EP1641159 - SONET J0 byte message monitoring system [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 29.06.2007 Database last updated on 15.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.06.2007 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 01.08.2007 [2007/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Ciena Corporation 1201 Winterson Road Linthicum, MD 21090 / US | [2006/13] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Shanton, John L. III 4868 Amesbury Way Jefferson, MD 21755 / US | [2006/13] | Representative(s) | Jeffrey, Philip Michael Dehns St Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2006/13] | Jeffrey, Philip Michael Frank B. Dehn & Co. 179 Queen Victoria Street London EC4V 4EL / GB | Application number, filing date | 05025024.0 | 04.05.1999 | [2006/13] | Priority number, date | US19980072780 | 06.05.1998 Original published format: US 72780 | [2006/13] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1641159 | Date: | 29.03.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/13] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.02.2006 | Classification | IPC: | H04J3/14 | [2006/13] | CPC: |
H04J3/14 (EP,US);
H04B10/0771 (EP,US);
H04B10/0775 (EP,US);
H04J14/02 (EP,US);
H04J3/085 (EP,US);
H04B2210/071 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | GB [2006/49] |
Former [2006/13] | BE, DE, FR, GB, IT, NL, SE | Title | German: | Überwachungssystem einer SONET J0 Byte Nachricht | [2006/13] | English: | SONET J0 byte message monitoring system | [2006/13] | French: | Système de contrôle de messages d'octets J0 SONET | [2006/13] | Examination procedure | 30.08.2006 | Examination requested [2006/41] | 28.09.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.02.2007 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2007/31] | 15.03.2007 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2007/31] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP99938693.1 / EP1076949 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.11.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.11.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 17.11.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 17.11.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 17.11.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 23.05.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JPH05110584 ; | [A]EP0400959 (TOSHIBA KK [JP]) [A] 22,23,25 * column 7, line 12 - line 24 * * column 7, line 32 - column 8, line 10 * * column 8, line 55 - column 9, line 1 * * column 9, line 38 - column 10, line 37 ** figures 2,3,6,7 *; | [XY]US5383046 (TOMOFUJI HIROAKI [JP], et al) [X] 1,2,4-6,8-13,15,16,18-23,25 * column 26, line 23 - column 27, line 19 * * column 28, line 37 - column 29, line 17 * * figures 30-35 * [Y] 3,14,17,24; | [X]GB2292872 (FUJITSU LTD [JP]) [X] 1,2,4-6,8-13,18-23,25 * page 1, line 11 - line 19 * * page 24, line 10 - page 27, line 13; figures 13,20 *; | [X]EP0744845 (NEC CORP [JP]) [X] 1-5,8,10,11,13,18,20,21 * figures 2B,4,5 * * column 5, line 25 - column 6, line 9 * * column 1, line 45 - line 54 *; | [Y]EP0766421 (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [Y] 3,14,17,24 * column 1, line 1 - column 2, line 1 * * column 2, line 52 - column 3, line 1 * * column 5, line 5 - column 6, line 30 * * column 6, line 49 - column 7, line 15 * * figures 1,4-6 *; | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19930826), vol. 017, no. 470, Database accession no. (E - 1422), & JP05110584 A 19930430 (FUJITSU LTD) [A] 15,16 * abstract * | [A] - OKAMOTO S ET AL, "INTER-NETWORK INTERFACE FOR PHOTONIC TRANSPORT NETWORKS AND SDH TRANSPORT NETWORKS", GLOBAL TELECOMMUNICATIONS CONFERENCE (GLOBECOM),US,NEW YORK, IEEE, (19971103), ISBN 0-7803-4199-6, page 850-855, XP000737654 [A] 22-25 * page 852, column L, paragraph 3 * * page 852, column R, paragraph 2 - paragraph L * * page 853, column R, paragraph 2 - page 855, column L, paragraph 1 * * figures 1,7-10 * | by applicant | US5557439 | US5715076 | - J.D. GIBSON, THE COMMUNICATIONS HANDBOOK, pages 542 - 553 |