EP1574149 - Table adjustable in height [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 11.11.2011 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.11.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 14.12.2011 [2011/50] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Group de Keyzer BVBA Industrielaan 55 8930 Menen / BE | [2005/37] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
de Keyzer, Hans Rijselstraat 6 8930 Menen / BE | [2005/37] | Representative(s) | Ostyn, Frans KOB NV President Kennedypark 31 c 8500 Kortrijk / BE | [N/P] |
Former [2005/37] | Ostyn, Frans K.O.B. NV President Kennedypark 31 C B-8500 Kortrijk / BE | Application number, filing date | 05075287.2 | 04.02.2005 | [2005/37] | Priority number, date | BE20040000128 | 09.03.2004 Original published format: BE 200400128 | [2005/37] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1574149 | Date: | 14.09.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/37] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.04.2005 | Classification | IPC: | A47B9/10, A47B13/02 | [2005/37] | CPC: |
A47B9/10 (EP,US);
A47B13/023 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/37] | Title | German: | Höhenverstellbarer Tisch | [2005/37] | English: | Table adjustable in height | [2005/37] | French: | Table réglable en hauteur | [2005/37] | Examination procedure | 17.10.2005 | Examination requested [2005/50] | 21.02.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 27.07.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.12.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 17.06.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2011/50] | 26.07.2011 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2011/50] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 21.02.2007 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.02.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.02.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 18.02.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 24.02.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 22.02.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3092048 (TIMMERMANN KARL G) [A] 1,2* figures 1-4 *; | [XA]US6189843 (PFISTER JOEL W [US]) [X] 1 * column 1, line 56 - column 4, line 7; figures 1-4 * [A] 3-7 | by applicant | US6189843 |