EP1659625 - Semiconductor device and method for manufacturing the same, circuit board, and electronic instrument [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 11.06.2010 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.06.2010 | Withdrawal of application | published on 14.07.2010 [2010/28] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Seiko Epson Corporation 4-1, Nishishinjuku 2-chome Shinjuku-ku Tokyo 163-0811 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2006/21] | For all designated states SEIKO EPSON CORPORATION 4-1, Nishishinjuku 2-Chome Shinjuku-ku Tokyo 163-0811 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hashimoto, Nobuaki Seiko Epson Corporation 3-5, Owa 3-chome Suwa-shi Nagano-ken 392-8502 / JP | [2006/21] | Representative(s) | MERH-IP Matias Erny Reichl Hoffmann Patentanwälte PartG mbB Paul-Heyse-Strasse 29 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2010/10] | MERH-IP Matias Erny Reichl Hoffmann Paul-Heyse-Strasse 29 80336 München / DE | ||
Former [2006/21] | Hoffmann, Eckart Patentanwalt, Bahnhofstrasse 103 82166 Gräfelfing / DE | Application number, filing date | 05028348.0 | 19.03.1999 | [2006/21] | Priority number, date | JP19980100580 | 27.03.1998 Original published format: JP 10058098 | JP19990041119 | 19.02.1999 Original published format: JP 4111999 | [2006/21] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1659625 | Date: | 24.05.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/21] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1659625 | Date: | 25.10.2006 | [2006/43] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.09.2006 | Classification | IPC: | H01L23/12, H01L23/498 | [2006/21] | CPC: |
H01L21/486 (EP,US);
H01L23/12 (KR);
H01L24/10 (US);
H01L21/563 (EP,US);
H01L23/13 (EP,US);
H01L23/16 (EP,US);
H01L23/24 (EP,US);
H01L23/3114 (EP,US);
H01L23/49816 (EP,US);
H01L23/49827 (EP,US);
H01L23/562 (EP,US);
H01L24/13 (EP,US);
H01L24/29 (EP,US);
H01L24/32 (EP,US);
H01L24/81 (EP,US);
H01L24/83 (EP,US);
H05K1/112 (EP,US);
H01L2224/0401 (EP);
H01L2224/05001 (US);
H01L2224/05022 (US);
H01L2224/05548 (US);
H01L2224/13 (EP,US);
H01L2224/13099 (US);
H01L2224/1329 (EP);
H01L2224/133 (EP);
H01L2224/16225 (EP,US);
H01L2224/16237 (EP,US);
H01L2224/2919 (EP,US);
H01L2224/32225 (EP,US);
H01L2224/48091 (EP,US);
H01L2224/48227 (EP,US);
H01L2224/48465 (EP,US);
H01L2224/73203 (EP,US);
H01L2224/73204 (EP,US);
H01L2224/73265 (EP,US);
H01L2224/81801 (EP,US);
H01L2224/83102 (EP,US);
H01L2224/83192 (EP,US);
H01L2224/83194 (EP,US);
H01L2224/8385 (EP,US);
H01L2224/92125 (EP,US);
H01L24/16 (EP);
H01L24/48 (EP,US);
H01L24/73 (EP,US);
H01L2924/00014 (EP,US);
H01L2924/01005 (EP,US);
H01L2924/01006 (EP,US);
H01L2924/01029 (EP,US);
H01L2924/01033 (EP,US);
H01L2924/0105 (EP,US);
H01L2924/01078 (EP,US);
H01L2924/01079 (EP,US);
H01L2924/01082 (EP,US);
H01L2924/014 (EP,US);
H01L2924/0665 (EP,US);
H01L2924/07802 (EP,US);
H01L2924/07811 (EP,US);
H01L2924/12041 (EP,US);
H01L2924/12042 (EP,US);
H01L2924/15151 (EP,US);
H01L2924/15183 (EP,US);
H01L2924/15184 (EP,US);
H01L2924/15311 (EP,US);
H01L2924/181 (EP,US);
H01L2924/19041 (EP,US);
H01L2924/19043 (EP,US);
H01L2924/351 (EP,US);
H05K2201/0305 (EP,US);
H05K2201/0394 (EP,US);
| C-Set: |
H01L2224/05647, H01L2924/00014 (US);
H01L2224/133, H01L2924/00014 (EP);
H01L2224/13, H01L2924/00 (EP,US);
H01L2224/2919, H01L2924/0665, H01L2924/00 (US,EP);
H01L2224/48091, H01L2924/00014 (US,EP);
H01L2224/48465, H01L2224/48091, H01L2924/00 (EP,US);
H01L2224/48465, H01L2224/48227, H01L2924/00 (EP,US);
H01L2224/73204, H01L2224/16225, H01L2224/32225, H01L2924/00, H01L2924/00012 (US,EP);
H01L2224/73265, H01L2224/32225, H01L2224/48227, H01L2924/00012 (US,EP);
H01L2224/83192, H01L2224/32225 (US,EP);
