EP1686070 - Easy opening closure [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 17.10.2008 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.10.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 19.11.2008 [2008/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Plato product consultants V.O.F. Oude Delft 51 2611 BC Delft / NL | [2006/31] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
van Veen, Antonius Gerardus Adrianus Plato Product consultants, Oude Delft 51 2611 BC Delft / NL | 02 /
ten Klooster, Roland Plato Product consultants, Oude Delft 51 2611 BC Delft / NL | 03 /
van de Stadt, Karen Elisabeth Christiane Plato Product consultants, Oude Delft 51 2611 BC Delft / NL | 04 /
Wijnsma, Erica Hilde Plato Product consultants, Oude Delft 51 2611 BC Delft / NL | [2006/31] | Application number, filing date | 05075294.8 | 26.01.2005 | [2006/31] | Filing language | NL | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1686070 | Date: | 02.08.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/31] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.09.2005 | Classification | IPC: | B65D51/14 | [2006/31] | CPC: |
B65D51/145 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/39] |
Former [2007/15] | (deleted) | ||
Former [2006/31] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Leicht zu öffnender Verschluss | [2006/31] | English: | Easy opening closure | [2006/31] | French: | Fermeture à ouverture facile | [2006/31] | Examination procedure | 11.04.2007 | Examination requested [2007/39] | 18.01.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.05.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2008/47] | 04.07.2008 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2008/47] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.07.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 13.03.2007 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 13.03.2007 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 13.03.2007 | BG   M01   Not yet paid | 13.03.2007 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 13.03.2007 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 13.03.2007 | CZ   M01   Not yet paid | 13.03.2007 | DE   M01   Not yet paid | 13.03.2007 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 13.03.2007 | EE   M01   Not yet paid | 13.03.2007 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 13.03.2007 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 13.03.2007 | FR   M01   Not yet paid | 13.03.2007 | GB   M01   Not yet paid | 13.03.2007 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 13.03.2007 | HU   M01   Not yet paid | 13.03.2007 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 13.03.2007 | IS   M01   Not yet paid | 13.03.2007 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | 13.03.2007 | LT   M01   Not yet paid | 13.03.2007 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 13.03.2007 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 13.03.2007 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 13.03.2007 | PL   M01   Not yet paid | 13.03.2007 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 13.03.2007 | RO   M01   Not yet paid | 13.03.2007 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | 13.03.2007 | SI   M01   Not yet paid | 13.03.2007 | SK   M01   Not yet paid | 13.03.2007 | TR   M01   Not yet paid | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 13.03.2007 | M01   Fee paid on   11.04.2007 | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.01.2007 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   27.07.2007 | 31.01.2008 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   26.03.2008 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US3219223 (HADLEY WILLIAM H, et al) [Y] 6* column 2, line 61 - column 3, line 8 *; | [XY]US4473163 (GEIGER EDUARD [CH]) [X] 1-5,7 * the whole document * [Y] 6; | [X]EP0667299 (SAFET EMBAMET [FR]) [X] 1-5,7 * the whole document *; | [X]US6220466 (HAYES THOMAS H [US], et al) [X] 1-5,7 * the whole document * |