EP1669256 - Attachment structure for an automotive airbag unit [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.03.2012 Database last updated on 26.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.07.2014 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): PT | published on 20.08.2014 [2014/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Autoliv Development AB Wallentinsvägen 22 447 83 Vårgårda / SE | [N/P] |
Former [2006/24] | For all designated states AUTOLIV DEVELOPMENT AB 447 83 Vargarda / SE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Sakamoto, Toshihiro c/o Autoliv Japan Ltd. Tsukuba Plant & Tech Center 1764-12 Kamiinayoshi Kasumigaura-shi Ibaraki 3158520 / JP | 02 /
Hatakeyama, Noaki c/o Autoliv Japan Ltd. Tsukuba Plant & Tech Center 1764-12 Kamiinayoshi Kasumigaura-shi Ibaraki 3158520 / JP | [2006/24] | Representative(s) | Oser, Andreas, et al Prüfer & Partner GbR Patentanwälte Sohnckestrasse 12 81479 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2006/24] | Oser, Andreas, et al Prüfer & Partner GbR Patentanwälte Harthauser Strasse 25 d 81545 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 05027024.8 | 09.12.2005 | [2006/24] | Priority number, date | JP20040358679 | 10.12.2004 Original published format: JP 2004358679 | [2006/24] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1669256 | Date: | 14.06.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/24] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1669256 | Date: | 25.05.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/21] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 31.03.2006 | Classification | IPC: | B60R21/205 | [2006/24] | CPC: |
B60R21/205 (EP);
B60R21/2171 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/24] | Title | German: | Befestigungsanordnung für einen Airbag in einem Kraftfahrzeug | [2006/24] | English: | Attachment structure for an automotive airbag unit | [2006/24] | French: | Dispositif de montage pour un sac de sécurité gonflable dans un véhicule automobile | [2006/24] | Examination procedure | 30.06.2006 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 30.06.2006 | Examination requested [2006/32] | 18.10.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.11.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.10.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.02.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.03.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.07.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.12.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.04.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 08.04.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 18.10.2006 | Opposition(s) | 28.02.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2012/18] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.10.