EP1650909 - Method for connection acceptance control and rapid determination of optimal multi-media content delivery over networks [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.03.2011 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.03.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 06.04.2011 [2011/14] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Democrasoft, Inc. 613 Fourth Street, Suite 201 Santa Rosa, CA 95404 / US | [2010/42] |
Former [2006/17] | For all designated states BURST.COM, INC. 613 Fourth Street, Suite 201 Santa Rosa, California 95404 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Allen, Arthur D. 1322 Isabelle Avenue Mountain View, CA 94040 / US | [2006/17] | Representative(s) | Schorr, Frank Jürgen, et al Diehl & Partner GbR Augustenstrasse 46 80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/37] | Schorr, Frank Jürgen, et al Diehl & Partner Augustenstrasse 46 80333 München / DE | ||
Former [2006/17] | Schorr, Frank Jürgen, et al Diehl & Partner GbR Augustenstrasse 46 80333 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 05026589.1 | 25.06.2002 | [2006/17] | Priority number, date | US20010893364 | 26.06.2001 Original published format: US 893364 | [2006/17] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1650909 | Date: | 26.04.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/17] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1650909 | Date: | 28.04.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/17] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.03.2006 | Classification | IPC: | H04L12/56, H04N7/24, H04N5/00 | [2006/17] | CPC: |
H04L65/80 (EP,US);
H04L47/10 (EP,US);
H04L47/15 (EP,US);
H04L47/19 (EP,US);
H04L47/25 (EP,US);
H04L47/29 (EP,US);
H04L47/70 (EP,US);
H04L47/741 (EP,US);
H04L47/762 (EP,US);
H04L47/765 (EP,US);
H04L47/801 (EP,US);
H04L47/821 (EP,US);
H04L47/822 (EP,US);
H04L47/823 (EP,US);
H04L47/826 (EP,US);
H04L47/83 (EP);
H04L49/90 (EP,US);
H04L65/1101 (US);
H04L65/612 (EP,US);
H04L65/752 (EP);
H04L67/01 (US);
H04L67/62 (EP,US);
H04L9/40 (US);
H04N21/23805 (EP,US);
H04N21/2381 (EP,US);
H04N21/2385 (EP,US);
H04N21/2396 (EP,US);
H04N21/2401 (EP,US);
H04N21/2402 (EP,US);
H04N21/26216 (EP,US);
H04N21/2662 (EP,US);
H04N21/47202 (EP,US);
H04N21/6377 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2006/17] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Annahmesteuerung von Verbindungen und schnelle Bestimmung der Lieferung von Multimedia Inhalten in Netzen | [2006/17] | English: | Method for connection acceptance control and rapid determination of optimal multi-media content delivery over networks | [2006/17] | French: | Procédé de commande d'acceptation de connexion et détermination rapide de distribution optimale de contenu multimédia sur des réseaux | [2006/17] | Examination procedure | 06.12.2005 | Examination requested [2006/17] | 04.12.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.04.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.11.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.03.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 17.03.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP02746450.2 / EP1402690 | Opposition(s) | 31.01.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/14] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 06.12.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 06.12.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.12.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.06.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 30.06.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 26.06.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.2006 | 05   M06   Fee paid on   22.12.2006 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X] - KIM S ET AL, "CALL ADMISSION CONTROL FOR PRIORITIZED ADAPTIVE MULTIMEDIA SERVICESIN WIRELESS/MOBILE NETWORKS", VTC 2000-SPRING. 2000 IEEE 51ST. VEHICULAR TECHNOLOGY CONFERENCE PROCEEDINGS. TOKYO, JAPAN, MAY 15-18, 2000, IEEE VEHICULAR TECHNOLGY CONFERENCE, NEW YORK, NY : IEEE, US, (20000515), VOL. 2 OF 3. CONF. 51, ISBN 0-7803-5719-1, pages 1536 - 1540, XP000968128 [X] 1,9,10 * the whole document * | [X] - REININGER D ET AL, "A DYNAMIC QUALITY OF SERVICE FRAMEWORK FOR VIDEO IN BROADBAND NETWORKS", IEEE NETWORK, IEEE SERVICE CENTER, NEW YORK, NY, US, (199811), vol. 12, no. 6, ISSN 0890-8044, pages 22 - 34, XP000873125 [X] 1,9,10 * abstract * * page 23, column R, line 9 - page 24, column L, line 3; figure 3 * * page 27, column L, line 20 - line 30 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/65.752642 | [A] - BEARD C C ET AL, "Connection admission control for differentiating priority traffic on public networks", MILITARY COMMUNICATIONS CONFERENCE PROCEEDINGS, 1999. MILCOM 1999. IEEE ATLANTIC CITY, NJ, USA 31 OCT.-3 NOV. 1999, PISCATAWAY, NJ, USA,IEEE, US, (19991031), vol. 2, ISBN 0-7803-5538-5, pages 1401 - 1408, XP010369770 [A] 1-10 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/MILCOM.1999.821434 | [A] - BRONSTEIN I N ET AL, "Taschenbuch der Mathematik, LINEARE OPTIMIERUNG", TASCHENBUCH DER MATHEMATIK, (1989), pages 695 - 698, XP002232562 [A] 1-10 * page 695 - page 698 * |