EP1769763 - System for creating lesions using bipolar electrodes [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent revoked Status updated on 10.01.2020 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 02.02.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 18.09.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.01.2020 | Revocation of patent | published on 12.02.2020 [2020/07] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Covidien AG Victor von Bruns-Strasse 19 8212 Neuhausen am Rheinfall / CH | [2018/10] |
Former [2007/33] | For all designated states Covidien AG Victor von Bruns-Strasse 19 8212 Neuhausen am Rheinfall / CH | ||
Former [2007/14] | For all designated states Sherwood Services AG Bahnhofstrasse 29 8200 Schaffhausen / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
McPherson, James W. 3365 Chisholm Trail, 302 Boulder, CO 80301 / US | [2018/10] |
Former [2007/14] | 01 /
McPherson, James W. 3365 Chisholm Trail, Apt. 302 Boulder, CO 80301 / US | Representative(s) | Soames, Candida Jane, et al Maschio & Soames IP Limited 30 Carlton Crescent Southampton SO15 2EW / GB | [2018/10] |
Former [2008/31] | HOFFMANN EITLE Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4 81925 München / DE | ||
Former [2007/14] | HOFFMANN EITLE Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4 81925 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 05025423.4 | 22.11.2005 | [2007/14] | Priority number, date | US20050239999 | 30.09.2005 Original published format: US 239999 | [2007/14] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1769763 | Date: | 04.04.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/14] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1769763 | Date: | 07.03.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/10] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.01.2007 | Classification | IPC: | A61B18/14, A61B18/12 | [2017/41] | CPC: |
A61B18/1477 (EP,US);
A61B2018/00023 (EP,US);
A61B2018/00678 (EP,US);
A61B2018/00702 (EP,US);
A61B2018/00875 (EP,US);
A61B2018/124 (EP,US);
A61B2018/143 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2007/14] | A61B18/14 | Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IE, IT [2018/10] |
Former [2007/50] | DE, ES, FR, GB, IE, IT | ||
Former [2007/14] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | System zur Erzeugung von Läsionen unter Verwendung bipolarer Elektroden | [2007/14] | English: | System for creating lesions using bipolar electrodes | [2007/14] | French: | Système pour la creation de lésions utilisant des électrodes bipolaires | [2007/14] | Examination procedure | 02.10.2007 | Examination requested [2007/46] | 05.10.2007 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 07.11.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.11.2007 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, FI, GR, HU, IS, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 17.03.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.05.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.09.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.12.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.04.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.09.2017 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 22.09.2017 | 19.09.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.09.2017 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 19.01.2018 | Fee for grant paid | 19.01.2018 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 19.01.2018 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 07.11.2007 | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
06.12.2018
ADMISSIBLE OLYMPUS WINTER & IBE GMBH Kuehnstrasse 61 22045 Hamburg / DE Opponent's representative Eisenführ Speiser Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte PartGmbB Johannes-Brahms-Platz 1 20355 Hamburg / DE | [2019/03] | 07.01.2019 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 16.09.2019 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked | 26.09.2019 | Legal effect of revocation of patent [2020/07] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.11.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.11.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.11.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 24.11.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 23.11.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 26.11.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 27.11.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 25.11.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 22.10.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 23.11.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 22.11.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 13 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | ES | 07.03.2018 | IT | 07.03.2018 | IE | 22.11.2018 | [2019/48] |
Former [2018/47] | ES | 07.03.2018 | |
IT | 07.03.2018 | ||
Former [2018/38] | ES | 07.03.2018 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO9922657 (RITA MEDICAL SYSTEMS INC [US], et al) [A] 1* page 10, line 8 - page 11, line 28; figures 3,8 *; | [YD]US6203541 (KEPPEL DAVID [US]) [YD] 4,5 * column 5, line 25 - column 6, line 61 *; | [AD]US6506189 (RITTMAN III WILLIAM J [US], et al) [AD] 6 * column A; figure 2 *; | [XY]DE10224154 (CELON AG MEDICAL INSTRUMENTS [DE]) [X] 1-3,6 * paragraphs [0039] , [0041] , [0043] , [0046] , [0048] , [0054]; figures 2,5a,5b * [Y] 4,5; | [A]US2004181216 (KELLY AMY C [US], et al) [A] 1,6 * paragraphs [0047] , [0048] , [0066]; figures 6,16 *; | [A]FR2864439 (IMAGE GUIDED THERAPY [FR]) [A] 1 * page 13, line 13 - page 14, line 15; figures 8,9 * | Examination | US2002193851 | by applicant | US6203541 | US6506189 | US2004254573 | US2005107785 | US2005107784 | US2005119655 | US2005154387 | Opposition | US5334193 | WO9634571 | WO9922657 | US6203541 | US2002193851 | US6506189 | DE10224154 | US2004181216 | FR2864439 | EP1769763 | - RITZ et al., "Bipolar radiofrequency ablation of liver metastases during laparotomy. First clinical experiences with a new multipolar ablation concept", International Journal of Colorectal Disease, (20050505), doi:10.1007/s00384-005-0781-y, pages 25 - 32, XP019340275 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/s00384-005-0781-y | - TACKE et al., "Multipolar Radiofrequency Ablation: First Clinical Results", ROTO, (20040300), pages 324 - 329, XP008126125 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1055/S-2004-812723 | - "CelonLab Power", Celon AG medical instruments, pages 1 - 174 | - "Radio Frequency Ablation System: Cool-tip RF", Tycro Healthcare, (20000000), pages 1 - 8, XP055616432 |