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.10.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.10.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.10.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 25.05.2011 | BE | 25.05.2011 | CY | 25.05.2011 | CZ | 25.05.2011 | DK | 25.05.2011 | EE | 25.05.2011 | FI | 25.05.2011 | HU | 25.05.2011 | IT | 25.05.2011 | LT | 25.05.2011 | LV | 25.05.2011 | NL | 25.05.2011 | PL | 25.05.2011 | PT | 25.05.2011 | RO | 25.05.2011 | SE | 25.05.2011 | SI | 25.05.2011 | SK | 25.05.2011 | TR | 25.05.2011 | BG | 25.08.2011 | GR | 26.08.2011 | ES | 05.09.2011 | IS | 25.09.2011 | GB | 09.12.2011 | IE | 09.12.2011 | LU | 09.12.2011 | CH | 31.12.2011 | LI | 31.12.2011 | MC | 31.12.2011 | FR | 02.01.2012 | [2014/34] |
Former [2013/45] | AT | 25.05.2011 | |
BE | 25.05.2011 | ||
CY | 25.05.2011 | ||
CZ | 25.05.2011 | ||
DK | 25.05.2011 | ||
EE | 25.05.2011 | ||
FI | 25.05.2011 | ||
HU | 25.05.2011 | ||
IT | 25.05.2011 | ||
LT | 25.05.2011 | ||
LV | 25.05.2011 | ||
NL | 25.05.2011 | ||
PL | 25.05.2011 | ||
RO | 25.05.2011 | ||
SE | 25.05.2011 | ||
SI | 25.05.2011 | ||
SK | 25.05.2011 | ||
TR | 25.05.2011 | ||
BG | 25.08.2011 | ||
GR | 26.08.2011 | ||
ES | 05.09.2011 | ||
IS | 25.09.2011 | ||
GB | 09.12.2011 | ||
IE | 09.12.2011 | ||
LU | 09.12.2011 | ||
CH | 31.12.2011 | ||
LI | 31.12.2011 | ||
MC | 31.12.2011 | ||
FR | 02.01.2012 | ||
Former [2013/44] | AT | 25.05.2011 | |
BE | 25.05.2011 | ||
CY | 25.05.2011 | ||
CZ | 25.05.2011 | ||
DK | 25.05.2011 | ||
EE | 25.05.2011 | ||
FI | 25.05.2011 | ||
IT | 25.05.2011 | ||
LT | 25.05.2011 | ||
LV | 25.05.2011 | ||
NL | 25.05.2011 | ||
PL | 25.05.2011 | ||
RO | 25.05.2011 | ||
SE | 25.05.2011 | ||
SI | 25.05.2011 | ||
SK | 25.05.2011 | ||
TR | 25.05.2011 | ||
BG | 25.08.2011 | ||
GR | 26.08.2011 | ||
ES | 05.09.2011 | ||
IS | 25.09.2011 | ||
GB | 09.12.2011 | ||
IE | 09.12.2011 | ||
LU | 09.12.2011 | ||
CH | 31.12.2011 | ||
LI | 31.12.2011 | ||
MC | 31.12.2011 | ||
FR | 02.01.2012 | ||
Former [2013/29] | AT | 25.05.2011 | |
BE | 25.05.2011 | ||
CY | 25.05.2011 | ||
CZ | 25.05.2011 | ||
DK | 25.05.2011 | ||
EE | 25.05.2011 | ||
FI | 25.05.2011 | ||
IT | 25.05.2011 | ||
LT | 25.05.2011 | ||
LV | 25.05.2011 | ||
NL | 25.05.2011 | ||
PL | 25.05.2011 | ||
RO | 25.05.2011 | ||
SE | 25.05.2011 | ||
SI | 25.05.2011 | ||
SK | 25.05.2011 | ||
BG | 25.08.2011 | ||
GR | 26.08.2011 | ||
ES | 05.09.2011 | ||
IS | 25.09.2011 | ||
GB | 09.12.2011 | ||
IE | 09.12.2011 | ||
LU | 09.12.2011 | ||
CH | 31.12.2011 | ||
LI | 31.12.2011 | ||
MC | 31.12.2011 | ||
FR | 02.01.2012 | ||
Former [2013/25] | AT | 25.05.2011 | |
BE | 25.05.2011 | ||
CY | 25.05.2011 | ||
CZ | 25.05.2011 | ||
DK | 25.05.2011 | ||
EE | 25.05.2011 | ||
FI | 25.05.2011 | ||
IT | 25.05.2011 | ||
LT | 25.05.2011 | ||
LV | 25.05.2011 | ||
