EP1788535 - Device for indicating an emergency exit in a tunnel or similar [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.11.2009 Database last updated on 28.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.10.2011 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY, TR | published on 09.11.2011 [2011/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Almat AG Büelhalde 4 8317 Tagelswangen / CH | [2007/21] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kessler, Bruno Im Schatzacker 9 CH-8600 Dübendorf / CH | [2007/21] | Representative(s) | Luchs, Willi Luchs & Partner AG Patentanwälte Schulhausstrasse 12 8002 Zürich / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2007/21] | Luchs, Willi Luchs & Partner, Patentanwälte, Schulhausstrasse 12 8002 Zürich / CH | Application number, filing date | 05025190.9 | 18.11.2005 | [2007/21] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1788535 | Date: | 23.05.2007 | Language: | DE | [2007/21] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1788535 | Date: | 14.01.2009 | Language: | DE | [2009/03] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.11.2006 | Classification | IPC: | G08B5/36 | [2007/21] | CPC: |
G09F19/22 (EP);
G08B7/062 (EP);
G09F13/20 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/21] | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zum Signalisieren eines Notausganges in einem Tunnel oder dergleichen | [2007/21] | English: | Device for indicating an emergency exit in a tunnel or similar | [2007/21] | French: | Procédé destiné à la signalisation d'une sortie de secours dans un tunnel ou analogue | [2007/21] | Examination procedure | 18.11.2005 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: Priority | 10.03.2006 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: Priority 0001, 0002 | 19.11.2007 | Examination requested [2008/01] | 21.12.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.04.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.06.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.09.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 27.09.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 15.10.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/52] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.10.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.11.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 14.01.2009 | CZ | 14.01.2009 | DK | 14.01.2009 | EE | 14.01.2009 | FI | 14.01.2009 | IE | 14.01.2009 | IT | 14.01.2009 | LT | 14.01.2009 | LV | 14.01.2009 | NL | 14.01.2009 | PL | 14.01.2009 | RO | 14.01.2009 | SI | 14.01.2009 | SK | 14.01.2009 | TR | 14.01.2009 | BG | 14.04.2009 | SE | 14.04.2009 | GR | 15.04.2009 | ES | 25.04.2009 | IS | 14.05.2009 | PT | 15.06.2009 | HU | 15.07.2009 | [2011/44] |
Former [2011/32] | CZ | 14.01.2009 | |
DK | 14.01.2009 | ||
EE | 14.01.2009 | ||
FI | 14.01.2009 | ||
IE | 14.01.2009 | ||
IT | 14.01.2009 | ||
LT | 14.01.2009 | ||
LV | 14.01.2009 | ||
NL | 14.01.2009 | ||
PL | 14.01.2009 | ||
RO | 14.01.2009 | ||
SI | 14.01.2009 | ||
SK | 14.01.2009 | ||
BG | 14.04.2009 | ||
SE | 14.04.2009 | ||
GR | 15.04.2009 | ||
