EP1677054 - Unitary air conditioner [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 16.08.2013 Database last updated on 30.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.08.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 18.09.2013 [2013/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states LG Electronics Inc. 20, Yeouido-dong Yeongdeungpo-gu Seoul 150-010 / KR | [N/P] |
Former [2012/41] | For all designated states LG Electronics Inc. 20, Yeouido-dong Yeongdeungpo-gu Seoul 150-010 / KR | ||
Former [2006/27] | For all designated states LG ELECTRONICS INC. 20, Yeoeuido-dong, Youngdeungpo-ku Seoul 150-010 / KR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Lee, Won Hee No. 105-1004 Dokripmun Guekdong Apt. Hyunjeo-dong Seodaemun-ku Seoul 120-080 / KR | 02 /
Hyun, Seung Youp No.102-1303Daerim 2cha Woosung Apt. 120 Guro6-dong Guro-ku Seoul 152-056 / KR | 03 /
Park, Jeong Taek No. 661-12 Bugok-dong Sangrok-ku Ansan-si Kyunggi-do 426-060 / KR | 04 /
Hwang, Yoon Jei No. 104-902 LG Hangang Zai. Ichon1-dong Yongsan-ku Seoul 140-031 / KR | [2012/41] |
Former [2006/27] | 01 /
Lee, Won Hee No. 105-1004 Dokripmun Guekdong Apt. Hyunjeo-dong Seodaemun-ku Seoul 120-080 / KR | ||
02 /
Hyun, Seung Youp No.102-1303Daerim 2cha Woosung Apt. 120 Guro6-dong Guro-ku Seoul 152-056 / KR | |||
03 /
Park, Jeong Taek No. 661-12 Bugok-dong Sangrok-ku Ansan-si Kyunggi-do 426-060 / KR | |||
04 /
Hwang, Yoon Jei No. 104-902 LG Hangang Zai. Ichon1-dong Yongsan-ku Seoul 140-031 / KR | Representative(s) | Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2012/41] | Vossius & Partner Siebertstrasse 4 81675 München / DE | ||
Former [2008/35] | Vossius & Partner Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | ||
Former [2006/27] | Vossius & Partner Siebertstrasse 4 81675 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 05028211.0 | 22.12.2005 | [2006/27] | Priority number, date | KR20040116239 | 30.12.2004 Original published format: KR 2004116239 | [2006/27] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1677054 | Date: | 05.07.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/27] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1677054 | Date: | 20.10.2010 | [2010/42] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1677054 | Date: | 10.10.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/41] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.09.2010 | Classification | IPC: | F24F11/00 | [2006/27] | CPC: |
F24F11/70 (EP,KR,US);
F24F11/30 (KR);
F24F11/86 (EP,KR,US);
F24F11/871 (EP,KR,US);
F24F11/77 (EP,US);
F24F2140/30 (KR);
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT [2011/26] |
Former [2006/27] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Einheitliche Klimaanlage | [2006/27] | English: | Unitary air conditioner | [2006/27] | French: | Dispositif de conditionnement d'air unitaire | [2006/27] | Examination procedure | 20.01.2006 | Examination requested [2006/27] | 28.01.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 24.02.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 21.04.2011 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 07.06.2011 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, FI, GR, HU, IE, IS, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 08.08.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.04.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.08.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 24.08.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 24.02.2011 | Opposition(s) | 11.07.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit [2013/38] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.12.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.12.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.12.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 23.12.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5070932 (VLASAK ROBERT C [US]) [A] 1,5 * column 3, line 53 - column 3, line 65 *; | [A]US6244515 (ROWLETTE MITCHELL R [US], et al) [A] 1,5 * column 1, line 56 - column 2, line 29 ** figure - *; | [A]US6282910 (HELT ROBERT W [US]) [A] 1,5 * column 2 - column 4 * * figure - *; | [X]US6370894 (THOMPSON KEVIN D [US], et al) [X] 1-10 * paragraph [0014] - paragraph [0019] * * figure - *; | [X]US2003059730 (SIGAFUS PAUL E [US], et al) [X] 1-4,9,10 * the whole document * |