EP1570790 - Suturing device for sealing an opening in a blood vessel [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.10.2009 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.10.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 04.11.2009 [2009/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sutura, Inc. 17080 Newhope Street Fountain Valley California 92708 / US | [2008/48] |
Former [2005/36] | For all designated states Sutura, Inc. 17080 Newhope Street Fountain Valley California 92708 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Nobles, Anthony 8686 Tem Avenue Fountain Valley, California 92708 / US | 02 /
Decker, Steven E. 6220 Hartford Road Yorba Linda, California 92887 / US | 03 /
Brosch, Benjamin G. 27261 Nubles Mission Viejo, California 92692 / US | [2008/38] |
Former [2005/36] | 01 /
Nobles, Anthony 8686 Tem Avenue Fountain Valley, California 92708 / US | ||
02 /
Decker, Steven E. 6220 Hartford Road Yorba Linda, California 92887 / US | |||
03 /
Brosh, Benjamin G. 27261 Nubles Mission Viejo, California 92692 / US | Representative(s) | Musker, David Charles, et al RGC Jenkins & Co. 26 Caxton Street London SW1H 0RJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2005/36] | Musker, David Charles, et al R.G.C. Jenkins & Co. 26 Caxton Street London SW1H 0RJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 05076092.5 | 01.03.1999 | [2005/36] | Priority number, date | US19980036437 | 09.03.1998 Original published format: US 36437 | US19990231177 | 14.01.1999 Original published format: US 231177 | [2005/36] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1570790 | Date: | 07.09.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/36] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1570790 | Date: | 28.12.2005 | [2005/52] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1570790 | Date: | 26.11.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/48] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.11.2005 | Classification | IPC: | A61B17/00 | [2005/36] | CPC: |
A61B17/0057 (EP,US);
A61B17/0469 (EP,US);
A61B17/0482 (EP,US);
A61B17/0483 (EP,US);
A61B17/0491 (EP,US);
A61B2017/00637 (EP,US);
A61B2017/00663 (EP,US);
A61B2017/00672 (EP,US);
A61B2017/00867 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB [2006/36] |
Former [2005/36] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Nähvorrichtung zum Schliessen einer Blutgefässöffnung | [2005/36] | English: | Suturing device for sealing an opening in a blood vessel | [2005/36] | French: | Appareil de suture pour fermer une ouverture dans un vaisseau sanguin | [2005/36] | Examination procedure | 28.06.2006 | Examination requested [2006/32] | 29.06.2006 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 12.09.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 08.11.2006 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, CH, CY, DK, FI, GR, IE, IT, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | 09.02.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.07.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.11.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.04.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.08.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 11.08.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP99301495.0 / EP0941698 | Divisional application(s) | EP08075767.7 / EP2011441 | Opposition(s) | 27.08.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/45] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.06.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.06.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.06.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 02.06.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 02.06.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 09.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 14.03.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 10.09.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 14.08.2006 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 14.08.2006 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 14.08.2006 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 14.08.2006 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 14.08.2006 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 14.08.2006 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 14.08.2006 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 14.08.2006 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 14.08.2006 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | 14.08.2006 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 14.08.2006 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 14.08.2006 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 14.08.2006 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 14.08.2006 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2008 | 10   M06   Fee paid on   10.09.2008 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]US5417699 (KLEIN ENRIQUE J [US], et al) [X] 1,5,13,14,18 * column 12, line 24 - column 13, line 21; figures 27a-40 * [A] 2; | [A]WO9707745 (NOBLES LAI ENGINEERING INC [US]) [A] 2* page 16, line 32 - page 17, line 36 *; | [X]US5613974 (ANDREAS BERNARD H [US], et al) [X] 1,5,13 * figure - * | by applicant | US5417699 |