EP1790656 - Solution-phase synthesis of leuprolide [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 30.05.2008 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.05.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 02.07.2008 [2008/27] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NANOKEM S.A. Luis A. des Herrera 1248 World Trade Center Torre B CP 11300 Montevideo / UY | [2007/22] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kadzimirs, Daniel Synthycon GmbH, Am Haupttor, Gebäude 4202 06237 Leuna / DE | 02 /
Jas, Gerhard Synthacon GmbH, Am Haupttor, Gebäude 4202 06237 Leuna / DE | 03 /
Autze, Voker Synthacon GmbH, Am Haupttor, Gebäude 4202 06237 Leuna / DE | [2007/22] | Representative(s) | Kador & Partner Part mbB Corneliusstraße 15 80469 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2007/22] | Kador & Partner Corneliusstrasse 15 80469 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 05025801.1 | 25.11.2005 | [2007/22] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1790656 | Date: | 30.05.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/22] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.07.2006 | Classification | IPC: | C07K7/23 | [2007/22] | CPC: |
C07K7/23 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | [2008/06] |
Former [2007/22] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Lösungsphasesynthese von Leuprolid | [2007/22] | English: | Solution-phase synthesis of leuprolide | [2007/22] | French: | Synthèse en phase liquide du leuprolide | [2007/22] | Examination procedure | 01.12.2007 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2008/27] | 04.02.2008 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2008/27] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.2007 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP1291356 (AKZO NOBEL NV [NL]) [X] 1-3* the whole document *; | [X] - I P EGGEN ET AL., "DioRaSSP: Diosynth rapid solution synthesis of peptides", ORGANIC PROCESS RESEARCH AND DEVELOPMENT, GB CAMBRIDGE, (200501), vol. 9, no. 1, pages 98 - 101, XP002381869 [X] 1-3 * the whole document * |