EP1801322 - Element for the reduction of the seismic stress of buildings [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.04.2010 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.10.2011 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY, TR | published on 09.11.2011 [2011/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Stahlton Bauteile AG Riesbachstrasse 57 8008 Zürich / CH | [2007/26] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Endrizzi, Walter Langgasse 67 8400 Winterthur / CH | 02 /
Curiger, Peter Hofstrasse 8 8707 Uetikon am See / CH | 03 /
Gisin, Ernst Spitzlerweg 4 4466 Ormalingen / CH | [2007/26] | Representative(s) | Sutter, Kurt, et al E. Blum & Co. AG Vorderberg 11 8044 Zürich / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2010/10] | Sutter, Kurt, et al E. Blum & Co. AG Vorderberg 11 8044 Zürich / CH | ||
Former [2007/26] | Blum, Rudolf Emil E. BLUM & CO. AG Patent- und Markenanwälte VSP Vorderberg 11 8044 Zürich / CH | Application number, filing date | 05027833.2 | 20.12.2005 | [2007/26] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1801322 | Date: | 27.06.2007 | Language: | DE | [2007/26] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1801322 | Date: | 24.06.2009 | Language: | DE | [2009/26] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.06.2006 | Classification | IPC: | E04H9/02 | [2007/26] | CPC: |
E04H9/022 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/26] | Title | German: | Bauelement zur Reduktion der Erdbebenbeanspruchung von Gebäuden | [2007/26] | English: | Element for the reduction of the seismic stress of buildings | [2007/26] | French: | Élément pour la réduction de l'effort séismique des bâtiments | [2007/26] | Examination procedure | 24.12.2007 | Examination requested [2008/07] | 31.01.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.05.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.02.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.05.2009 | Fee for grant paid | 06.05.2009 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 25.03.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit [2010/22] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.11.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 07.11.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 24.06.2009 | CZ | 24.06.2009 | DK | 24.06.2009 | EE | 24.06.2009 | FI | 24.06.2009 | IE | 24.06.2009 | LT | 24.06.2009 | LV | 24.06.2009 | NL | 24.06.2009 | PL | 24.06.2009 | RO | 24.06.2009 | SI | 24.06.2009 | SK | 24.06.2009 | TR | 24.06.2009 | BG | 24.09.2009 | SE | 24.09.2009 | GR | 25.09.2009 | ES | 05.10.2009 | IS | 24.10.2009 | PT | 24.10.2009 | AT | 20.12.2009 | GB | 20.12.2009 | IT | 20.12.2009 | LU | 20.12.2009 | HU | 25.12.2009 | BE | 31.12.2009 | CH | 31.12.2009 | FR | 31.12.2009 | LI | 31.12.2009 | [2011/44] |
Former [2011/32] | CZ | 24.06.2009 | |
DK | 24.06.2009 | ||
EE | 24.06.2009 | ||
FI | 24.06.2009 | ||
IE | 24.06.2009 | ||
LT | 24.06.2009 | ||
LV | 24.06.2009 | ||
NL | 24.06.2009 | ||
PL | 24.06.2009 | ||
RO | 24.06.2009 | ||
SI | 24.06.2009 | ||
SK | 24.06.2009 | ||
BG | 24.09.2009 | ||
SE | 24.09.2009 | ||
GR | 25.09.2009 | ||
ES | 05.10.2009 | ||
IS | 24.10.2009 | ||
PT | 24.10.2009 | ||
AT | 20.12.2009 | ||
GB | 20.12.2009 | ||
IT | 20.12.2009 | ||
LU | 20.12.2009 | ||
HU | 25.12.2009 | ||
BE | 31.12.2009 | ||
CH | 31.12.2009 | ||
FR | 31.12.2009 | ||
LI | 31.12.2009 | ||
Former [2011/21] | CZ | 24.06.2009 | |
DK | 24.06.2009 | ||
EE | 24.06.2009 | ||
FI | 24.06.2009 | ||
IE | 24.06.2009 | ||
LT | 24.06.2009 | ||
LV | 24.06.2009 | ||
NL | 24.06.2009 | ||
PL | 24.06.2009 | ||
RO | 24.06.2009 | ||
SI | 24.06.2009 | ||
SK | 24.06.2009 | ||
BG | 24.09.2009 | ||
SE | 24.09.2009 | ||
GR | 25.09.2009 | ||
ES | 05.10.2009 | ||
IS | 24.10.2009 | ||
PT | 24.10.2009 | ||
GB | 20.12.2009 | ||
IT | 20.12.2009 | ||
LU | 20.12.2009 | ||
BE | 31.12.2009 | ||
