EP1659029 - Vehicle proximity warning apparatus and method [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 29.05.2009 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.11.2010 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): GR | published on 29.12.2010 [2010/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states AISIN AW CO., LTD. 10, Takane, Fujiicho Anjo Aichi 444-1192 / JP | [2006/21] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kubota, Tomoki c/o Aisin AW CO., LTD. 6-18 Harayama Okacho Okazaki Aichi 444-8564 / JP | 02 /
Miyazaki, Hideto c/o Aisin AW CO., LTD. 6-18 Harayama Okacho Okazaki Aichi 444-8564 / JP | [2006/21] | Representative(s) | Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/35] | Vossius & Partner Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | ||
Former [2006/21] | Vossius & Partner Siebertstrasse 4 81675 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 05025135.4 | 17.11.2005 | [2006/21] | Priority number, date | JP20040332627 | 17.11.2004 Original published format: JP 2004332627 | [2006/21] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1659029 | Date: | 24.05.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/21] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1659029 | Date: | 23.07.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/30] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.03.2006 | Classification | IPC: | B60Q1/24, B60Q1/52 | [2006/21] | CPC: |
G01C21/28 (EP,US);
B60Q1/24 (EP,US);
B60Q1/525 (EP,US);
G01C21/3697 (EP,US);
B60Q2400/50 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/21] | Title | German: | Kraftfahrzeugsnäherungswarnsystem und Verfahren | [2006/21] | English: | Vehicle proximity warning apparatus and method | [2006/21] | French: | Appareil et méthode d'alerte de proximité de véhicule | [2006/21] | Examination procedure | 07.11.2006 | Examination requested [2006/51] | 28.11.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.05.2008 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time | 02.06.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 02.06.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 24.04.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/27] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to fulfill actions required for granting the patent | 02.06.2008 | Request for further processing filed | 02.06.2008 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.11.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 23.07.2008 | BE | 23.07.2008 | CY | 23.07.2008 | CZ | 23.07.2008 | DK | 23.07.2008 | EE | 23.07.2008 | FI | 23.07.2008 | IT | 23.07.2008 | LT | 23.07.2008 | LV | 23.07.2008 | NL | 23.07.2008 | PL | 23.07.2008 | RO | 23.07.2008 | SI | 23.07.2008 | SK | 23.07.2008 | TR | 23.07.2008 | BG | 23.10.2008 | SE | 23.10.2008 | GR | 24.10.2008 | ES | 03.11.2008 | IE | 17.11.2008 | LU | 17.11.2008 | IS | 23.11.2008 | MC | 30.11.2008 | PT | 23.12.2008 | HU | 24.01.2009 | [2010/52] |
Former [2010/38] | AT | 23.07.2008 | |
BE | 23.07.2008 | ||
CY | 23.07.2008 | ||
CZ | 23.07.2008 | ||
DK | 23.07.2008 | ||