NL | 25.05.2011 | ||
PL | 25.05.2011 | ||
RO | 25.05.2011 | ||
SE | 25.05.2011 | ||
SI | 25.05.2011 | ||
SK | 25.05.2011 | ||
GR | 26.08.2011 | ||
ES | 05.09.2011 | ||
IS | 25.09.2011 | ||
GB | 09.12.2011 | ||
IE | 09.12.2011 | ||
LU | 09.12.2011 | ||
CH | 31.12.2011 | ||
LI | 31.12.2011 | ||
MC | 31.12.2011 | ||
FR | 02.01.2012 | ||
Former [2013/19] | AT | 25.05.2011 | |
BE | 25.05.2011 | ||
CY | 25.05.2011 | ||
CZ | 25.05.2011 | ||
DK | 25.05.2011 | ||
EE | 25.05.2011 | ||
FI | 25.05.2011 | ||
IT | 25.05.2011 | ||
LT | 25.05.2011 | ||
LV | 25.05.2011 | ||
NL | 25.05.2011 | ||
PL | 25.05.2011 | ||
RO | 25.05.2011 | ||
SE | 25.05.2011 | ||
SI | 25.05.2011 | ||
SK | 25.05.2011 | ||
GR | 26.08.2011 | ||
ES | 05.09.2011 | ||
IS | 25.09.2011 | ||
GB | 09.12.2011 | ||
IE | 09.12.2011 | ||
CH | 31.12.2011 | ||
LI | 31.12.2011 | ||
MC | 31.12.2011 | ||
FR | 02.01.2012 | ||
Former [2012/49] | AT | 25.05.2011 | |
BE | 25.05.2011 | ||
CY | 25.05.2011 | ||
CZ | 25.05.2011 | ||
DK | 25.05.2011 | ||
EE | 25.05.2011 | ||
FI | 25.05.2011 | ||
IT | 25.05.2011 | ||
LT | 25.05.2011 | ||
LV | 25.05.2011 | ||
NL | 25.05.2011 | ||
PL | 25.05.2011 | ||
RO | 25.05.2011 | ||
SE | 25.05.2011 | ||
SI | 25.05.2011 | ||
SK | 25.05.2011 | ||
GR | 26.08.2011 | ||
ES | 05.09.2011 | ||
IS | 25.09.2011 | ||
GB | 09.12.2011 | ||
IE | 09.12.2011 | ||
CH | 31.12.2011 | ||
LI | 31.12.2011 | ||
MC | 31.12.2011 | ||
Former [2012/47] | AT | 25.05.2011 | |
BE | 25.05.2011 | ||
CY | 25.05.2011 | ||
CZ | 25.05.2011 | ||
DK | 25.05.2011 | ||
EE | 25.05.2011 | ||
FI | 25.05.2011 | ||
IT | 25.05.2011 | ||
LT | 25.05.2011 | ||
LV | 25.05.2011 | ||
NL | 25.05.2011 | ||
PL | 25.05.2011 | ||
RO | 25.05.2011 | ||
SE | 25.05.2011 | ||
SI | 25.05.2011 | ||
SK | 25.05.2011 | ||
GR | 26.08.2011 | ||
ES | 05.09.2011 | ||
IS | 25.09.2011 | ||
GB | 09.12.2011 | ||
IE | 09.12.2011 | ||
MC | 31.12.2011 | ||
Former [2012/46] | AT | 25.05.2011 | |
BE | 25.05.2011 | ||
CY | 25.05.2011 | ||
CZ | 25.05.2011 | ||
DK | 25.05.2011 | ||
EE | 25.05.2011 | ||
FI | 25.05.2011 | ||
IT | 25.05.2011 | ||
LT | 25.05.2011 | ||
LV | 25.05.2011 | ||
NL | 25.05.2011 | ||
PL | 25.05.2011 | ||
RO | 25.05.2011 | ||
SE | 25.05.2011 | ||
SI | 25.05.2011 | ||
SK | 25.05.2011 | ||
GR | 26.08.2011 | ||
ES | 05.09.2011 | ||
IS | 25.09.2011 | ||
GB | 09.12.2011 | ||
MC | 31.12.2011 | ||
Former [2012/33] | AT | 25.05.2011 | |
BE | 25.05.2011 | ||
CY | 25.05.2011 | ||
CZ | 25.05.2011 | ||
DK | 25.05.2011 | ||
EE | 25.05.2011 | ||
FI | 25.05.2011 | ||
IT | 25.05.2011 | ||
LT | 25.05.2011 | ||
LV | 25.05.2011 | ||
NL | 25.05.2011 | ||
PL | 25.05.2011 | ||
RO | 25.05.2011 | ||
SE | 25.05.2011 | ||
SI | 25.05.2011 | ||
SK | 25.05.2011 | ||
GR | 26.08.2011 | ||
ES | 05.09.2011 | ||
IS | 25.09.2011 | ||
MC | 31.12.2011 | ||
Former [2012/23] | AT | 25.05.2011 | |
BE | 25.05.2011 | ||
CY | 25.05.2011 | ||