ES | 25.04.2009 | ||
IS | 14.05.2009 | ||
PT | 15.06.2009 | ||
HU | 15.07.2009 | ||
Former [2011/15] | CZ | 14.01.2009 | |
DK | 14.01.2009 | ||
EE | 14.01.2009 | ||
FI | 14.01.2009 | ||
IE | 14.01.2009 | ||
IT | 14.01.2009 | ||
LT | 14.01.2009 | ||
LV | 14.01.2009 | ||
NL | 14.01.2009 | ||
PL | 14.01.2009 | ||
RO | 14.01.2009 | ||
SI | 14.01.2009 | ||
SK | 14.01.2009 | ||
BG | 14.04.2009 | ||
SE | 14.04.2009 | ||
GR | 15.04.2009 | ||
ES | 25.04.2009 | ||
IS | 14.05.2009 | ||
PT | 15.06.2009 | ||
Former [2010/52] | CZ | 14.01.2009 | |
DK | 14.01.2009 | ||
EE | 14.01.2009 | ||
FI | 14.01.2009 | ||
IE | 14.01.2009 | ||
LT | 14.01.2009 | ||
LV | 14.01.2009 | ||
NL | 14.01.2009 | ||
PL | 14.01.2009 | ||
RO | 14.01.2009 | ||
SI | 14.01.2009 | ||
SK | 14.01.2009 | ||
BG | 14.04.2009 | ||
SE | 14.04.2009 | ||
GR | 15.04.2009 | ||
ES | 25.04.2009 | ||
IS | 14.05.2009 | ||
PT | 15.06.2009 | ||
Former [2010/11] | CZ | 14.01.2009 | |
DK | 14.01.2009 | ||
EE | 14.01.2009 | ||
FI | 14.01.2009 | ||
IE | 14.01.2009 | ||
LT | 14.01.2009 | ||
LV | 14.01.2009 | ||
NL | 14.01.2009 | ||
PL | 14.01.2009 | ||
RO | 14.01.2009 | ||
SI | 14.01.2009 | ||
SK | 14.01.2009 | ||
BG | 14.04.2009 | ||
SE | 14.04.2009 | ||
ES | 25.04.2009 | ||
IS | 14.05.2009 | ||
PT | 15.06.2009 | ||
Former [2009/51] | CZ | 14.01.2009 | |
DK | 14.01.2009 | ||
EE | 14.01.2009 | ||
FI | 14.01.2009 | ||
IE | 14.01.2009 | ||
LT | 14.01.2009 | ||
LV | 14.01.2009 | ||
NL | 14.01.2009 | ||
PL | 14.01.2009 | ||
RO | 14.01.2009 | ||
SI | 14.01.2009 | ||
SK | 14.01.2009 | ||
SE | 14.04.2009 | ||
ES | 25.04.2009 | ||
IS | 14.05.2009 | ||
PT | 15.06.2009 | ||
Former [2009/47] | DK | 14.01.2009 | |
FI | 14.01.2009 | ||
IE | 14.01.2009 | ||
LT | 14.01.2009 | ||
LV | 14.01.2009 | ||
NL | 14.01.2009 | ||
PL | 14.01.2009 | ||
SI | 14.01.2009 | ||
SE | 14.04.2009 | ||
ES | 25.04.2009 | ||
IS | 14.05.2009 | ||
PT | 15.06.2009 | ||
Former [2009/46] | DK | 14.01.2009 | |
FI | 14.01.2009 | ||
LT | 14.01.2009 | ||
LV | 14.01.2009 | ||
NL | 14.01.2009 | ||
PL | 14.01.2009 | ||
SI | 14.01.2009 | ||
SE | 14.04.2009 | ||
ES | 25.04.2009 | ||
IS | 14.05.2009 | ||
PT | 15.06.2009 | ||
Former [2009/45] | FI | 14.01.2009 | |
LT | 14.01.2009 | ||
LV | 14.01.2009 | ||
NL | 14.01.2009 | ||
PL | 14.01.2009 | ||
SI | 14.01.2009 | ||
SE | 14.04.2009 | ||
ES | 25.04.2009 | ||
IS | 14.05.2009 | ||
PT | 15.06.2009 | ||
Former [2009/27] | NL | 14.01.2009 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]CH278427 (DUERST HEINRICH [CH]) [A] 1 * the whole document *; | [A]CH306527 (MONERO EMILIO [IT]) [A] 1 * the whole document *; | [Y]CH457623 (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [Y] 14 * column 3, line 51 - column 4, line 2; figure 3 *; | [X]DE29602795U (BOOS & HAHN LICHT FORM FARBE G [DE]) [X] 9,11 * page 4, line 30 * * page 6, lines 17-24 ** page 7, lines 4-31; figures 1,2 *; | [A]DE29806648U (WIENSKOWSKI JEAN VON [DE]) [A] 1 * page 2, paragraph 3 * * page 3, paragraph 4 * * figure 1; claim 1 *; | [XY]US6050700 (SATTERFIELD LAWRENCE CRAIG [US]) [X] 9-11 * abstract * * column 2, lines 15-59 * * column 3, line 5 - column 4, line 51 * * figures 1-3,7 * [Y] 14 |