / ES | [N/P] |
Former [2007/21] | PROPI, S.L. Jorge Juan, 19 28001 Madrid / ES | Application number, filing date | 05025018.2 | 16.11.2005 | [2007/21] | Filing language | ES | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1787550 | Date: | 23.05.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/21] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.05.2006 | Classification | IPC: | A47C21/08 | [2007/21] | CPC: |
A61G7/0507 (EP);
A47C21/08 (EP);
A61G7/0509 (EP);
A61G7/0515 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | (deleted) [2008/05] |
Former [2007/21] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Gleitendes Seitengitter für Betten | [2007/21] | English: | Sliding rail for beds | [2007/21] | French: | Rail de coulissement pour lits | [2007/21] | Examination procedure | 24.11.2007 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2008/27] | 12.02.2008 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2008/27] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.2007 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US5432962 (HUANG CHENG-KUEI [TW]) [Y] 3 * column 2, line 29 - column 3, line 23 ** figures 3-5 *; | [X]US5617593 (PHAM VIET [CA]) [X] 1-3,5 * column 3, line 17 - column 4, line 18; figure - *; | [X]EP0928584 (SUNRISE MEDICAL SA [FR]) [X] 1-3 * abstract * * column 4, paragraph 29; figure - *; | [XY]EP1344474 (CASACARE GMBH & CO KG [DE]) [X] 1,2,5 * abstract * * column 4, line 48 - column 5, line 29 * * figures 1-4 * [Y] 3; | [X]US2004088787 (ZILIOLI EDILIO [IT]) [X] 1,2,5 * abstract * * page 1, paragraph 14 - paragraph 16 * * figures 1-4 * |