EP1661504 - Dishwasher [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 26.06.2009 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.04.2011 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): LU | published on 25.05.2011 [2011/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Fisher & Paykel Appliances Limited 78 Springs Road East Tamaki Auckland / NZ | [2006/22] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Sargeant, Adrian Anthony 290 Helensburgh Road Dundedin / NZ | 02 /
Butler, Richard George 20 Como Street Maori Hill Dunedin / NZ | 03 /
Wilks, John 23 Iona Road Havelock North, Hastings / NZ | 04 /
Kazianus, Babis 4 Shetland Street Dunedin / NZ | 05 /
Maunsell, Steve 320 Gladstone Road Mosgiel Dunedin / NZ | [2006/22] | Representative(s) | Hoarton, Lloyd Douglas Charles, et al Forresters IP LLP Skygarden Erika-Mann-Strasse 11 80636 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/44] | Hoarton, Lloyd Douglas Charles, et al Forrester & Boehmert Pettenkoferstrasse 20-22 80336 Munich / DE | ||
Former [2006/36] | Hoarton, Lloyd Douglas Charles, et al Forrester & Boehmert, Pettenkoferstrasse 20-22 80336 München / DE | ||
Former [2006/22] | Brown, John D. FORRESTER & BOEHMERT Pettenkoferstrasse 20-22 80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 05026041.3 | 30.01.1998 | [2006/22] | Priority number, date | NZ19970314155 | 30.01.1997 Original published format: NZ 31415597 | [2006/22] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1661504 | Date: | 31.05.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/22] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1661504 | Date: | 28.06.2006 | [2006/26] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1661504 | Date: | 20.08.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/34] |
Former [2006/25] | Type: | A3 Search report | |
No.: | EP1661504 | ||
Date: | |||
Status: | (deleted) | ||
[2006/25] | |||
[2006/26] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.04.2006 | Classification | IPC: | A47L15/42, H02H3/33, H02H3/05 | [2006/22] | CPC: |
H02H3/334 (EP,US);
A47L15/00 (KR);
A47L15/0021 (EP,US);
A47L15/0026 (EP,US);
A47L15/0055 (EP,US);
A47L15/0084 (EP,US);
A47L15/42 (KR);
A47L15/4217 (EP,US);
A47L15/4221 (EP,US);
A47L15/4223 (EP,US);
A47L15/4225 (EP,US);
A47L15/4257 (EP,US);
A47L15/4263 (EP,US);
A47L15/4285 (EP,US);
A47L15/44 (EP,US);
A47L15/4436 (EP,US);
A47L15/46 (EP,US);
D06F39/085 (EP,US);
A47L2401/20 (EP,US);
A47L2501/03 (EP,US);
A47L2501/28 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2006/22] | Title | German: | Geschirrspülmaschine | [2006/22] | English: | Dishwasher | [2006/22] | French: | Lave-vaisselle | [2006/22] | Examination procedure | 29.11.2005 | Examination requested [2006/22] | 06.10.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.01.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.02.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.07.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 10.07.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP03025401.5 / EP1393667 | EP98901600.1 / EP1021123 | Divisional application(s) | EP06026371.2 / EP1785083 | Opposition(s) | 25.05.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/31] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.11.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.11.