EP1671693 - Filter and method of making said filter [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 25.06.2010 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.06.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 28.07.2010 [2010/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Henkel AG & Co. KGaA Henkelstraße 67 40589 Düsseldorf / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/20] | For all designated states Henkel AG & Co. KGaA Henkelstrasse 67 40589 Düsseldorf / DE | ||
Former [2006/25] | For all designated states National Starch and Chemical Investment Holding Corporation 1000 Uniqema Boulevard New Castle Delaware 19720 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Orloff, John E. 5 Edith Drive Lawrenceville New Jersey 08648 / US | 02 /
Lydzinsky, David W. 37 Hoagland Drive Belle Mead New Jersey 08502 / US | 03 /
Dolan, Peter 987 Cherry Valley Road Princeton New Jersey 08540 / US | [2006/25] | Representative(s) | Held, Stephan, et al Meissner Bolte Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Postfach 86 06 24 81633 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2006/25] | Held, Stephan, et al Meissner, Bolte & Partner GbR Postfach 86 03 29 81630 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 05026171.8 | 01.12.2005 | [2006/25] | Priority number, date | US20040633940P | 07.12.2004 Original published format: US 633940 P | [2006/25] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1671693 | Date: | 21.06.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/25] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1671693 | Date: | 18.02.2009 | [2009/08] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.01.2009 | Classification | IPC: | B01D29/01, B01D29/11, B01D39/18 | [2009/08] | CPC: |
B01D46/0005 (EP,US);
B01D39/18 (EP,US);
B01D46/02 (EP,US);
B01D46/10 (EP,US);
B01D46/521 (EP,US);
B01D2265/04 (EP,US);
B01D2279/50 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2006/25] | B01D29/01, B01D29/11 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/25] | Title | German: | Filter und Verfahren zu seiner Herstellung | [2006/25] | English: | Filter and method of making said filter | [2006/25] | French: | Filtre et procédé de sa fabrication | [2006/25] | Examination procedure | 17.08.2009 | Examination requested [2009/40] | 16.09.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.01.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2010/30] | 08.03.2010 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2010/30] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.12.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.12.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.12.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]GB736133 (PUROLATOR PRODUCTS INC) [Y] 1-6 * page 2, line 86 - line 103; claim 1 * * page 3, line 1 - line 15 *; | [Y]US4561918 (SCHARFENBERG PAUL M [US], et al) [Y] 1-6 * abstract * * column 2, line 40 - line 66 *; | [Y]EP1002731 (SONOCO PRODUCTS CO [US]) [Y] 1-6* abstract *; | [Y]US2003182895 (SKRZYNIARZ RONALD J [US], et al) [Y] 1-6 * paragraphs [0009] , [0010] , [0015] * |