EP1801602 - Device and process for positionning electronic microchips to be electrically tested [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.02.2012 Database last updated on 30.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.10.2013 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 06.11.2013 [2013/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Rasco GmbH Geigelsteinstrasse 6 83059 Kolbermoor / DE | [2007/26] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Arnold, Johann Asternweg 14 83109 Grosskarolinenfeld / DE | [2007/26] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2007/26] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Maximilianstrasse 58 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 05028111.2 | 21.12.2005 | [2007/26] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1801602 | Date: | 27.06.2007 | Language: | DE | [2007/26] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1801602 | Date: | 06.04.2011 | Language: | DE | [2011/14] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 31.10.2006 | Classification | IPC: | G01R31/28, B07C5/344, H05K13/02 | [2007/26] | CPC: |
B07C5/344 (EP);
G01R31/2893 (EP);
G01R1/04 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/26] | Title | German: | Vorrichtung und Verfahren zum Positionieren von elektronischen Mikrochips zum elektrischen Testen | [2007/26] | English: | Device and process for positionning electronic microchips to be electrically tested | [2007/26] | French: | Dispositif et procédé de positionnement de micropuces électroniques à tester électriquement | [2007/26] | Examination procedure | 18.12.2007 | Examination requested [2008/05] | 17.01.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.05.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.07.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.08.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.10.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.02.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 17.02.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 10.01.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2012/11] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.12.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.12.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.12.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.12.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 06.04.2011 | CZ | 06.04.2011 | DK | 06.04.2011 | EE | 06.04.2011 | FI | 06.04.2011 | HU | 06.04.2011 | IE | 06.04.2011 | LT | 06.04.2011 | LV | 06.04.2011 | NL | 06.04.2011 | PL | 06.04.2011 | RO | 06.04.2011 | SE | 06.04.2011 | SI | 06.04.2011 | SK | 06.04.2011 | TR | 06.04.2011 | BG | 06.07.2011 | GR | 07.07.2011 | IS | 06.08.2011 | PT | 08.08.2011 | AT | 21.12.2011 | LU | 21.12.2011 | BE | 31.12.2011 | CH | 31.12.2011 | LI | 31.12.2011 | MC | 31.12.2011 | [2013/45] |
Former [2013/44] | CY | 06.04.2011 | |
CZ | 06.04.2011 | ||
DK | 06.04.2011 | ||
EE | 06.04.2011 | ||
FI | 06.04.2011 | ||
IE | 06.04.2011 | ||
LT | 06.04.2011 | ||
LV | 06.04.2011 | ||
NL | 06.04.2011 | ||
PL | 06.04.2011 | ||
RO | 06.04.2011 | ||
SE | 06.04.2011 | ||
SI | 06.04.2011 | ||
SK | 06.04.2011 | ||
TR | 06.04.2011 | ||
BG | 06.07.2011 | ||
GR | 07.07.2011 | ||
IS | 06.08.2011 | ||
PT | 08.08.2011 | ||
AT | 21.12.2011 | ||
LU | 21.12.2011 | ||
