EP1793164 - Steam generator tube, method of manufacturing the same and once-through steam generator [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 20.06.2008 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.06.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 23.07.2008 [2008/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Werner-von-Siemens-Str. 1 DE-80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2007/23] | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Wittelsbacherplatz 2 80333 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Franke, Joachim, Dr. Klosterbergstrasse 9 80518 Altdorf / DE | 02 /
Herbst, Oliver Alte Rinne 23 91077 Dormitz / DE | 03 /
Schmidt, Holger, Dr. Pommernstrasse 9 91052 Erlangen / DE | [2007/23] | Application number, filing date | 05026487.8 | 05.12.2005 | [2007/23] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1793164 | Date: | 06.06.2007 | Language: | DE | [2007/23] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.09.2006 | Classification | IPC: | F22B37/18, F22B29/06 | [2007/23] | CPC: |
F22B29/06 (EP,KR,US);
F22B37/18 (EP,KR,US)
| Designated contracting states | [2008/07] |
Former [2007/23] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Dampferzeugerrohr, zugehöriges Herstellungsverfahren sowie Durchlaufdampferzeuger | [2007/23] | English: | Steam generator tube, method of manufacturing the same and once-through steam generator | [2007/23] | French: | Tube de générateur de vapeur, procédé de fabrication associé et chaudière à vapeur à passage unique | [2007/23] | Examination procedure | 07.12.2007 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2008/30] | 04.02.2008 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2008/30] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2007 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]GB692306 (ROBERT JOHN FROST) [A] 1-14 * page 1, line 72 - page 2, line 39; figure - *; | [A]GB1146162 (AMERICAN RADIATOR & STANDARD) [A] 1-14 * page 1, line 89 - page 3, line 21; figure - *; | [A]EP0302125 (RONCHI ELENA) [A] 1-14 * column 3, line 3 - column 4, line 37; figure 2 * * abstract *; | [A]WO2005018837 (TECHNOSCIENCE INTEGRATED TECHN [SG], et al) [A] 1-14 * the whole document *; | [A]DE100563 (WILLIAM ARTHUR PERCY WERNER) [A] 1-14 * the whole document * |