EP1580044 - Connection between a wheel axle of a vehicle and a said wheel axle carrying trailing arm [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 07.03.2008 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.03.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 09.04.2008 [2008/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states WEWELER NEDERLAND B.V. 149, Kayersdijk 7332 AP Apeldoorn / NL | [2005/39] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Aalderink, Derk Geert 46a, Zutphenseweg 7245 NV Laren / NL | 02 /
de Zeeuw, Maarten Peter DECEASED / NL | [2005/50] |
Former [2005/39] | 01 /
Aalderink, Derk Geert 46a, Zutphenseweg 7245 NV Laren / NL | ||
02 /
de Zeeuw, Maarten Peter 14, Mahatma Gandhiweg 6836 LH Arnhem / NL | Representative(s) | Iemenschot, Johannes Andreas Exter Polak & Charlouis B.V. (EP&C) P.O. Box 3241 2280 GE Rijswijk / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2005/39] | Iemenschot, Johannes Andreas Exter Polak & Charlouis B.V., P.O. Box 3241 2280 GE Rijswijk / NL | Application number, filing date | 05075629.5 | 16.03.2005 | [2005/39] | Priority number, date | NL20041025811 | 25.03.2004 Original published format: NL 1025811 | [2005/39] | Filing language | NL | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1580044 | Date: | 28.09.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/39] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.06.2005 | Classification | IPC: | B60G11/113, B60G11/46, B60G13/00 | [2005/39] | CPC: |
B60G11/113 (EP);
B60G11/465 (EP);
B60G13/005 (EP);
B60G9/003 (EP);
B60G2200/31 (EP);
B60G2202/112 (EP);
B60G2202/152 (EP);
B60G2204/129 (EP);
B60G2204/148 (EP);
B60G2204/4306 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | DE [2006/24] |
Former [2005/39] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Verbindung zwischen einer Radachse eines Fahrzeugs und eines gezogenen diese Radachse tragenden Aufhängungslenkers | [2005/39] | English: | Connection between a wheel axle of a vehicle and a said wheel axle carrying trailing arm | [2005/39] | French: | Connexion entre un essieu de roue de véhicule et un bras tiré portant le dit essieu de roue | [2005/39] | Examination procedure | 20.02.2006 | Examination requested [2006/16] | 29.03.2006 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 02.06.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.07.2006 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 12.09.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 12.09.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 02.10.2007 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2008/15] | 07.11.2007 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2008/15] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 09.05.2006 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 09.05.2006 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 09.05.2006 | BG   M01   Not yet paid | 09.05.2006 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 09.05.2006 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 09.05.2006 | CZ   M01   Not yet paid | 09.05.2006 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 09.05.2006 | EE   M01   Not yet paid | 09.05.2006 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 09.05.2006 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 09.05.2006 | FR   M01   Not yet paid | 09.05.2006 | GB   M01   Not yet paid | 09.05.2006 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 09.05.2006 | HU   M01   Not yet paid | 09.05.2006 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 09.05.2006 | IS   M01   Not yet paid | 09.05.2006 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | 09.05.2006 | LT   M01   Not yet paid | 09.05.2006 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 09.05.2006 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 09.05.2006 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 09.05.2006 | PL   M01   Not yet paid | 09.05.2006 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 09.05.2006 | RO   M01   Not yet paid | 09.05.2006 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | 09.05.2006 | SI   M01   Not yet paid | 09.05.2006 | SK   M01   Not yet paid | 09.05.2006 | TR   M01   Not yet paid | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2007 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3612572 (RAIDEL JOHN E) [A] 1 * column 3, line 3 - line 9; figures 2,7 *; | [A]US3630541 (CARLSON CHARLES A, et al) [A] 1 * column 3, line 51 - column 4, line 20; figures 1,3 *; | [A]GB2257670 (RUBERY OWEN ROCKWELL LTD [GB]) [A] 1 * figure 1 *; | [A]EP0533146 (PACCAR INC [US]) [A] 1 * column 5, line 15 - column 6, line 7; figures 1,3 *; | [A]DE19603612 (KRONE BERNHARD GMBH MASCHF [DE]) [A] 1* figure 1 *; | [A]EP1052123 (MERITOR HEAVY VEHICLE SYS LTD [GB]) [A] 1 * figures 1,8-10 *; | [AD]EP1088687 (WEWELER NV [NL]) [AD] 1 * abstract *; | [A]DE19946802 (SCHMITZ CARGOBULL AG [DE]) [A] 1 * figures 1,2 *; | [A]GB2376218 (BOLER CO [US]) [A] 1 * figures 1,3,5 * | by applicant | EP1088687 |