BE | 31.12.2011 | ||
CH | 31.12.2011 | ||
LI | 31.12.2011 | ||
MC | 31.12.2011 | ||
Former [2013/31] | CY | 06.04.2011 | |
CZ | 06.04.2011 | ||
DK | 06.04.2011 | ||
EE | 06.04.2011 | ||
FI | 06.04.2011 | ||
IE | 06.04.2011 | ||
LT | 06.04.2011 | ||
LV | 06.04.2011 | ||
NL | 06.04.2011 | ||
PL | 06.04.2011 | ||
RO | 06.04.2011 | ||
SE | 06.04.2011 | ||
SI | 06.04.2011 | ||
SK | 06.04.2011 | ||
BG | 06.07.2011 | ||
GR | 07.07.2011 | ||
IS | 06.08.2011 | ||
PT | 08.08.2011 | ||
AT | 21.12.2011 | ||
LU | 21.12.2011 | ||
BE | 31.12.2011 | ||
CH | 31.12.2011 | ||
LI | 31.12.2011 | ||
MC | 31.12.2011 | ||
Former [2013/29] | CY | 06.04.2011 | |
CZ | 06.04.2011 | ||
DK | 06.04.2011 | ||
EE | 06.04.2011 | ||
FI | 06.04.2011 | ||
IE | 06.04.2011 | ||
LT | 06.04.2011 | ||
LV | 06.04.2011 | ||
NL | 06.04.2011 | ||
PL | 06.04.2011 | ||
RO | 06.04.2011 | ||
SE | 06.04.2011 | ||
SI | 06.04.2011 | ||
SK | 06.04.2011 | ||
BG | 06.07.2011 | ||
GR | 07.07.2011 | ||
IS | 06.08.2011 | ||
PT | 08.08.2011 | ||
LU | 21.12.2011 | ||
BE | 31.12.2011 | ||
CH | 31.12.2011 | ||
LI | 31.12.2011 | ||
MC | 31.12.2011 | ||
Former [2013/25] | CY | 06.04.2011 | |
CZ | 06.04.2011 | ||
DK | 06.04.2011 | ||
EE | 06.04.2011 | ||
FI | 06.04.2011 | ||
IE | 06.04.2011 | ||
LT | 06.04.2011 | ||
LV | 06.04.2011 | ||
NL | 06.04.2011 | ||
PL | 06.04.2011 | ||
RO | 06.04.2011 | ||
SE | 06.04.2011 | ||
SI | 06.04.2011 | ||
SK | 06.04.2011 | ||
GR | 07.07.2011 | ||
IS | 06.08.2011 | ||
PT | 08.08.2011 | ||
LU | 21.12.2011 | ||
BE | 31.12.2011 | ||
CH | 31.12.2011 | ||
LI | 31.12.2011 | ||
MC | 31.12.2011 | ||
Former [2012/49] | CY | 06.04.2011 | |
CZ | 06.04.2011 | ||
DK | 06.04.2011 | ||
EE | 06.04.2011 | ||
FI | 06.04.2011 | ||
IE | 06.04.2011 | ||
LT | 06.04.2011 | ||
LV | 06.04.2011 | ||
NL | 06.04.2011 | ||
PL | 06.04.2011 | ||
RO | 06.04.2011 | ||
SE | 06.04.2011 | ||
SI | 06.04.2011 | ||
SK | 06.04.2011 | ||
GR | 07.07.2011 | ||
IS | 06.08.2011 | ||
PT | 08.08.2011 | ||
BE | 31.12.2011 | ||
CH | 31.12.2011 | ||
LI | 31.12.2011 | ||
MC | 31.12.2011 | ||
Former [2012/46] | CY | 06.04.2011 | |
CZ | 06.04.2011 | ||
DK | 06.04.2011 | ||
EE | 06.04.2011 | ||
FI | 06.04.2011 | ||
IE | 06.04.2011 | ||
LT | 06.04.2011 | ||
LV | 06.04.2011 | ||
NL | 06.04.2011 | ||
PL | 06.04.2011 | ||
RO | 06.04.2011 | ||
SE | 06.04.2011 | ||
SI | 06.04.2011 | ||
SK | 06.04.2011 | ||
GR | 07.07.2011 | ||
IS | 06.08.2011 | ||
PT | 08.08.2011 | ||
BE | 31.12.2011 | ||
MC | 31.12.2011 | ||
Former [2012/33] | CY | 06.04.2011 | |
CZ | 06.04.2011 | ||
DK | 06.04.2011 | ||
EE | 06.04.2011 | ||
FI | 06.04.2011 | ||
IE | 06.04.2011 | ||
LT | 06.04.2011 | ||
LV | 06.04.2011 | ||
NL | 06.04.2011 | ||
PL | 06.04.2011 | ||
RO | 06.04.2011 | ||
SE | 06.04.2011 | ||
SI | 06.04.2011 | ||
SK | 06.04.2011 | ||
GR | 07.07.2011 | ||
IS | 06.08.2011 | ||
PT | 08.08.2011 | ||
MC | 31.12.2011 | ||
Former [2012/11] | CY | 06.04.2011 | |
CZ | 06.04.2011 | ||
DK | 06.04.2011 | ||
EE | 06.04.2011 | ||
FI | 06.04.2011 | ||
IE | 06.04.2011 | ||
LT | 06.04.2011 | ||
LV | 06.04.2011 | ||
NL | 06.04.2011 | ||
PL | 06.04.2011 | ||
RO | 06.04.2011 | ||
SE | 06.04.2011 | ||
SI | 06.04.2011 | ||
SK | 06.04.2011 | ||
GR | 07.07.2011 | ||
IS | 06.08.2011 | ||
PT | 08.08.2011 | ||
Former [2012/10] | CY | 06.04.2011 | |
CZ | 06.04.2011 | ||
DK | 06.04.2011 | ||
EE | 06.04.2011 | ||
FI | 06.04.2011 | ||
