EP1801684 - Procedure for heating and controlling the heating power and heating device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.12.2008 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.11.2010 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): GR | published on 29.12.2010 [2010/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Strickchic GmbH Herderstrasse 2 99510 Apolda/Thueringen / DE | [2007/26] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Rosner, Gerald Am Sperlingsberg 12 99510 Kapellendorf / DE | [2007/26] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2007/26] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Maximilianstrasse 58 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 05028110.4 | 21.12.2005 | [2007/26] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1801684 | Date: | 27.06.2007 | Language: | DE | [2007/26] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1801684 | Date: | 13.02.2008 | Language: | DE | [2008/07] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.07.2006 | Classification | IPC: | G05F3/02, H05B3/34, G01K7/00 | [2007/26] | CPC: |
H05B3/342 (EP);
H05B1/0272 (EP);
H05B2203/003 (EP);
H05B2203/013 (EP);
H05B2203/017 (EP);
H05B2203/036 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/26] | Extension states | AL | 01.03.2007 | BA | 01.03.2007 | HR | 01.03.2007 | MK | 01.03.2007 | YU | 01.03.2007 | Title | German: | Verfahren zum Beheizen und Regeln der Heizleistung und Heizvorrichtung | [2007/26] | English: | Procedure for heating and controlling the heating power and heating device | [2007/26] | French: | Procédure pour chauffer et régler la puissance de chauffage et dispositif de chauffage | [2007/26] | Examination procedure | 01.03.2007 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 01.03.2007 | Examination requested [2007/26] | 18.06.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.10.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 25.10.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 14.11.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/04] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.12.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 13.02.2008 | CZ | 13.02.2008 | EE | 13.02.2008 | IE | 13.02.2008 | IT | 13.02.2008 | LT | 13.02.2008 | LV | 13.02.2008 | NL | 13.02.2008 | PL | 13.02.2008 | RO | 13.02.2008 | SI | 13.02.2008 | SK | 13.02.2008 | TR | 13.02.2008 | BG | 13.05.2008 | GR | 14.05.2008 | ES | 24.05.2008 | IS | 13.06.2008 | PT | 14.07.2008 | HU | 14.08.2008 | [2010/52] |
Former [2010/38] | CY | 13.02.2008 | |
CZ | 13.02.2008 | ||
EE | 13.02.2008 | ||
IE | 13.02.2008 | ||
IT | 13.02.2008 | ||
LT | 13.02.2008 | ||
LV | 13.02.2008 | ||
NL | 13.02.2008 | ||
PL | 13.02.2008 | ||
RO | 13.02.2008 | ||
SI | 13.02.2008 | ||
SK | 13.02.2008 | ||
TR | 13.02.2008 | ||
BG | 13.05.2008 | ||
ES | 24.05.2008 | ||
IS | 13.06.2008 | ||
PT | 14.07.2008 | ||
HU | 14.08.2008 | ||
Former [2010/36] | CY | 13.02.2008 | |
CZ | 13.02.2008 | ||
EE | 13.02.2008 | ||
IE | 13.02.2008 | ||
IT | 13.02.2008 | ||
LT | 13.02.2008 | ||
LV | 13.02.2008 | ||
NL | 13.02.2008 | ||
PL | 13.02.2008 | ||
RO | 13.02.2008 | ||
SI | 13.02.2008 | ||
SK | 13.02.2008 | ||
BG | 13.05.2008 | ||
ES | 24.05.2008 | ||
IS | 13.06.2008 | ||
PT | 14.07.2008 | ||
HU | 14.08.2008 | ||
Former [2009/45] | CY | 13.02.2008 | |
CZ | 13.02.2008 | ||
EE | 13.02.2008 | ||
IE | 13.02.2008 | ||
IT | 13.02.2008 | ||
LT | 13.02.2008 | ||
LV | 13.02.2008 | ||
NL | 13.02.2008 | ||
PL | 13.02.2008 | ||
RO | 13.02.2008 | ||
SI | 13.02.2008 | ||
SK | 13.02.2008 | ||
BG | 13.05.2008 | ||
ES | 24.05.2008 | ||
IS | 13.06.2008 | ||
PT | 14.07.2008 | ||
Former [2009/24] | CZ | 13.02.2008 | |
EE | 13.02.2008 | ||
IE | 13.02.2008 | ||
LT | 13.02.2008 | ||
LV | 13.02.2008 | ||
NL | 13.02.2008 | ||
PL | 13.02.2008 | ||
RO | 13.02.2008 | ||
SI | 13.02.2008 | ||
SK | 13.02.2008 | ||
BG | 13.05.2008 | ||
ES | 24.05.2008 | ||
IS | 13.06.2008 | ||
PT | 14.07.2008 | ||
Former [2009/22] | CZ | 13.02.2008 | |
EE | 13.02.2008 | ||
IE | 13.02.2008 | ||
LT | 13.02.2008 | ||
LV | 13.02.2008 | ||
NL | 13.02.2008 | ||
PL | 13.02.2008 | ||
RO | 13.02.2008 | ||
SI | 13.02.2008 | ||
SK | 13.02.2008 | ||
ES | 24.05.2008 | ||
IS | 13.06.2008 | ||
PT | 14.07.2008 | ||
Former [2009/13] | CZ | 13.02.2008 | |
IE | 13.02.2008 | ||
LT | 13.02.2008 | ||
LV | 13.02.2008 | ||
NL | 13.02.2008 | ||
PL | 13.02.2008 | ||
RO | 13.02.2008 | ||
SI | 13.02.2008 | ||
SK | 13.02.2008 | ||
ES | 24.05.2008 | ||
IS | 13.06.2008 | ||
PT | 14.07.2008 | ||
Former [2008/49] | CZ | 13.02.2008 | |
IE | 13.02.2008 | ||
LV | 13.02.2008 | ||
NL | 13.02.2008 | ||
PL | 13.02.2008 | ||
RO | 13.02.2008 | ||
SI | 13.02.2008 | ||
SK | 13.02.2008 | ||
ES | 24.05.2008 | ||
IS | 13.06.2008 | ||
PT | 14.07.2008 | ||
Former [2008/48] | IE | 13.02.2008 | |
LV | 13.02.2008 | ||
NL | 13.02.2008 | ||
PL | 13.02.2008 | ||
SI | 13.02.2008 | ||
ES | 24.05.2008 | ||
IS | 13.06.2008 | ||
Former [2008/44] | LV | 13.02.2008 | |
PL | 13.02.2008 | ||
SI | 13.02.2008 | ||
ES | 24.05.2008 | ||
IS | 13.06.2008 | ||
Former [2008/43] | PL | 13.02.2008 | |
ES | 24.05.2008 | ||
IS | 13.06.2008 | ||
Former [2008/36] | ES | 24.05.2008 | |
IS | 13.06.2008 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE1295111 (BAYER AG) [A] 1 * the whole document *; | [A]DE2757334 (BEURER GMBH & CO) [A] 1* the whole document *; | [X]US6172344 (GORDON JOHN YEATS [GB], et al) [X] 1-20 * the whole document *; | [X]US6222162 (KEANE BARRY P [US]) [X] 1-20 * the whole document * |