EP1667397 - Handling real-time transport protocol (RTP) media packets in voice over internet protocol (VoIP) terminal [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 08.11.2019 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 30.11.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 01.07.2018 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 03.11.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.11.2019 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 11.12.2019 [2019/50] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. 129, Samsung-ro Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si, Gyeonggi-do, 443-742 / KR | [2012/38] |
Former [2006/23] | For all designated states Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. 416 Maetan-Dong, Yeongtong-Gu Suwon-si, Gyeonggi-Do / KR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kim, Jung-Gi 303-403 LG Dongsuwon XI Apt. Mangpo-dong 698 Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si Gyeonggi-do / KR | [2019/01] |
Former [2006/23] | 01 /
Kim, Jung-Gi 303-403 LG Dongsuwon XI Apt. Mangpo-dong 698 Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si Gyeonggi-do / KR | Representative(s) | Nederlandsch Octrooibureau P.O. Box 29720 2502 LS The Hague / NL | [2013/28] |
Former [2012/11] | Hutter, Jacobus Johannes, et al Nederlandsch Octrooibureau J.W. Frisolaan 13 2517 JS The Hague / NL | ||
Former [2008/33] | Lang, Johannes Bardehle Pagenberg Dost Altenburg Geissler, Postfach 86 06 20 81633 München / DE | ||
Former [2006/23] | Lang, Johannes Bardehle Pagenberg Dost Altenburg Geissler Isenbruck Postfach 86 06 20 81633 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 05025979.5 | 29.11.2005 | [2006/23] | Priority number, date | KR20040100678 | 02.12.2004 Original published format: KR 2004100678 | [2006/23] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1667397 | Date: | 07.06.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/23] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1667397 | Date: | 02.01.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/01] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.02.2006 | Classification | IPC: | H04L29/06, // G10L25/78 | [2018/30] | CPC: |
H04L65/65 (EP,US);
H04W28/10 (KR);
H04L65/70 (EP,US);
H04L12/66 (KR);
H04L65/1101 (US);
H04W84/12 (KR);
G10L25/78 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2006/23] | H04L29/06, G10L19/00 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [2019/01] |
Former [2007/07] | DE, FR, GB, IT | ||
Former [2006/23] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Verarbeitung von Echtzeitübertragungsprotokoll (RTP) Mediapaketen in einem Sprache-über-Internet-Protokoll (VoIP) Endgerät | [2018/30] | English: | Handling real-time transport protocol (RTP) media packets in voice over internet protocol (VoIP) terminal | [2006/23] | French: | Traitement de paquets multimedia d' un protocole de transmission en temps réel (RTP) dans un terminal de voix sur protocole Internet (VoIP) | [2018/28] |
Former [2006/23] | Verarbeitung von Echtzeitubertragungprotokoll (RTP) Mediapaketen in einem Sprache-über-Internet-Protokoll (VoIP) Endgerät | ||
Former [2006/23] | Traitement de paquets multimedia par un protocole de transmission en temps réel (RTP) dans un terminal de voix sur protocole Internet (VoIP) | Examination procedure | 29.11.2005 | Examination requested [2006/23] | 08.01.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.05.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.06.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.10.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.02.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.06.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.10.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.02.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.03.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 18.05.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.07.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.11.2018 | Fee for grant paid | 12.11.2018 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 12.11.2018 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 08.01.2007 | Opposition(s) | 03.10.2019 | No opposition filed within time limit [2019/50] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.11.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.11.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 19.11.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 22.11.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 23.10.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 15.11.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 20.11.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 11.11.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 23.11.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 10.11.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 23.11.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 14 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | IT | 02.01.2019 | [2019/46] | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO03052747 (MOTOROLA INC [US]) [A] 1-28* page 4, line 32 - page 5, line 24 *; | [A]US6621834 (SCHERPBIER ANDREW W [US], et al) [A] 1-28 * figure 2 * * column 6, line 51 - column 7, line 59 * | by applicant | WO03052747 | US6621834 |