IE | 06.04.2011 | ||
LT | 06.04.2011 | ||
LV | 06.04.2011 | ||
NL | 06.04.2011 | ||
RO | 06.04.2011 | ||
SE | 06.04.2011 | ||
SI | 06.04.2011 | ||
SK | 06.04.2011 | ||
GR | 07.07.2011 | ||
IS | 06.08.2011 | ||
PT | 08.08.2011 | ||
Former [2012/09] | CY | 06.04.2011 | |
CZ | 06.04.2011 | ||
EE | 06.04.2011 | ||
FI | 06.04.2011 | ||
IE | 06.04.2011 | ||
LT | 06.04.2011 | ||
LV | 06.04.2011 | ||
NL | 06.04.2011 | ||
SE | 06.04.2011 | ||
SI | 06.04.2011 | ||
GR | 07.07.2011 | ||
IS | 06.08.2011 | ||
PT | 08.08.2011 | ||
PL | 22.08.2011 | ||
Former [2012/08] | CY | 06.04.2011 | |
EE | 06.04.2011 | ||
FI | 06.04.2011 | ||
IE | 06.04.2011 | ||
LT | 06.04.2011 | ||
LV | 06.04.2011 | ||
NL | 06.04.2011 | ||
SE | 06.04.2011 | ||
SI | 06.04.2011 | ||
GR | 07.07.2011 | ||
IS | 06.08.2011 | ||
PT | 08.08.2011 | ||
PL | 22.08.2011 | ||
Former [2012/02] | CY | 06.04.2011 | |
FI | 06.04.2011 | ||
LT | 06.04.2011 | ||
LV | 06.04.2011 | ||
NL | 06.04.2011 | ||
SE | 06.04.2011 | ||
SI | 06.04.2011 | ||
GR | 07.07.2011 | ||
IS | 06.08.2011 | ||
PT | 08.08.2011 | ||
PL | 22.08.2011 | ||
Former [2011/50] | CY | 06.04.2011 | |
FI | 06.04.2011 | ||
LT | 06.04.2011 | ||
LV | 06.04.2011 | ||
SE | 06.04.2011 | ||
SI | 06.04.2011 | ||
GR | 07.07.2011 | ||
IS | 06.08.2011 | ||
PT | 08.08.2011 | ||
PL | 22.08.2011 | ||
Former [2011/49] | CY | 06.04.2011 | |
FI | 06.04.2011 | ||
LT | 06.04.2011 | ||
SE | 06.04.2011 | ||
SI | 06.04.2011 | ||
GR | 07.07.2011 | ||
PT | 08.08.2011 | ||
Former [2011/48] | LT | 06.04.2011 | |
SE | 06.04.2011 | ||
SI | 06.04.2011 | ||
PT | 08.08.2011 | ||
Former [2011/47] | LT | 06.04.2011 | |
SI | 06.04.2011 | ||
PT | 08.08.2011 | ||
Former [2011/41] | SI | 06.04.2011 | Documents cited: | Search | [YA]GB1125229 (INTERNATIONAL BUSINESS MACHINES CORPORATION) [Y] 6,7 * column 1, line 30 - line 40 * * column 2, line 57 - line 66 * * the whole document * [A] 19; | [XAY]US3727757 (BOISSICAT C) [X] 1,2,4,8-15 * figures 5,8-10 * * abstract * * column 1, line 5 - line 10 * * column 2, line 5 - line 10 * * column 2, line 56 - line 61 * * column 3, line 39 - line 63 * * column 4, line 18 - line 43 * * the whole document * [A] 19 [Y] 3,5-7; | [XAY]US3896935 (HJELLE HAROLD N, et al) [X] 1,2,4,5,8-10 * figures 2,4 * * column 3, line 12 - line 23 * * column 3, line 41 - line 44 * * column 5, line 2 - line 12 * * figure 9 * * column 5, line 15 - line 19 * * column 9, line 63 - column 10, line 18 * * column 10, line 60 - line 67 * * column 11, line 14 - line 28 * * the whole document * [A] 11-13,19 [Y] 6,7; | [Y]US4000798 (CEDRONE NICHOLAS J) [Y] 3 * figures 2-4 * * column 1, line 17 - line 34 * * column 1, line 53 - line 57 * * column 2, line 41 - line 45 * * column 2, line 58 - line 68 * * column 3, line 9 - line 11 * * column 3, line 31 - line 33 *; | [XY]US4889242 (WILLBERG HANS H [DE], et al) [X] 1-5,8,9 * figures 2,6,7a,7b,9 * * abstract * * column 9, line 32 - line 38 * * column 10, line 34 - column 12, line 2 * * column 12, line 45 - line 50 * [Y] 6,7; | [A]US5184068 (TWIGG RAY G [US], et al) [A] 11,19 * abstract * * column 1, paragraph 1 * * column 2, line 4 - line 20 * * column 2, line 48 - line 51 * * column 8, line 63 - column 9, line 10 *; | [Y]US5348164 (HEPPLER STEVE W [US]) [Y] 5 * abstract *; | [A]US2005099174 (SIADE RANDY N [US], et al) [A] 19 * paragraphs [0113] - [0115] ** the whole document * |