EP1600154 - Osmotic extended-release dosage form [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.09.2011 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.09.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 12.10.2011 [2011/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ALZA Corporation 1900 Charleston Road Mountain View, CA 94043 / US | [2010/07] |
Former [2005/48] | For all designated states ALZA CORPORATION 1900 Charleston Road, P.O. Box 7210, Building M10-3 Mountain View, CA 94039-7210 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Edgren, David E 277 N.Avalon Drive, Los Altos CA 94022 / US | 02 /
Li, Shu 36943 Plapaya Street, Newark ca 94560 / US | 03 /
Bhatti, Gurdish, K 46744 Rancho Higuera Road Fremont, CA 94539 / US | 04 /
Wong, Patrick, S.L. 1533 Burlingame Avenue, Burliname CA 94010 / US | 05 /
Skluzacek, Robert, R. 6053 Bennington Drive, Newark CA 94560 / US | [2010/07] |
Former [2005/48] | 01 /
Edgren, David E 277 N.Avalon Drive, Los Altos CA 94022 / US | ||
02 /
Li, Shu 36943 Plapaya Street, Newark ca 94560 / US | |||
03 /
Bhatti, Gurdish, K 46744 Rancho Higuera Road Fremont, CA 94539 / US | |||
04 /
Wong, Patrick, S.L. 1533 Burlingame Avenue, Burliname CA 94539 / US | |||
05 /
Skluzacek, Robert, R. 6053 Bennington Drive, Newark CA 94010 / US | Representative(s) | Williams, Paul Edwin, et al Ablett & Stebbing 7-8 Market Place London W1W 8AG / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2005/48] | Williams, Paul Edwin, et al Ablett & Stebbing Caparo House 101-103 Baker Street London W1U 6FQ / GB | Application number, filing date | 05075190.8 | 26.02.1999 | [2005/48] | Priority number, date | US19980077133P | 06.03.1998 Original published format: US 77133 P | [2005/48] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1600154 | Date: | 30.11.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/48] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1600154 | Date: | 03.11.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/44] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.08.2005 | Classification | IPC: | A61K9/24, A61K9/36 | [2005/48] | CPC: |
A61K9/0004 (EP,US);
A61K9/2031 (EP,US);
A61P25/04 (EP);
A61P29/00 (EP);
A61K9/2027 (EP,US);
A61K9/2866 (EP,US);
A61K9/2886 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, NL, PT, SE [2005/48] | Title | German: | Osmotische Dosierungsform mit verlängerter Wirkstoffabgabe | [2005/48] | English: | Osmotic extended-release dosage form | [2005/48] | French: | Forme posologique osmotique à libération prolongée | [2005/48] | Examination procedure | 28.02.2005 | Examination requested [2005/48] | 02.02.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.06.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.10.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 30.04.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.12.2009 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 19.01.2010 | 19.01.2010 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 30.04.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.09.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 08.09.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP99908498.1 / EP1059916 | Opposition(s) | 04.08.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/41] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.02.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.02.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.02.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.02.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 28.02.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 14.02.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 14.02.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 13.02.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 13.02.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 16.02.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 12 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [DX]US4008719 (THEEUWES FELIX, et al) [DX] 1-27 * column 4, line 9 - line 55 * * column 7, line 27 - column 10, line 14 * * example - * * figure 1B *; | [DX]US4160452 (THEEUWES FELIX) [DX] 1-27 * the whole document *; | [Y]EP0068838 (UPJOHN CO [US]) [Y] 1-27 * example -; claim - *; | [Y]US4716041 (KJORNAES KIM [DK], et al) [Y] 1-27 * column 2, line 61 - column 3, line 20 * * column 4, line 36 - line 51 * * column 5, line 27 - line 64 * * column 6, line 65 - column 7, line 44 * * column 10, line 35 - line 68 * * column 11, line 51 - line 64 *; | [DX]US5160744 (JAO FRANK [US], et al) [DX] 1-27 * column 4, line 36 - line 45 * * column 5, line 23 - line 62 * * column 6, line 40 - line 50 * * example 8 * * figure 3 *; | [Y]EP0621032 (CIBA GEIGY AG [CH]) [Y] 1-27 * page 3, line 52 - line 57 * * page 5, line 28 - line 40 * * page 6, line 12 - line 40 * * example - *; | [Y]EP0649657 (EURO CELTIQUE SA [LU]) [Y] 1-27 * page 3; claim - *; | [Y]US5472712 (OSHLACK BENJAMIN [US], et al) [Y] 1-27 * column 7, line 52 - line 58 * * column 11, line 52 - column 13, line 66 * * examples 13,14 ** examples 22-29 *; | [E]WO9929297 (ALZA CORP [US]) [E] 1-27 * figure -; example -; claim - * |