EP1672914 - Image taking apparatus and image taking method [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 10.03.2017 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.03.2017 | New entry: Date of cancellation oral proceedings | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CANON KABUSHIKI KAISHA 3-30-2, Shimomaruko, Ohta-ku Tokyo / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2006/25] | For all designated states CANON KABUSHIKI KAISHA 3-30-2 Shimomaruko Ohta-ku, Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Okada, Kouji Canon Kabushiki Kaisha 3-30-2 Shimomaruko Ohta-ku Tokyo / JP | [2006/25] | Representative(s) | WESER & Kollegen Patentanwälte PartmbB Radeckestraße 43 81245 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2014/42] | WESER & Kollegen Radeckestraße 43 81245 München / DE | ||
Former [2006/25] | Weser, Wolfgang Weser & Kollegen, Patentanwälte, Radeckestrasse 43 81245 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 05026843.2 | 08.12.2005 | [2006/25] | Priority number, date | JP20040363411 | 15.12.2004 Original published format: JP 2004363411 | [2006/25] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1672914 | Date: | 21.06.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/25] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1672914 | Date: | 31.12.2008 | [2009/01] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.11.2008 | Classification | IPC: | H04N5/232 | [2006/25] | CPC: |
H04N23/951 (EP,US);
H04N23/73 (EP,US);
H04N23/68 (EP,US);
H04N23/6845 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/25] | Title | German: | Bildaufnahmevorrichtung und -verfahren | [2006/25] | English: | Image taking apparatus and image taking method | [2006/25] | French: | Dispositif et méthode de prise de vue | [2006/25] | Examination procedure | 09.06.2009 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 30.06.2009 | Examination requested [2009/33] | 27.11.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.03.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.03.2017 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2017/15] | 10.03.2017 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 11.05.2017 | 11.05.2017 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 27.11.2015 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.01.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 04.01.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 03.01.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 02.01.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 02.01.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 02.01.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 05.01.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 04.01.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 02.01.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 12 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JP2002135646 (CANON KK) [A] 1,2 * paragraphs [0013] , [0014] * * paragraphs [0039] - [0065] * * figure 6 *; | [XY]JP2004048421 (MINOLTA CO LTD) [X] 1,2,4 * paragraph [0008] * * paragraph [0012] * * paragraphs [0017] - [0019] * * paragraphs [0024] - [0064] * * figures 2-5 * [Y] 3,5,6; | [A]US6778210 (SUGAHARA TAKURO [JP], et al) [A] 1,3,5,6 * paragraphs [0010] - [0021] * * paragraphs [0027] - [0068] * * figure 2 *; | [A]US2004197075 (AISO SEIJI [JP]) [A] 1,3,5 * paragraphs [0089] - [0206] ** figures 3-19 *; | [Y]US2004239775 (WASHISU KOICHI [JP]) [Y] 3,5,6 * figures 1-9 * * paragraphs [0025] - [0313] * | by applicant | JP2004048421 | US2004239779 |