EP1574873 - Methods of and apparatus for NQR testing a sample [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 08.02.2008 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.02.2008 | Withdrawal of application | published on 12.03.2008 [2008/11] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states QRSciences Pty. Limited 8-10 Hamilton Street Cannington, WA 6107 / AU | [2007/30] |
Former [2005/37] | For all designated states BTG INTERNATIONAL LIMITED 10 Fleet Place, Limeburner Lane London EC4M 7SB / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Barras, James c/o Dept. of Chemistry King s College Strand London WC2R 2LS / GB | 02 /
Peirson, Neil Francis 86 Harlestone Road Northampton, NN5 7AG / GB | 03 /
Smith, John Alec Sydney 28 Leeward Gardens London, SW19 7QR / GB | [2005/37] | Representative(s) | Cozens, Paul Dennis, et al Mathys & Squire The Shard 32 London Bridge Street London SE1 9SG / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2006/38] | Cozens, Paul Dennis, et al Mathys & Squire 120 Holborn London EC1N 2SQ / GB | ||
Former [2005/37] | Kidd, Piers Burgess BTG International Limited, 10 Fleet Place, Limeburner Lane London EC4M 7SB / GB | Application number, filing date | 05075584.2 | 15.10.1998 | [2005/37] | Priority number, date | GB19970021892 | 15.10.1997 Original published format: GB 9721892 | [2005/37] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1574873 | Date: | 14.09.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/37] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.07.2005 | Classification | IPC: | G01R33/44 | [2005/37] | CPC: |
G01R33/441 (EP);
G01N24/084 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2005/37] | Title | German: | Verfahren und Gerät zur Untersuchung einer Probe mittels Kernquadrupolresonanz | [2005/37] | English: | Methods of and apparatus for NQR testing a sample | [2005/37] | French: | Procédés et dispositif pour l'analyse d'un échantillon par résonance quadripolaire nucléaire | [2005/37] | Examination procedure | 08.04.2005 | Examination requested [2005/37] | 05.02.2008 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2008/11] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP98947680.9 / EP1047949 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.04.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 08.04.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 08.04.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 08.04.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 08.04.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 12.10.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 12.10.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.2007 | 10   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US5365171 (BUESS MICHAEL L [US], et al) [X] 1-3,5,7,9,10 * column 3, line 64 - column 4, line 24 * * column 7, line 42 - column 10, line 19; figures 6,8,9 *; | [DX]WO9626453 (BRITISH TECH GROUP [GB], et al) [DX] 1-10 * page 3, line 26 - page 4, line 28 * * page 31, line 29 - page 43, line 7; figure 11 *; | [A] - BUESS M L ET AL, "NQR DETECTION USING A MEANDERLINE SURFACE COIL", JOURNAL OF MAGNETIC RESONANCE, ACADEMIC PRESS, ORLANDO, FL, US, (19910401), vol. 92, no. 2, ISSN 1090-7807, pages 348 - 362, XP000220344 [A] 1-10 * see pages 353-356 * | [A] - RUDAKOV T N ET AL, "The use of multi-pulse nuclear quadrupole resonance techniques for the detection of explosives containing RDX", JOURNAL OF PHYSICS D. APPLIED PHYSICS, IOP PUBLISHING, BRISTOL, GB, (1997), vol. 30, no. 9, ISSN 0022-3727, pages 1377 - 1382, XP002311939 [A] 1-10 * see the whole document * |