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.11.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.11.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 29.11.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 29.11.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 29.11.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 12.01.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 14.01.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 11 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 20.08.2008 | BE | 20.08.2008 | DK | 20.08.2008 | FI | 20.08.2008 | NL | 20.08.2008 | SE | 20.11.2008 | GR | 21.11.2008 | ES | 01.12.2008 | PT | 20.01.2009 | IE | 30.01.2009 | LU | 30.01.2009 | CH | 31.01.2009 | LI | 31.01.2009 | MC | 31.01.2009 | FR | 02.02.2009 | [2011/21] |
Former [2010/52] | AT | 20.08.2008 | |
BE | 20.08.2008 | ||
DK | 20.08.2008 | ||
FI | 20.08.2008 | ||
NL | 20.08.2008 | ||
SE | 20.11.2008 | ||
GR | 21.11.2008 | ||
ES | 01.12.2008 | ||
PT | 20.01.2009 | ||
IE | 30.01.2009 | ||
CH | 31.01.2009 | ||
LI | 31.01.2009 | ||
MC | 31.01.2009 | ||
FR | 02.02.2009 | ||
Former [2010/21] | AT | 20.08.2008 | |
BE | 20.08.2008 | ||
DK | 20.08.2008 | ||
FI | 20.08.2008 | ||
NL | 20.08.2008 | ||
SE | 20.11.2008 | ||
ES | 01.12.2008 | ||
PT | 20.01.2009 | ||
IE | 30.01.2009 | ||
CH | 31.01.2009 | ||
LI | 31.01.2009 | ||
MC | 31.01.2009 | ||
FR | 02.02.2009 | ||
Former [2010/11] | AT | 20.08.2008 | |
BE | 20.08.2008 | ||
DK | 20.08.2008 | ||
FI | 20.08.2008 | ||
NL | 20.08.2008 | ||
SE | 20.11.2008 | ||
ES | 01.12.2008 | ||
PT | 20.01.2009 | ||
IE | 30.01.2009 | ||
CH | 31.01.2009 | ||
LI | 31.01.2009 | ||
MC | 31.01.2009 | ||
Former [2010/07] | AT | 20.08.2008 | |
BE | 20.08.2008 | ||
DK | 20.08.2008 | ||
FI | 20.08.2008 | ||
NL | 20.08.2008 | ||
ES | 01.12.2008 | ||
PT | 20.01.2009 | ||
IE | 30.01.2009 | ||
CH | 31.01.2009 | ||
LI | 31.01.2009 | ||
MC | 31.01.2009 | ||
Former [2009/48] | AT | 20.08.2008 | |
BE | 20.08.2008 | ||
DK | 20.08.2008 | ||
FI | 20.08.2008 | ||
NL | 20.08.2008 | ||
ES | 01.12.2008 | ||
PT | 20.01.2009 | ||
CH | 31.01.2009 | ||
LI | 31.01.2009 | ||
MC | 31.01.2009 | ||
Former [2009/45] | AT | 20.08.2008 | |
BE | 20.08.2008 | ||
DK | 20.08.2008 | ||
FI | 20.08.2008 | ||
NL | 20.08.2008 | ||
ES | 01.12.2008 | ||
PT | 20.01.2009 | ||
MC | 31.01.2009 | ||
Former [2009/27] | AT | 20.08.2008 | |
BE | 20.08.2008 | ||
DK | 20.08.2008 | ||
FI | 20.08.2008 | ||
NL | 20.08.2008 | ||
ES | 01.12.2008 | ||
PT | 20.01.2009 | ||
Former [2009/19] | AT | 20.08.2008 | |
BE | 20.08.2008 | ||
DK | 20.08.2008 | ||
FI | 20.08.2008 | ||
NL | 20.08.2008 | ||
ES | 01.12.2008 | ||
Former [2009/14] | AT | 20.08.2008 | |
FI | 20.08.2008 | ||
NL | 20.08.2008 | ||
ES | 01.12.2008 | ||
Former [2009/12] | NL | 20.08.2008 | |
ES | 01.12.2008 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JPH08196503 ; | [A]US2661750 (MCNAIRY JACOB W) [A] 5* the whole document *; | [A]US2836186 (GUTH LAUREN W) [A] 5 * the whole document *; | [A]US3169540 (MOORE FRED W, et al) [A] 5 * the whole document *; | [A]US4608780 (VAN NOY WILLIAM J [US]) [A] 1 * figure 7 *; | [DA]WO9312706 (FISHER & PAYKEL [NZ]) [DA] 5 * page 18, line 24 - page 19, line 23; figures 19-22 * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19961226), vol. 1996, no. 12, & JP08196503 A 19960806 (SEKISUI HOUSE LTD) [A] 2 * the whole document * |