EE | 23.07.2008 | ||
FI | 23.07.2008 | ||
IT | 23.07.2008 | ||
LT | 23.07.2008 | ||
LV | 23.07.2008 | ||
NL | 23.07.2008 | ||
PL | 23.07.2008 | ||
RO | 23.07.2008 | ||
SI | 23.07.2008 | ||
SK | 23.07.2008 | ||
TR | 23.07.2008 | ||
BG | 23.10.2008 | ||
SE | 23.10.2008 | ||
ES | 03.11.2008 | ||
IE | 17.11.2008 | ||
LU | 17.11.2008 | ||
IS | 23.11.2008 | ||
MC | 30.11.2008 | ||
PT | 23.12.2008 | ||
HU | 24.01.2009 | ||
Former [2010/36] | AT | 23.07.2008 | |
BE | 23.07.2008 | ||
CY | 23.07.2008 | ||
CZ | 23.07.2008 | ||
DK | 23.07.2008 | ||
EE | 23.07.2008 | ||
FI | 23.07.2008 | ||
IT | 23.07.2008 | ||
LT | 23.07.2008 | ||
LV | 23.07.2008 | ||
NL | 23.07.2008 | ||
PL | 23.07.2008 | ||
RO | 23.07.2008 | ||
SI | 23.07.2008 | ||
SK | 23.07.2008 | ||
BG | 23.10.2008 | ||
SE | 23.10.2008 | ||
ES | 03.11.2008 | ||
IE | 17.11.2008 | ||
LU | 17.11.2008 | ||
IS | 23.11.2008 | ||
MC | 30.11.2008 | ||
PT | 23.12.2008 | ||
HU | 24.01.2009 | ||
Former [2010/33] | AT | 23.07.2008 | |
BE | 23.07.2008 | ||
CZ | 23.07.2008 | ||
DK | 23.07.2008 | ||
EE | 23.07.2008 | ||
FI | 23.07.2008 | ||
IT | 23.07.2008 | ||
LT | 23.07.2008 | ||
LV | 23.07.2008 | ||
NL | 23.07.2008 | ||
PL | 23.07.2008 | ||
RO | 23.07.2008 | ||
SI | 23.07.2008 | ||
SK | 23.07.2008 | ||
BG | 23.10.2008 | ||
SE | 23.10.2008 | ||
ES | 03.11.2008 | ||
IE | 17.11.2008 | ||
LU | 17.11.2008 | ||
IS | 23.11.2008 | ||
MC | 30.11.2008 | ||
PT | 23.12.2008 | ||
Former [2010/24] | AT | 23.07.2008 | |
BE | 23.07.2008 | ||
CZ | 23.07.2008 | ||
DK | 23.07.2008 | ||
EE | 23.07.2008 | ||
FI | 23.07.2008 | ||
IT | 23.07.2008 | ||
LT | 23.07.2008 | ||
LV | 23.07.2008 | ||
NL | 23.07.2008 | ||
PL | 23.07.2008 | ||
RO | 23.07.2008 | ||
SI | 23.07.2008 | ||
SK | 23.07.2008 | ||
BG | 23.10.2008 | ||
SE | 23.10.2008 | ||
ES | 03.11.2008 | ||
IE | 17.11.2008 | ||
IS | 23.11.2008 | ||
MC | 30.11.2008 | ||
PT | 23.12.2008 | ||
Former [2010/11] | AT | 23.07.2008 | |
BE | 23.07.2008 | ||
CZ | 23.07.2008 | ||
DK | 23.07.2008 | ||
EE | 23.07.2008 | ||
FI | 23.07.2008 | ||
IT | 23.07.2008 | ||
LT | 23.07.2008 | ||
LV | 23.07.2008 | ||
NL | 23.07.2008 | ||
RO | 23.07.2008 | ||
SI | 23.07.2008 | ||
SK | 23.07.2008 | ||
BG | 23.10.2008 | ||
SE | 23.10.2008 | ||
ES | 03.11.2008 | ||
IE | 17.11.2008 | ||
IS | 23.11.2008 | ||
MC | 30.11.2008 | ||
PT | 23.12.2008 | ||
Former [2009/47] | AT | 23.07.2008 | |
BE | 23.07.2008 | ||
CZ | 23.07.2008 | ||
DK | 23.07.2008 | ||
EE | 23.07.2008 | ||
FI | 23.07.2008 | ||
IT | 23.07.2008 | ||
LT | 23.07.2008 | ||
LV | 23.07.2008 | ||
NL | 23.07.2008 | ||
RO | 23.07.2008 | ||
SI | 23.07.2008 | ||
SK | 23.07.2008 | ||
BG | 23.10.2008 | ||
ES | 03.11.2008 | ||
IE | 17.11.2008 | ||
IS | 23.11.2008 | ||
MC | 30.11.2008 | ||
PT | 23.12.2008 | ||
Former [2009/45] | AT | 23.07.2008 | |
BE | 23.07.2008 | ||
CZ | 23.07.2008 | ||
DK | 23.07.2008 | ||
EE | 23.07.2008 | ||
FI | 23.07.2008 | ||
IT | 23.07.2008 | ||
LT | 23.07.2008 | ||
LV | 23.07.2008 | ||
NL | 23.07.2008 | ||
RO | 23.07.2008 | ||
SI | 23.07.2008 | ||
SK | 23.07.2008 | ||
BG | 23.10.2008 | ||
ES | 03.11.2008 | ||
IS | 23.11.2008 | ||
MC | 30.11.2008 | ||
