EP1681708 - Arc discharge lamp with a strengthening member for the arc tube assembly [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 26.10.2007 Database last updated on 21.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.10.2007 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 28.11.2007 [2007/48] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states OSRAM SYLVANIA INC. 100 Endicott Street Danvers, MA 01923 / US | [2006/29] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Collins, Steven 88 Eleventh Street Lowell, MA 01850 / US | 02 /
Hrubowchak, David 9 Simeon Land Litchfield, NH 03052 / US | 03 /
Oberlies, Paul 430 Brent Street Manchester, NH 03103 / US | 04 /
Wark, Graham 13 Trisha's Way Stratham, NH 03885 / US | [2006/29] | Representative(s) | Pokorny, Gerd, et al OSRAM GmbH Intellectual Property IP Postfach 22 13 17 80503 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2006/29] | Pokorny, Gerd, et al OSRAM GmbH, Postfach 22 16 34 80506 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 05027683.1 | 16.12.2005 | [2006/29] | Priority number, date | US20050036656 | 14.01.2005 Original published format: US 36656 | [2006/29] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1681708 | Date: | 19.07.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/29] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.05.2006 | Classification | IPC: | H01J61/34, H01J5/48 | [2006/29] | CPC: |
H01J5/48 (EP,US);
H01J61/34 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | (deleted) [2007/13] |
Former [2006/29] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Bogenentladungslampe mit einem versteifenden Element für die Bogenröhren-Anordnung | [2006/29] | English: | Arc discharge lamp with a strengthening member for the arc tube assembly | [2006/29] | French: | Lampe à décharge à arc pourvue d'un élément de renfort pour l'ensemble de tube à arc | [2006/29] | Examination procedure | 20.01.2007 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2007/48] | 19.06.2007 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2007/48] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 08.03.2007 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 08.03.2007 | CZ   M01   Not yet paid | 08.03.2007 | DE   M01   Not yet paid | 08.03.2007 | FR   M01   Not yet paid | 08.03.2007 | GB   M01   Not yet paid | 08.03.2007 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 08.03.2007 | M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JP2004193061 ; | [X]US2768624 (LAMB J C) [X] 1-4 * column 2, lines 1-7,41,42; figures 4,5 *; | [A]US4499396 (FOHL TIMOTHY [US], et al) [A] 4-7* figures 1,2 *; | [X]US4791334 (KEEFFE WILLIAM M [US], et al) [X] 1-3,5-7 * column 3, lines 16-68; figure 1 *; | [X]US6153968 (DOMBROWSKI KEVIN S [US], et al) [X] 1-4 * column 2, lines 18-65; figures 1-4 * | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (20031205), vol. 2003, no. 12, & JP2004193061 A 20040708 (JAPAN STORAGE BATTERY CO LTD) [X] 1-3 * abstract * |