EP1793163 - Steam generator tube, method of manufacturing the same and once-through steam generator [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 06.06.2008 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.06.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 09.07.2008 [2008/28] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Werner-von-Siemens-Str. 1 DE-80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2007/23] | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Wittelsbacherplatz 2 80333 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Franke, Joachim, Dr. Klosterbergstrasse 9 90518 Altdorf / DE | 02 /
Herbst, Oliver Alte Rinne 23 91077 Dormitz / DE | 03 /
Schmidt, Holger, Dr. Pommernstrasse 9 91052 Erlangen / DE | [2007/23] | Application number, filing date | 05026486.0 | 05.12.2005 | [2007/23] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1793163 | Date: | 06.06.2007 | Language: | DE | [2007/23] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.09.2006 | Classification | IPC: | F22B37/18, F22B29/06 | [2007/23] | CPC: |
F22B29/06 (EP,KR,US);
F22B37/18 (EP,KR,US);
Y02P80/15 (EP,US);
Y10T29/49361 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | [2008/07] |
Former [2007/23] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Dampferzeugerrohr, zugehöriges Herstellungsverfahren sowie Durchlaufdampferzeuger | [2007/23] | English: | Steam generator tube, method of manufacturing the same and once-through steam generator | [2007/23] | French: | Tube de générateur de vapeur, procédé de fabrication associé et chaudière à vapeur à passage unique | [2007/23] | Examination procedure | 07.12.2007 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2008/28] | 31.01.2008 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2008/28] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2007 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE435222 (SIEMENS SCHUCKERTWERKE GMBH) [A] 1-11* the whole document *; | [A]US3343523 (GORZEGNO WALTER P, et al) [A] 1-11 * abstract *; | [A]US4856461 (HAYES JAMES K [US]) [A] 1-11 * column 3, line 8 - column 6, line 54; figures 3,9 * * abstract *; | [A]WO2004033962 (NOOTER ERIKSEN INC [US]) [A] 1-11 * page 3, line 17 - page 6, line 24; figures 3-6; claim - * * abstract * |