PT | 23.12.2008 | ||
Former [2009/29] | AT | 23.07.2008 | |
BE | 23.07.2008 | ||
CZ | 23.07.2008 | ||
DK | 23.07.2008 | ||
EE | 23.07.2008 | ||
FI | 23.07.2008 | ||
LT | 23.07.2008 | ||
LV | 23.07.2008 | ||
NL | 23.07.2008 | ||
RO | 23.07.2008 | ||
SI | 23.07.2008 | ||
SK | 23.07.2008 | ||
BG | 23.10.2008 | ||
ES | 03.11.2008 | ||
IS | 23.11.2008 | ||
MC | 30.11.2008 | ||
PT | 23.12.2008 | ||
Former [2009/27] | AT | 23.07.2008 | |
BE | 23.07.2008 | ||
CZ | 23.07.2008 | ||
DK | 23.07.2008 | ||
EE | 23.07.2008 | ||
FI | 23.07.2008 | ||
LT | 23.07.2008 | ||
LV | 23.07.2008 | ||
NL | 23.07.2008 | ||
RO | 23.07.2008 | ||
SI | 23.07.2008 | ||
SK | 23.07.2008 | ||
BG | 23.10.2008 | ||
ES | 03.11.2008 | ||
IS | 23.11.2008 | ||
PT | 23.12.2008 | ||
Former [2009/24] | AT | 23.07.2008 | |
BE | 23.07.2008 | ||
CZ | 23.07.2008 | ||
DK | 23.07.2008 | ||
EE | 23.07.2008 | ||
FI | 23.07.2008 | ||
LT | 23.07.2008 | ||
LV | 23.07.2008 | ||
NL | 23.07.2008 | ||
SI | 23.07.2008 | ||
SK | 23.07.2008 | ||
BG | 23.10.2008 | ||
ES | 03.11.2008 | ||
IS | 23.11.2008 | ||
PT | 23.12.2008 | ||
Former [2009/22] | AT | 23.07.2008 | |
BE | 23.07.2008 | ||
DK | 23.07.2008 | ||
EE | 23.07.2008 | ||
FI | 23.07.2008 | ||
LT | 23.07.2008 | ||
LV | 23.07.2008 | ||
NL | 23.07.2008 | ||
SI | 23.07.2008 | ||
BG | 23.10.2008 | ||
ES | 03.11.2008 | ||
IS | 23.11.2008 | ||
PT | 23.12.2008 | ||
Former [2009/19] | AT | 23.07.2008 | |
BE | 23.07.2008 | ||
DK | 23.07.2008 | ||
FI | 23.07.2008 | ||
LT | 23.07.2008 | ||
LV | 23.07.2008 | ||
NL | 23.07.2008 | ||
SI | 23.07.2008 | ||
BG | 23.10.2008 | ||
ES | 03.11.2008 | ||
IS | 23.11.2008 | ||
PT | 23.12.2008 | ||
Former [2009/14] | AT | 23.07.2008 | |
FI | 23.07.2008 | ||
LT | 23.07.2008 | ||
LV | 23.07.2008 | ||
NL | 23.07.2008 | ||
SI | 23.07.2008 | ||
BG | 23.10.2008 | ||
ES | 03.11.2008 | ||
IS | 23.11.2008 | ||
PT | 23.12.2008 | ||
Former [2009/13] | AT | 23.07.2008 | |
FI | 23.07.2008 | ||
LT | 23.07.2008 | ||
LV | 23.07.2008 | ||
NL | 23.07.2008 | ||
BG | 23.10.2008 | ||
ES | 03.11.2008 | ||
IS | 23.11.2008 | ||
PT | 23.12.2008 | ||
Former [2009/12] | FI | 23.07.2008 | |
LT | 23.07.2008 | ||
LV | 23.07.2008 | ||
NL | 23.07.2008 | ||
BG | 23.10.2008 | ||
ES | 03.11.2008 | ||
IS | 23.11.2008 | ||
PT | 23.12.2008 | ||
Former [2009/09] | LT | 23.07.2008 | |
NL | 23.07.2008 | ||
ES | 03.11.2008 | ||
IS | 23.11.2008 | ||
PT | 23.12.2008 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JPH05238307 ; | [A]EP0745965 (EQUOS RESEARCH KK [JP], et al) [A] 1-8 * column 1, line 57 - column 2, line 52; figure 1 *; | [A]EP0782118 (AISIN AW CO [JP]) [A] 1-8 * column 7, line 1 - column 23, line 54; figures 1-31 *; | [A]US6014601 (GUSTAFSON J MARTIN [US]) [A] 1-8* abstract *; | [A]US2002135468 (BOS BRENT J [US], et al) [A] 1-8 * abstract *; | [A]GB2394076 (FORD GLOBAL TECH LLC [US]) [A] 1-8 * page 2, line 12 - page 3, line 18; figure 1 * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19931220), vol. 017, no. 697, Database accession no. (M - 1532), & JP05238307 A 19930917 (YUKITAKA NAKAZATO) [A] 1-8 * abstract * | by applicant | JPH06270752 | JP2004332627 |