CZ | 25.05.2011 | ||
DK | 25.05.2011 | ||
EE | 25.05.2011 | ||
FI | 25.05.2011 | ||
IT | 25.05.2011 | ||
LT | 25.05.2011 | ||
LV | 25.05.2011 | ||
NL | 25.05.2011 | ||
PL | 25.05.2011 | ||
RO | 25.05.2011 | ||
SE | 25.05.2011 | ||
SI | 25.05.2011 | ||
SK | 25.05.2011 | ||
GR | 26.08.2011 | ||
ES | 05.09.2011 | ||
IS | 25.09.2011 | ||
Former [2012/11] | AT | 25.05.2011 | |
BE | 25.05.2011 | ||
CY | 25.05.2011 | ||
CZ | 25.05.2011 | ||
DK | 25.05.2011 | ||
EE | 25.05.2011 | ||
FI | 25.05.2011 | ||
LT | 25.05.2011 | ||
LV | 25.05.2011 | ||
NL | 25.05.2011 | ||
PL | 25.05.2011 | ||
RO | 25.05.2011 | ||
SE | 25.05.2011 | ||
SI | 25.05.2011 | ||
SK | 25.05.2011 | ||
GR | 26.08.2011 | ||
ES | 05.09.2011 | ||
IS | 25.09.2011 | ||
Former [2012/10] | AT | 25.05.2011 | |
BE | 25.05.2011 | ||
CY | 25.05.2011 | ||
CZ | 25.05.2011 | ||
DK | 25.05.2011 | ||
EE | 25.05.2011 | ||
FI | 25.05.2011 | ||
LT | 25.05.2011 | ||
LV | 25.05.2011 | ||
NL | 25.05.2011 | ||
RO | 25.05.2011 | ||
SE | 25.05.2011 | ||
SI | 25.05.2011 | ||
SK | 25.05.2011 | ||
GR | 26.08.2011 | ||
ES | 05.09.2011 | ||
IS | 25.09.2011 | ||
Former [2012/09] | AT | 25.05.2011 | |
BE | 25.05.2011 | ||
CY | 25.05.2011 | ||
CZ | 25.05.2011 | ||
EE | 25.05.2011 | ||
FI | 25.05.2011 | ||
LT | 25.05.2011 | ||
LV | 25.05.2011 | ||
NL | 25.05.2011 | ||
SE | 25.05.2011 | ||
SI | 25.05.2011 | ||
GR | 26.08.2011 | ||
ES | 05.09.2011 | ||
IS | 25.09.2011 | ||
Former [2012/01] | AT | 25.05.2011 | |
BE | 25.05.2011 | ||
CY | 25.05.2011 | ||
FI | 25.05.2011 | ||
LT | 25.05.2011 | ||
LV | 25.05.2011 | ||
NL | 25.05.2011 | ||
SE | 25.05.2011 | ||
SI | 25.05.2011 | ||
GR | 26.08.2011 | ||
ES | 05.09.2011 | ||
IS | 25.09.2011 | ||
Former [2011/52] | AT | 25.05.2011 | |
CY | 25.05.2011 | ||
FI | 25.05.2011 | ||
LT | 25.05.2011 | ||
LV | 25.05.2011 | ||
SE | 25.05.2011 | ||
SI | 25.05.2011 | ||
GR | 26.08.2011 | ||
ES | 05.09.2011 | ||
IS | 25.09.2011 | ||
Former [2011/50] | CY | 25.05.2011 | |
FI | 25.05.2011 | ||
LT | 25.05.2011 | ||
LV | 25.05.2011 | ||
SE | 25.05.2011 | ||
SI | 25.05.2011 | ||
GR | 26.08.2011 | ||
ES | 05.09.2011 | ||
IS | 25.09.2011 | ||
Former [2011/49] | CY | 25.05.2011 | |
FI | 25.05.2011 | ||
LT | 25.05.2011 | ||
SE | 25.05.2011 | ||
GR | 26.08.2011 | ||
ES | 05.09.2011 | ||
Former [2011/48] | LT | 25.05.2011 | |
SE | 25.05.2011 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US5425549 (ODA YOSHIO [JP]) [X] 1-5 * column 4, line 5 - line 44 * * figures 2,3 *; | [A]EP0671297 (PORSCHE AG [DE]) [A] 1* column 3, line 22 - line 54 *; | [X]US5489116 (BOAG JOHN [US]) [X] 1 * column 3, line 3 - line 49 *; | [A]US5803487 (KIKUCHI RYO [JP], et al) [A] 1 * column 3, line 26 - column 4, line 14 *; | [X]US2002038946 (KOBAYASHI TORU [JP], et al) [X] 1 * paragraph [0023] * * paragraph [0026] * * figure 3 * | by applicant | JPH1076900 | JPH1191479 |