CH | 31.12.2009 | ||
FR | 31.12.2009 | ||
LI | 31.12.2009 | ||
Former [2011/15] | CZ | 24.06.2009 | |
DK | 24.06.2009 | ||
EE | 24.06.2009 | ||
FI | 24.06.2009 | ||
IE | 24.06.2009 | ||
LT | 24.06.2009 | ||
LV | 24.06.2009 | ||
NL | 24.06.2009 | ||
PL | 24.06.2009 | ||
RO | 24.06.2009 | ||
SI | 24.06.2009 | ||
SK | 24.06.2009 | ||
BG | 24.09.2009 | ||
SE | 24.09.2009 | ||
GR | 25.09.2009 | ||
ES | 05.10.2009 | ||
IS | 24.10.2009 | ||
PT | 24.10.2009 | ||
GB | 20.12.2009 | ||
IT | 20.12.2009 | ||
BE | 31.12.2009 | ||
CH | 31.12.2009 | ||
FR | 31.12.2009 | ||
LI | 31.12.2009 | ||
Former [2011/13] | CZ | 24.06.2009 | |
DK | 24.06.2009 | ||
EE | 24.06.2009 | ||
FI | 24.06.2009 | ||
IE | 24.06.2009 | ||
LT | 24.06.2009 | ||
LV | 24.06.2009 | ||
NL | 24.06.2009 | ||
PL | 24.06.2009 | ||
RO | 24.06.2009 | ||
SI | 24.06.2009 | ||
SK | 24.06.2009 | ||
BG | 24.09.2009 | ||
SE | 24.09.2009 | ||
GR | 25.09.2009 | ||
ES | 05.10.2009 | ||
IS | 24.10.2009 | ||
PT | 24.10.2009 | ||
GB | 20.12.2009 | ||
BE | 31.12.2009 | ||
CH | 31.12.2009 | ||
FR | 31.12.2009 | ||
LI | 31.12.2009 | ||
Former [2011/05] | CZ | 24.06.2009 | |
DK | 24.06.2009 | ||
EE | 24.06.2009 | ||
FI | 24.06.2009 | ||
IE | 24.06.2009 | ||
LT | 24.06.2009 | ||
LV | 24.06.2009 | ||
NL | 24.06.2009 | ||
PL | 24.06.2009 | ||
SI | 24.06.2009 | ||
SK | 24.06.2009 | ||
BG | 24.09.2009 | ||
SE | 24.09.2009 | ||
GR | 25.09.2009 | ||
ES | 05.10.2009 | ||
IS | 24.10.2009 | ||
PT | 24.10.2009 | ||
GB | 20.12.2009 | ||
BE | 31.12.2009 | ||
CH | 31.12.2009 | ||
FR | 31.12.2009 | ||
LI | 31.12.2009 | ||
Former [2010/52] | CZ | 24.06.2009 | |
DK | 24.06.2009 | ||
EE | 24.06.2009 | ||
FI | 24.06.2009 | ||
IE | 24.06.2009 | ||
LT | 24.06.2009 | ||
LV | 24.06.2009 | ||
NL | 24.06.2009 | ||
PL | 24.06.2009 | ||
SI | 24.06.2009 | ||
SK | 24.06.2009 | ||
BG | 24.09.2009 | ||
SE | 24.09.2009 | ||
GR | 25.09.2009 | ||
ES | 05.10.2009 | ||
IS | 24.10.2009 | ||
PT | 24.10.2009 | ||
BE | 31.12.2009 | ||
CH | 31.12.2009 | ||
FR | 31.12.2009 | ||
LI | 31.12.2009 | ||
Former [2010/20] | CZ | 24.06.2009 | |
DK | 24.06.2009 | ||
EE | 24.06.2009 | ||
FI | 24.06.2009 | ||
IE | 24.06.2009 | ||
LT | 24.06.2009 | ||
LV | 24.06.2009 | ||
NL | 24.06.2009 | ||
PL | 24.06.2009 | ||
SI | 24.06.2009 | ||
SK | 24.06.2009 | ||
BG | 24.09.2009 | ||
SE | 24.09.2009 | ||
ES | 05.10.2009 | ||
IS | 24.10.2009 | ||
PT | 24.10.2009 | ||
Former [2010/17] | CZ | 24.06.2009 | |
EE | 24.06.2009 | ||
FI | 24.06.2009 | ||
LT | 24.06.2009 | ||
LV | 24.06.2009 | ||
NL | 24.06.2009 | ||
PL | 24.06.2009 | ||
SI | 24.06.2009 | ||
SK | 24.06.2009 | ||
BG | 24.09.2009 | ||
SE | 24.09.2009 | ||
ES | 05.10.2009 | ||
IS | 24.10.2009 | ||
PT | 24.10.2009 | ||
Former [2010/11] | CZ | 24.06.2009 | |
EE | 24.06.2009 | ||
FI | 24.06.2009 | ||
LT | 24.06.2009 | ||
LV | 24.06.2009 | ||
NL | 24.06.2009 | ||
PL | 24.06.2009 | ||
SI | 24.06.2009 | ||
SK | 24.06.2009 | ||
SE | 24.09.2009 | ||
ES | 05.10.2009 | ||
IS | 24.10.2009 | ||
Former [2010/01] | FI | 24.06.2009 | |
LT | 24.06.2009 | ||
LV | 24.06.2009 | ||
PL | 24.06.2009 | ||
SI | 24.06.2009 | ||
SE | 24.09.2009 | ||
Former [2009/51] | FI | 24.06.2009 | |
LT | 24.06.2009 | ||
SI | 24.06.2009 | ||
SE | 24.09.2009 | ||
Former [2009/48] | LT | 24.06.2009 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2713485 (TILLOU RICHARD G) [X] 3-5,9 * column 1, line 41 - line 48 ** column 2, line 15 - line 39; figures 1-5 *; | [XA]GB891238 (GOMMA ANTIVIBRANTI APPLIC) [X] 3-6,9,15,16 * the whole document * [A] 12,13; | [XA]US5054251 (KEMENY ZOLTAN A [US]) [X] 1,3-6,9,18,19 * column 3, line 36 - column 7, line 9; figures 1-11 * [A] 2,7,10,11,14,15; | [XA]US5330165 (VAN GOUBERGEN WILLY [BE]) [X] 3,5,6,9,15,16 * column 5, line 3 - column 6, line 25; figures 1-8 * [A] 12,13; | [XA]DE10301122 (CALENBERG INGENIEURE PLANMAESI [DE]) [X] 1,3,6,9,15,16,18 * page 3, paragraph 17 - paragraph 20; figures 1,2; claims 11-16 * [A] 2,7,14,19 |