H01L2224/83192, H01L2224/73204, H01L2224/16225, H01L2224/32225, H01L2924/00 (US,EP);
H01L2224/92125, H01L2224/73204, H01L2224/16225, H01L2224/32225, H01L2924/00 (US,EP);
H01L2924/00014, H01L2224/05099 (US,EP);
H01L2924/00014, H01L2224/05599 (US,EP);
H01L2924/00014, H01L2224/45015, H01L2924/207 (US,EP);
H01L2924/00014, H01L2224/45099 (EP,US);
H01L2924/00014, H01L2224/85399 (US,EP);
H01L2924/0665, H01L2924/00 (US,EP);
H01L2924/12041, H01L2924/00 (EP,US);
H01L2924/12042, H01L2924/00 (EP,US);
H01L2924/15311, H01L2224/73204, H01L2224/16225, H01L2224/32225, H01L2924/00012 (US,EP);
H01L2924/15311, H01L2224/73265, H01L2224/32225, H01L2224/48227, H01L2924/00012 (US,EP);
H01L2924/181, H01L2924/00012 (EP,US);
H01L2924/3512, H01L2924/00, H01L2224/16225, H01L2224/32225, H01L2924/00012 (US,EP); | Designated contracting states | DE, FI, FR, GB, NL, SE [2006/21] | Title | German: | Dispositif à semiconducteur et son procédé de fabrication, carte électronique et dispositif électronique | [2006/21] | English: | Semiconductor device and method for manufacturing the same, circuit board, and electronic instrument | [2006/21] | French: | Halbleiterbauelement und dessen Herstellungsverfahren, Leiterplatte und elektronisches Bauelement | [2006/21] | Examination procedure | 05.04.2007 | Examination requested [2007/21] | 18.05.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.09.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.04.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.08.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.05.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.05.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.06.2010 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2010/28] | 07.06.2010 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 08.06.2010 | 08.06.2010 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP99909273.7 / EP0996154 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.12.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.12.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.12.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.12.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 23.12.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 23.12.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 29.03.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 31.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 26.03.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 26.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 12 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JPH09298252 ; | [A]JPH09266231 ; | [A]US5628919 (TOMURA YOSHIHIRO [JP], et al) [A] 1-20 * figures 2,4 *; | [A]JPH09266231 (NEC CORP)[A] 1-20; | [X]JPH09298252 (SHINKO ELECTRIC IND CO) [X] 1-20; | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19980227), vol. 1998, no. 03, & JP09298252 A 19971118 (SHINKO ELECTRIC IND CO LTD) [X] 1-20 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19980130), vol. 1998, no. 02, & JP09266231 A 19971007 (NEC CORP) [A] 1-20 * abstract * | [A] - SCHUELLER R D, "New chip scale package with CTE matching to the board", ELECTRONICS MANUFACTURING TECHNOLOGY SYMPOSIUM, 1997., TWENTY-FIRST IEEE/CPMT INTERNATIONAL AUSTIN, TX, USA 13-15 OCT. 1997, NEW YORK, NY, USA,IEEE, US, (19971013), ISBN 0-7803-3929-0, pages 205 - 215, XP010249729 [A] 1-20 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/IEMT.1997.626909 | [A] - MATSUDA S ET AL, "SIMPLE-STRUCTURE, GENERALLY APPLICABLE CHIP-SCALE PACKAGE", PROCEEDINGS OF THE ELECTRONIC COMPONENTS AND TECHNOLOGY CONFERENCE,US,NEW YORK, IEEE, (19950521), vol. CONF. 45, ISBN 0-7803-2737-3, pages 218 - 223, XP000624972 [A] 1-20 * the whole document * | by applicant | US5628919 | JPH09266231 | JPH09298252 |