EP1750259 - Optical recording medium [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.09.2010 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.09.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 27.10.2010 [2010/43] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states LG Electronics Inc. 20, Yoido-Dong Yongdungpo-Gu Seoul 150-010 / KR | [N/P] |
Former [2009/30] | For all designated states LG Electronics Inc. 20, Yoido-Dong Yongdungpo-Gu Seoul 150-010 / KR | ||
Former [2007/06] | For all designated states LG Electronics Inc. 20, Yoido-Gong Yongdungpo-Gu Seoul 150-010 / KR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Lee, Kwang Lyul 517-22, Sinsa-dong Gangnam-gu Seoul 135-120 / KR | [2007/06] | Representative(s) | von Hellfeld, Axel Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Patentanwälte PartG mbB Schweigerstrasse 2 81541 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2007/06] | von Hellfeld, Axel Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Schweigerstrasse 2 81541 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 05026867.1 | 08.12.2005 | [2007/06] | Priority number, date | KR20050071834 | 05.08.2005 Original published format: KR 2005071834 | [2007/06] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1750259 | Date: | 07.02.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/06] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1750259 | Date: | 07.11.2007 | [2007/45] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1750259 | Date: | 18.11.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/47] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.10.2007 | Classification | IPC: | G11B7/0045 | [2009/23] | CPC: |
G11B7/243 (EP,US);
G11B7/2433 (KR);
G11B7/24018 (KR);
G11B7/00455 (EP,US);
G11B7/24038 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2007/06] | G11B7/243 | Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, NL [2008/29] |
Former [2007/06] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Optisches Aufzeichnungsmedium | [2007/06] | English: | Optical recording medium | [2007/06] | French: | Support d'enregistrement optique | [2007/06] | Examination procedure | 08.12.2005 | Examination requested [2007/06] | 08.05.2008 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 16.06.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.06.2008 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, FI, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LT, LU, LV, MC, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 15.10.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.10.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 09.03.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.06.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.10.2009 | Fee for grant paid | 06.10.2009 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 19.08.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit [2010/43] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.12.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | ES | 28.02.2010 | [2010/19] | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]EP0828245 (RICOH KK [JP]) [X] 1-8 * column 5, line 6 - column 9, line 3; figure 2a * [Y] 9-16; | [Y]EP1300836 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD [JP]) [Y] 9-16* paragraphs [0002] , [0021] - [0030]; figure 2 * | by applicant | EP0828245 | EP1300836 |