EP1657027 - Connected nail supplying mechanism for nailing machine [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.12.2008 Database last updated on 13.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.12.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 21.01.2009 [2009/04] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MAX CO., LTD. 6-6, Nihonbashi Hakozaki-cho, Chuo-ku Tokyo / JP | [2006/20] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Satoshi, Osuga Max Co. Ltd. 6-6 Nihonbashi Hakozaki-cho Chuo-ku Tokyo / JP | 02 /
Mitsugu, Takezaki Max Co. Ltd. 6-6 Nihonbashi Hakozaki-cho Chuo-ku Tokyo / JP | 03 /
Michiaki, Adachi Max Co. Ltd. 6-6 Nihonbashi Hakozaki-cho Chuo-ku Tokyo / JP | [2006/20] | Representative(s) | Turi, Michael, et al Samson & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Widenmayerstrasse 6 80538 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2006/20] | Turi, Michael, et al Samson & Partner Widenmayerstrasse 5 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 05026135.3 | 16.11.2001 | [2006/20] | Priority number, date | JP20000349266 | 16.11.2000 Original published format: JP 2000349266 | JP20010014277 | 23.01.2001 Original published format: JP 2001014277 | JP20010014278 | 23.01.2001 Original published format: JP 2001014278 | JP20010297333 | 27.09.2001 Original published format: JP 2001297333 | [2006/20] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1657027 | Date: | 17.05.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/20] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1657027 | Date: | 13.02.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/07] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.03.2006 | Classification | IPC: | B25C1/00 | [2006/20] | CPC: |
B25C1/001 (EP,US);
B25C1/00 (EP,US);
B25C1/005 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2006/20] | Title | German: | Zuführvorrichtung von Nagelstreifen für Nagelmaschinen | [2006/20] | English: | Connected nail supplying mechanism for nailing machine | [2006/20] | French: | Mécanisme d'alimentation de clous connectés en série pour une machine à clouer | [2006/20] | Examination procedure | 04.10.2006 | Examination requested [2006/46] | 22.05.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.09.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 26.09.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP01127234.1 / EP1207017 | Opposition(s) | 14.11.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/04] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.11.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.11.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.11.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 24.11.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 29.11.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2994878 (ABRAHAMSEN JOHAN E) [A] 1 * figures 1-5 *; | [A]US4558811 (KLAUS ARTUR F [DE]) [A] 1,5 * figure - *; | [A]EP0298760 (SENCO PRODUCTS [US]) [A] 1,2 * figure 11 *; | [A]US5335800 (LIU CHUNG-HO [TW]) [A] 1 * figure - *; | [A]EP0739690 (MAX CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1* abstract *; | [A]EP1033209 (MAX CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1-6 * figures 6,10,11,14,18,20a,20b * |